Peters v. Social Security Administration
Plaintiff: Joseph Peters
Defendant: Social Security Administration
Case Number: 4:2021cv00426
Filed: October 4, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Oklahoma
Presiding Judge: Susan E Huntsman
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XVI
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 205
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 5, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 5, 2021 Filing 11 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Nolan Fields on behalf of Social Security Administration [Note: Attorney Nolan Fields added to party Social Security Administration(pty:dft).] (Fields, Nolan)
October 28, 2021 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed re: Social Security Administration Served Office of Regional Counsel 10/12/21 (Re: #2 Social Security Complaint ) by Joseph Peters (With attachments) (Parmele, Daniel)
October 28, 2021 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed re: Social Security Administration Served Atty General 10/18/21 (Re: #2 Social Security Complaint ) by Joseph Peters (With attachments) (Parmele, Daniel)
October 28, 2021 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed re: Social Security Administration Served US Atty 10/13/21 (Re: #2 Social Security Complaint ) by Joseph Peters (With attachments) (Parmele, Daniel)
October 6, 2021 Filing 7 SUMMONS Issued by Court Clerk as to Social Security Administration (ll, Dpty Clk)
October 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 MINUTE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Susan E Huntsman ; granting #3 Motion for Leave to Proceed in Forma Pauperis; granting #5 Motion to Waive (This entry is the Official Order of the Court. No document is attached.) (kah, Chambers)
October 4, 2021 Filing 5 MOTION to Waive Requirement of Association of Local Counsel by Joseph Peters (Parmele, Dan)
October 4, 2021 Filing 4 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Dan Parmele on behalf of Joseph Peters (Parmele, Dan)
October 4, 2021 Filing 3 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in Forma Pauperis by Joseph Peters (Parmele, Dan)
October 4, 2021 Filing 2 SOCIAL SECURITY COMPLAINT against Social Security Administration by Joseph Peters (Parmele, Dan)
October 4, 2021 Filing 1 CIVIL COVER SHEET by Joseph Peters [Note: Attorney Dan Parmele added to party Joseph Peters(pty:pla).] (Parmele, Dan)
October 4, 2021 ***Remark: 3 summons in hold tray (blc, Dpty Clk)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oklahoma Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Peters v. Social Security Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joseph Peters
Represented By: Dan Parmele
Represented By: Daniel Parmele
Represented By: Daniel A Parmele
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Social Security Administration
Represented By: Nolan Fields
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?