Brown v. Arledge et al
Plaintiff: Aaron Brown
Defendant: Meghan Arledge, Joshua Price, John Woodward, State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company, Hyundai Motor Company, Ltd. and Hyundai Motor America
Case Number: 4:2021cv00470
Filed: October 29, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Oklahoma
Presiding Judge: Claire V Eagan
Referring Judge: Jodi F Jayne
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 15, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 26 REPLY to Response to Motion (Re: #14 MOTION to Remand ) by Aaron Brown ; (Tracy, Eric)
December 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 25 RESPONSE in Opposition to Motion to Remand (Re: #14 MOTION to Remand ) by Hyundai Motor America, Hyundai Motor Company, Ltd. ; (Kaufmann, Linda)
December 7, 2021 Opinion or Order NOTICE of Docket Entry Modification; Error: wrong event selected (Motion to Supplement); Correction: corrected text for event (Supplement) (Re: #16 SUPPLEMENT ) (sc, Dpty Clk)
December 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER by Judge Claire V Eagan that E. Todd Tracy is admitted pro hac vice for the limited purpose of representing plaintiff in this matter. Counsel is directed to file a separate entry of appearance forthwith. ; granting #22 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice (Re: #22 MOTION for Attorney(s) E. Todd Tracy to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (includes a request to waive the fee) ) (RGG, Chambers)
December 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 23 SCHEDULING ORDER by Judge Claire V Eagan (INITIAL), setting/resetting scheduling order date(s): ( Discovery due by 12/15/2022, Dispositive Motions due by 1/19/2023, Proposed Pretrial Order due by 2/21/2023, Pretrial Conference set for 3/6/2023 at 10:00 AM before Judge Claire V Eagan, Jury Trial set for 3/20/2023 at 09:15 AM before Judge Claire V Eagan) (RGG, Chambers)
December 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 22 MOTION for Attorney(s) E. Todd Tracy to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (includes a request to waive the fee) by Aaron Brown (With attachments) (Aizenman, Daniel)
December 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 21 MINUTE ORDER by Judge Claire V Eagan - Counsel E. Todd Tracy's submission of PHV motion #19 is stricken as improperly captioned. He is directed to refile his motion forthwith properly captioned for this court., striking/withdrawing document(s) (Re: #19 MOTION for Attorney(s) E. Todd Tracy to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $50 PHV fee; receipt number AOKNDC-2522159) ) (Documents Terminated: #19 MOTION for Attorney(s) E. Todd Tracy to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $50 PHV fee; receipt number AOKNDC-2522159) ) (This entry is the Official Order of the Court. No document is attached.) (RGG, Chambers)
December 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 20 JOINT STATUS REPORT by Hyundai Motor America, Hyundai Motor Company, Ltd. (Kaufmann, Linda)
December 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 19 MOTION for Attorney(s) E. Todd Tracy to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $50 PHV fee; receipt number AOKNDC-2522159) by Aaron Brown (With attachments) (Aizenman, Daniel) Modified on 12/7/2021; - STRICKEN per 21 (sc, Dpty Clk).
December 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by MaryAnn Teresa Grover on behalf of Hyundai Motor America, Hyundai Motor Company, Ltd. [Note: Attorney MaryAnn Teresa Grover added to party Hyundai Motor America(pty:dft), Attorney MaryAnn Teresa Grover added to party Hyundai Motor Company, Ltd.(pty:dft).] (Grover, MaryAnn)
December 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 17 MINUTE ORDER by Judge Claire V Eagan - Counsel Eric Tracy is not admitted to practice in this district, and has not filed a motion pro hac vice in this matter as directed per minute order 15 . Therefore, all motions filed by counsel Tracy will be held under advisement until the filing of said motion for admission pro hac vice in this case, which is due immediately., taking motion(s) under advisement (Re: #16 MOTION to Supplement , #14 MOTION to Remand , 15 Minute Order,,, ) (This entry is the Official Order of the Court. No document is attached.) (RGG, Chambers)
December 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 16 SUPPLEMENT (Re: #14 MOTION to Remand ) by Aaron Brown (With attachments) (Tracy, Eric) Modified on 12/7/2021 to edit text to reflect correct event (sc, Dpty Clk).
November 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 15 MINUTE ORDER by Judge Claire V Eagan - Counsel E. Todd Tracy for plaintiff is directed to file forthwith a motion pro hac vice. (Re: #14 MOTION to Remand ) (This entry is the Official Order of the Court. No document is attached.) (RGG, Chambers)
November 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 14 MOTION to Remand by Aaron Brown [Note: Attorney Eric Todd Tracy added to party Aaron Brown(pty:pla).] (With attachments) (Tracy, Eric)
November 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER by Judge Claire V Eagan , directing parties to file joint status report ( Status Report due by 12/2/2021) (RGG, Chambers)
November 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 STATUS REPORT on Removed Action by Hyundai Motor America, Hyundai Motor Company, Ltd. (Teague, Justin)
November 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 MINUTE ORDER by Judge Claire V Eagan - Counsel for removing parties are directed to file forthwith its Status Report on Removed Action. (Re: #2 Notice of Removal ) (This entry is the Official Order of the Court. No document is attached.) (RGG, Chambers)
November 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 CERTIFICATE by Hyundai Motor America, Hyundai Motor Company, Ltd. (Teague, Justin)
November 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 MINUTE ORDER by Court Clerk , directing Hyundai Motor America to file a Corporate Disclosure Statement pursuant to FRCvP 7.1 within seven (7) days of this order, if they have not already done so. The parties shall use the form entitled Corporate Disclosure Statement available on the Courts website (please do not refile if already filed on non-court form unless directed to do so). If you have already filed your Corporate Disclosure Statement in this case, you are reminded to file a Supplemental Corporate Disclosure Statement within a reasonable time of any change in the information that the statement requires. (This entry is the Official Order of the Court. No document is attached.) (blc, Dpty Clk)
November 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 MINUTE ORDER by Court Clerk , directing Hyundai Motor Company, Ltd. to file a Corporate Disclosure Statement pursuant to FRCvP 7.1 within seven (7) days of this order, if they have not already done so. The parties shall use the form entitled Corporate Disclosure Statement available on the Courts website (please do not refile if already filed on non-court form unless directed to do so). If you have already filed your Corporate Disclosure Statement in this case, you are reminded to file a Supplemental Corporate Disclosure Statement within a reasonable time of any change in the information that the statement requires. (This entry is the Official Order of the Court. No document is attached.) (blc, Dpty Clk)
October 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT (identifying: Corporate Parent Hyundai Motor Company for Hyundai Motor America) by Hyundai Motor America (Teague, Justin)
October 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Hyundai Motor Company, Ltd. (Teague, Justin)
October 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Linda Gensler Kaufmann on behalf of Hyundai Motor America, Hyundai Motor Company, Ltd. (Kaufmann, Linda)
October 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by James Allen Jennings, III on behalf of Hyundai Motor America, Hyundai Motor Company, Ltd. [Note: Attorney James Allen Jennings, III added to party Hyundai Motor America(pty:dft), Attorney James Allen Jennings, III added to party Hyundai Motor Company, Ltd.(pty:dft).] (Jennings, James)
October 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Justin Derrick Teague on behalf of Hyundai Motor America, Hyundai Motor Company, Ltd. (Teague, Justin)
October 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2 NOTICE of Removal from Tulsa County District Court, case number CJ-2020-3329 (paid $402 filing fee; receipt number AOKNDC-2504076) by Hyundai Motor America, Hyundai Motor Company, Ltd. (With attachments) (Teague, Justin)
October 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1 CIVIL COVER SHEET by Hyundai Motor America, Hyundai Motor Company, Ltd. (Teague, Justin)
January 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Amended PETITION/COMPLAINT with Jury Demand filed in State Court against All Defendants by Aaron Brown (blc, Dpty Clk)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oklahoma Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Brown v. Arledge et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Aaron Brown
Represented By: Daniel Nathan Aizenman
Represented By: Eric Todd Tracy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Meghan Arledge
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joshua Price
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Woodward
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hyundai Motor Company, Ltd.
Represented By: James Allen Jennings, III
Represented By: Justin Derrick Teague
Represented By: Linda Gensler Kaufmann
Represented By: MaryAnn Teresa Grover
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hyundai Motor America
Represented By: James Allen Jennings, III
Represented By: Justin Derrick Teague
Represented By: Linda Gensler Kaufmann
Represented By: MaryAnn Teresa Grover
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?