State of Oklahoma et al v. Ascension Healthcare et al
Plaintiff: State of Oklahoma
Defendant: Ascension Healthcare, Ascension Medical Group and Ascension Medical Group St. John LLC
Case Number: 4:2021cv00488
Filed: November 12, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Oklahoma
Presiding Judge: Claire V Eagan
Referring Judge: Susan E Huntsman
2 Judge: Terence Kern
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 2000 e
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 30, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 34 MINUTE ORDER by Court Clerk re: Remand (sc, Dpty Clk)
November 23, 2021 Opinion or Order ***Civil Case Terminated (see document number #33 ) (sc, Dpty Clk)
November 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 33 OPINION AND ORDER by Judge Terence Kern - Case remanded to Tulsa County ; remanding case (terminates case) ; granting #12 Motion to Remand (lmc, Chambers)
November 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 32 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT (identifying: Corporate Parent Ascension Health Alliance for Ascension Healthcare, Ascension Medical Group, Ascension Medical Group St. John LLC) by Ascension Healthcare, Ascension Medical Group, Ascension Medical Group St. John LLC (DePonte, Michael)
November 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 31 REPLY to Response to Motion (Re: #27 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Plaintiff's Amended Complaint ) by Ascension Healthcare, Ascension Medical Group, Ascension Medical Group St. John LLC ; (Padgett, Michael)
November 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 30 REPLY to Response to Motion (Re: #11 MOTION Motion to Dissolve TRO issued by State Court ) by Ascension Healthcare, Ascension Medical Group, Ascension Medical Group St. John LLC ; (Padgett, Michael)
November 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 29 REPLY to Response to Motion (Re: #12 MOTION to Remand) by State of Oklahoma ; (McClure, Kevin) Modified on 11/23/2021 to correct linking error (sc, Dpty Clk).
November 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 28 RESPONSE in Opposition to Motion (Re: #12 MOTION to Remand and Brief in Support ) by Ascension Healthcare, Ascension Medical Group, Ascension Medical Group St. John LLC ; (Padgett, Michael)
November 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 27 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Plaintiff's Amended Complaint by Ascension Healthcare, Ascension Medical Group, Ascension Medical Group St. John LLC (With attachments) (Padgett, Michael)
November 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 26 RESPONSE in Opposition to Motion (Re: #11 MOTION Motion to Dissolve TRO issued by State Court ) by State of Oklahoma ; (With attachments) (McClure, Kevin)
November 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 25 RESPONSE in Opposition to Motion (Re: #10 MOTION to Dismiss ) by State of Oklahoma ; (With attachments) (McClure, Kevin)
November 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Patricia Anderson Pryor on behalf of Ascension Healthcare, Ascension Medical Group, Ascension Medical Group St. John LLC (Anderson Pryor, Patricia)
November 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Michon Lynn Hughes on behalf of All Defendants [Note: Attorney Michon Lynn Hughes added to party Ascension Healthcare(pty:dft), Attorney Michon Lynn Hughes added to party Ascension Medical Group(pty:dft), Attorney Michon Lynn Hughes added to party Ascension Medical Group St. John LLC(pty:dft).] (Hughes, Michon)
November 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Hugh Michael Robert on behalf of All Defendants [Note: Attorney Hugh Michael Robert added to party Ascension Healthcare(pty:dft), Attorney Hugh Michael Robert added to party Ascension Medical Group(pty:dft), Attorney Hugh Michael Robert added to party Ascension Medical Group St. John LLC(pty:dft).] (Robert, Hugh)
November 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Michael Joseph DePonte on behalf of All Defendants [Note: Attorney Michael Joseph DePonte added to party Ascension Healthcare(pty:dft), Attorney Michael Joseph DePonte added to party Ascension Medical Group(pty:dft), Attorney Michael Joseph DePonte added to party Ascension Medical Group St. John LLC(pty:dft).] (DePonte, Michael)
November 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Tiffany Jane Wythe on behalf of State of Oklahoma [Note: Attorney Tiffany Jane Wythe added to party State of Oklahoma(pty:pla).] (Wythe, Tiffany)
November 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Julie Armendia Pittman on behalf of State of Oklahoma [Note: Attorney Julie Armendia Pittman added to party State of Oklahoma(pty:pla).] (Pittman, Julie)
November 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 18 MINUTE ORDER by Judge Terence Kern - Expedited responses to all pending motions are due Friday, 11/19/2021 and replies are due Monday, 11/22/2021., setting/resetting deadline(s)/hearing(s): ( Responses due by 11/19/2021, Replies due by 11/22/2021) (Re: #11 MOTION Motion to Dissolve TRO issued by State Court , #10 MOTION to Dismiss , #12 MOTION to Remand and Brief in Support ) (This entry is the Official Order of the Court. No document is attached.) (lmc, Chambers)
November 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 17 MINUTE ORDER by Judge Terence Kern - Patricia Anderson Pryor and Michael J. DePonte are admitted Pro Hac Vice for Defendants. Counsel are directed to comply with LGnR4-3(a) in regard to resident counsel requirements. ; granting #5 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice; granting #14 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice (This entry is the Official Order of the Court. No document is attached.) (lmc, Chambers)
November 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 16 FILING FEES Paid in Full by Ascension Healthcare, Ascension Medical Group, Ascension Medical Group St. John LLC (lmt, Dpty Clk)
November 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 15 MINUTE ORDER by Court Clerk , directing Ascension Healthcare, Ascension Medical Group, Ascension Medical Group St. John LLC to file a Corporate Disclosure Statement pursuant to FRCvP 7.1 within seven (7) days of this order, if they have not already done so. The parties shall use the form entitled Corporate Disclosure Statement available on the Courts website (please do not refile if already filed on non-court form unless directed to do so). If you have already filed your Corporate Disclosure Statement in this case, you are reminded to file a Supplemental Corporate Disclosure Statement within a reasonable time of any change in the information that the statement requires. (This entry is the Official Order of the Court. No document is attached.) (blc, Dpty Clk)
November 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 14 MOTION for Attorney(s) Michael J. DePonte to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $50 PHV fee; receipt number AOKNDC-2513359) by Ascension Healthcare, Ascension Medical Group, Ascension Medical Group St. John LLC (With attachments) (Padgett, Michael)
November 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 MINUTE ORDER by Court Clerk randomly reassigning case due to conflict,, recusing Judge Claire V Eagan. Judge Terence Kern reassigned to case., changing case number to 21-cv-488-TCK-SH (This entry is the Official Order of the Court. No document is attached.) (srt, Dpty Clk)
November 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 MOTION to Remand and Brief in Support by State of Oklahoma (With attachments) (McClure, Kevin)
November 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 MOTION Motion to Dissolve TRO issued by State Court by Ascension Healthcare, Ascension Medical Group, Ascension Medical Group St. John LLC (With attachments) (Padgett, Michael)
November 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 MOTION to Dismiss by Ascension Healthcare, Ascension Medical Group, Ascension Medical Group St. John LLC (With attachments) (Padgett, Michael)
November 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Kevin Lynn McClure on behalf of State of Oklahoma (McClure, Kevin)
November 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Tiffany J Wythe on behalf of State of Oklahoma (McClure, Kevin) Modified on 11/18/2021 to correct who attorney appearance is on behalf of (srt, Dpty Clk).
November 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 AMENDED COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against Ascension Healthcare, Ascension Medical Group, Ascension Medical Group St. John LLC (Re: State Court Petition/Complaint ) by State of Oklahoma (McClure, Kevin)
November 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Kevin Lynn McClure on behalf of State of Oklahoma (McClure, Kevin)
November 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 MOTION for Attorney(s) Patricia Anderson Pryor to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $50 PHV fee; receipt number BOKNDC-2513012) by Ascension Healthcare, Ascension Medical Group, Ascension Medical Group St. John LLC [Note: Attorney Patricia Anderson Pryor added to party Ascension Healthcare(pty:dft), Attorney Patricia Anderson Pryor added to party Ascension Medical Group(pty:dft), Attorney Patricia Anderson Pryor added to party Ascension Medical Group St. John LLC(pty:dft).] (With attachments) (Anderson Pryor, Patricia)
November 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 MINUTE ORDER by Court Clerk randomly reassigning case due to conflict, recusing Judge Gregory K Frizzell. Judge Claire V Eagan reassigned to case., changing case number to 21-cv-00488-CVE-SH (This entry is the Official Order of the Court. No document is attached.) (alg, Dpty Clk)
November 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Michael W Padgett on behalf of Ascension Healthcare, Ascension Medical Group, Ascension Medical Group St. John LLC (Padgett, Michael)
November 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2 AMENDED NOTICE of Removal by Ascension Healthcare, Ascension Medical Group, Ascension Medical Group St. John LLC (With attachments) (Padgett, Michael)
November 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1 CIVIL COVER SHEET by Ascension Healthcare, Ascension Medical Group, Ascension Medical Group St. John LLC (Padgett, Michael)
November 12, 2021 Opinion or Order PETITION/COMPLAINT filed in State Court against All Defendants by State of Oklahoma (blc, Dpty Clk)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oklahoma Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: State of Oklahoma et al v. Ascension Healthcare et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: State of Oklahoma
Represented By: Kevin Lynn McClure
Represented By: Julie Armendia Pittman
Represented By: Tiffany Jane Wythe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ascension Healthcare
Represented By: Michael W Padgett
Represented By: Patricia Anderson Pryor
Represented By: Hugh Michael Robert
Represented By: Michael Joseph DePonte
Represented By: Michon Lynn Hughes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ascension Medical Group
Represented By: Michael W Padgett
Represented By: Patricia Anderson Pryor
Represented By: Hugh Michael Robert
Represented By: Michael Joseph DePonte
Represented By: Michon Lynn Hughes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ascension Medical Group St. John LLC
Represented By: Michael W Padgett
Represented By: Patricia Anderson Pryor
Represented By: Hugh Michael Robert
Represented By: Michael Joseph DePonte
Represented By: Michon Lynn Hughes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?