Barnett v. Vapor Maven OK 1, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Jasmine Barnett
Defendant: Vapor Maven OK 1, LLC, Harminder Thind doing business as Vapor Maven, Gurpreet K Thind doing business as Vapor Maven, Fresh Leaf, LLC, Vapor Maven Franchising, LLC, Vapor Maven AR, LLC, Vapor Maven MS, LLC, Vapor Maven E-Juice, LLC, Jasleen Enterprises, LLC and Manav Enterprises, LLC
Case Number: 4:2021cv00423
Filed: September 30, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Oklahoma
Presiding Judge: Claire V Eagan
Referring Judge: Jodi F Jayne
2 Judge: Terence Kern
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 15, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 15, 2021 Filing 24 ANSWER with Jury Demand (Re: State Court Petition/Complaint ) by Fresh Leaf, LLC, Jasleen Enterprises, LLC, Harminder Thind, Vapor Maven OK 1, LLC (Witterholt, Madalene)
November 15, 2021 Filing 23 MOTION to Dismiss Out-of-State Defendants' Motion to Dismiss with Brief In Support by Manav Enterprises, LLC, Gurpreet K Thind, Vapor Maven AR, LLC, Vapor Maven E-Juice, LLC, Vapor Maven Franchising, LLC, Vapor Maven MS, LLC (With attachments) (Witterholt, Madalene)
November 15, 2021 Filing 22 MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to FRCP 12(b)(6) with Brief In Support by Gurpreet K Thind (Witterholt, Madalene)
October 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 21 MINUTE ORDER by Judge Terence Kern - Defendants are granted an extension of time to further plead or answer until 11/15/2021. ; granting #20 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer (This entry is the Official Order of the Court. No document is attached.) (lmc, Chambers)
October 18, 2021 Filing 20 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer or Plead (Re: State Court Petition/Complaint ) by Fresh Leaf, LLC, Jasleen Enterprises, LLC, Manav Enterprises, LLC, Gurpreet K Thind, Harminder Thind, Vapor Maven AR, LLC, Vapor Maven E-Juice, LLC, Vapor Maven Franchising, LLC, Vapor Maven MS, LLC, Vapor Maven OK 1, LLC (Witterholt, Madalene)
October 7, 2021 Filing 19 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Dustin Joseph Vanderhoof on behalf of Jasmine Barnett [Note: Attorney Dustin Joseph Vanderhoof added to party Jasmine Barnett(pty:pla).] (Vanderhoof, Dustin)
October 7, 2021 Filing 18 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Lawrence Richard Murphy, Jr on behalf of Jasmine Barnett [Note: Attorney Lawrence Richard Murphy, Jr added to party Jasmine Barnett(pty:pla).] (Murphy, Lawrence)
October 7, 2021 Filing 17 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Laura L Hamilton on behalf of Jasmine Barnett [Note: Attorney Laura L Hamilton added to party Jasmine Barnett(pty:pla).] (Hamilton, Laura)
October 7, 2021 Filing 16 JURY DEMAND by Jasmine Barnett (Smolen, Donald)
October 7, 2021 Filing 15 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Donald Eugene Smolen, II on behalf of Jasmine Barnett (Smolen, Donald)
October 7, 2021 Filing 14 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Manav Enterprises, LLC (Witterholt, Madalene)
October 7, 2021 Filing 13 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Jasleen Enterprises, LLC (Witterholt, Madalene)
October 7, 2021 Filing 12 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Vapor Maven E-Juice, LLC (Witterholt, Madalene)
October 7, 2021 Filing 11 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Vapor Maven MS, LLC (Witterholt, Madalene)
October 7, 2021 Filing 10 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Vapor Maven AR, LLC (Witterholt, Madalene)
October 7, 2021 Filing 9 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Vapor Maven Franchising, LLC (Witterholt, Madalene)
October 7, 2021 Filing 8 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Fresh Leaf, LLC (Witterholt, Madalene)
October 7, 2021 Filing 7 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Vapor Maven OK 1, LLC (Witterholt, Madalene)
October 1, 2021 Filing 6 MINUTE ORDER by Court Clerk, reassigning case to Judge Terence Kern, Judge Claire V Eagan no longer assigned to case, changing case number to 21-cv-423-TCK-JFJ (This entry is the Official Order of the Court. No document is attached.) (crp, Dpty Clk)
September 30, 2021 Filing 5 MINUTE ORDER by Court Clerk , directing Vapor Maven OK 1, LLC, Harminder Thind, d/b/a Vapor Maven, Gurpreet K. Thind, d/b/a Vapor Maven, Fresh Leaf, LLC, Vapor Maven Franchising LLC, Vapor Maven AR, LLC, Vapor Maven MS, LLC, Vapor Maven E-Juice, LLC, Jasleen Enterprises, LLC and Manav Enterprises, LLC to file a Corporate Disclosure Statement pursuant to FRCvP 7.1 within seven (7) days of this order, if they have not already done so. The parties shall use the form entitled Corporate Disclosure Statement available on the Courts website (please do not refile if already filed on non-court form unless directed to do so). If you have already filed your Corporate Disclosure Statement in this case, you are reminded to file a Supplemental Corporate Disclosure Statement within a reasonable time of any change in the information that the statement requires. (This entry is the Official Order of the Court. No document is attached.) (blc, Dpty Clk)
September 30, 2021 Filing 4 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Madalene A B Witterholt on behalf of Fresh Leaf, LLC, Jasleen Enterprises, LLC, Manav Enterprises, LLC, Gurpreet K Thind, Harminder Thind, Vapor Maven AR, LLC, Vapor Maven E-Juice, LLC, Vapor Maven Franchising, LLC, Vapor Maven MS, LLC, Vapor Maven OK 1, LLC (Witterholt, Madalene)
September 30, 2021 Filing 3 STATUS REPORT on Removed Action by Fresh Leaf, LLC, Jasleen Enterprises, LLC, Manav Enterprises, LLC, Gurpreet K Thind, Harminder Thind, Vapor Maven AR, LLC, Vapor Maven E-Juice, LLC, Vapor Maven Franchising, LLC, Vapor Maven MS, LLC, Vapor Maven OK 1, LLC (Witterholt, Madalene)
September 30, 2021 Filing 2 NOTICE of Removal with Jury Demand from Ottawa County, case number CJ-2021-00047 (paid $402 filing fee; receipt number AOKNDC-2487373) by Fresh Leaf, LLC, Jasleen Enterprises, LLC, Manav Enterprises, LLC, Gurpreet K Thind, Harminder Thind, Vapor Maven AR, LLC, Vapor Maven E-Juice, LLC, Vapor Maven Franchising, LLC, Vapor Maven MS, LLC, Vapor Maven OK 1, LLC (With attachments) (Witterholt, Madalene)
September 30, 2021 Filing 1 CIVIL COVER SHEET by Fresh Leaf, LLC, Jasleen Enterprises, LLC, Manav Enterprises, LLC, Gurpreet K Thind, Harminder Thind, Vapor Maven AR, LLC, Vapor Maven E-Juice, LLC, Vapor Maven Franchising, LLC, Vapor Maven MS, LLC, Vapor Maven OK 1, LLC [Note: Attorney Madalene A B Witterholt added to party Vapor Maven OK 1, LLC(pty:dft).] (Witterholt, Madalene)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oklahoma Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Barnett v. Vapor Maven OK 1, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jasmine Barnett
Represented By: Donald Eugene Smolen, II
Represented By: Dustin Joseph Vanderhoof
Represented By: Laura L Hamilton
Represented By: Lawrence Richard Murphy, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Vapor Maven OK 1, LLC
Represented By: Madalene A B Witterholt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Harminder Thind doing business as Vapor Maven
Represented By: Madalene A B Witterholt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gurpreet K Thind doing business as Vapor Maven
Represented By: Madalene A B Witterholt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fresh Leaf, LLC
Represented By: Madalene A B Witterholt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Vapor Maven Franchising, LLC
Represented By: Madalene A B Witterholt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Vapor Maven AR, LLC
Represented By: Madalene A B Witterholt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Vapor Maven MS, LLC
Represented By: Madalene A B Witterholt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Vapor Maven E-Juice, LLC
Represented By: Madalene A B Witterholt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jasleen Enterprises, LLC
Represented By: Madalene A B Witterholt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Manav Enterprises, LLC
Represented By: Madalene A B Witterholt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?