WBL SPO I, LLC v. Bowen et al
Plaintiff: WBL SPO I, LLC
Defendant: Brandy Janeal Bowen an individual doing business as Spruce Up, Kathy Bowling, Becky Smith, Ottawa County Board of Commissioners, The, 13450 S 640 Road, Miami, OK 74354, The Occupants of the Property at, John Does, Spouse of Brandy Janeal Bowen, Occupants of the Property at 13450 S 640 Road, Miami, OK 74354, The and John Doe
Case Number: 4:2021cv00532
Filed: December 9, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Oklahoma
Presiding Judge: Terence Kern
Referring Judge: Christine D Little
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 25, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 25, 2022 Filing 22 CLERK'S ENTRY OF DEFAULT by Court Clerk ; granting #21 Motion for Entry of Default by Clerk (sc, Dpty Clk)
January 24, 2022 Filing 21 MOTION for Entry of Default by Clerk against Brandy Janeal Bowen d/b/a Spruce Up; The Spouse of Brandy Janeal Bowen; and The Occupants of the Property at 13450 S 640 Road, Miami, OK 74354 by WBL SPO I, LLC (With attachments) (Gatliff, John)
January 19, 2022 Filing 20 SUMMONS Returned Executed re: Kathy Bowling Amended Proof of Service (Re: #2 Complaint ) by WBL SPO I, LLC (Gatliff, John)
January 19, 2022 Filing 19 SUMMONS Returned Executed re: Ottawa County Board of Commissioners, The Amended Proof of Service (Re: #2 Complaint ) by WBL SPO I, LLC (Gatliff, John)
January 19, 2022 Filing 18 SUMMONS Returned Executed re: Becky Smith Amended Proof of Service (Re: #2 Complaint ) by WBL SPO I, LLC (Gatliff, John)
January 19, 2022 Filing 17 SUMMONS Returned Executed re: Occupants of the Property at 13450 S 640 Road, Miami, OK 74354, The Amended Proof of Service (Re: #2 Complaint ) by WBL SPO I, LLC (Gatliff, John)
January 19, 2022 Filing 16 SUMMONS Returned Executed re: Spouse of Brandy Janeal Bowen Amended Proof of Service (Re: #2 Complaint ) by WBL SPO I, LLC (Gatliff, John)
January 19, 2022 Filing 15 SUMMONS Returned Executed re: Brandy Janeal Bowen Amended Proof of Service (Re: #2 Complaint ) by WBL SPO I, LLC (Gatliff, John)
January 7, 2022 Filing 14 SUMMONS Returned Executed re: Occupants of the Property at 13450 S 640 Road, Miami, OK 74354, The (Re: #2 Complaint ) by WBL SPO I, LLC (Gatliff, John)
January 7, 2022 Filing 13 SUMMONS Returned Executed re: Spouse of Brandy Janeal Bowen (Re: #2 Complaint ) by WBL SPO I, LLC (Gatliff, John)
January 7, 2022 Filing 12 SUMMONS Returned Executed re: Brandy Janeal Bowen (Re: #2 Complaint ) by WBL SPO I, LLC (Gatliff, John)
January 4, 2022 Filing 11 SUMMONS Returned Executed re: Ottawa County Board of Commissioners, The (Re: #2 Complaint ) by WBL SPO I, LLC (Gatliff, John)
January 4, 2022 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed re: Becky Smith as Ottawa County Assessor (Re: #2 Complaint ) by WBL SPO I, LLC (Gatliff, John)
December 22, 2021 Filing 9 ANSWER (Re: #2 Complaint ) by Kathy Bowling, Ottawa County Board of Commissioners, The, Becky Smith (lmt, Dpty Clk)
December 21, 2021 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed re: Kathy Bowling as Ottawa County Treasurer (Re: #2 Complaint ) by WBL SPO I, LLC (Gatliff, John)
December 21, 2021 Filing 7 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by John E Gatliff, II on behalf of WBL SPO I, LLC [Note: Attorney John E Gatliff, II added to party WBL SPO I, LLC(pty:pla).] (Gatliff, John)
December 15, 2021 Filing 6 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT (identifying: Corporate Parent World Business Lenders LLC for WBL SPO I, LLC) by WBL SPO I, LLC (Cole, C)
December 10, 2021 Filing 5 MINUTE ORDER by Court Clerk , directing WBL SPO I, LLC to file a Corporate Disclosure Statement pursuant to FRCvP 7.1 within seven (7) days of this order, if they have not already done so. The parties shall use the form entitled Corporate Disclosure Statement available on the Courts website (please do not refile if already filed on non-court form unless directed to do so). If you have already filed your Corporate Disclosure Statement in this case, you are reminded to file a Supplemental Corporate Disclosure Statement within a reasonable time of any change in the information that the statement requires. (This entry is the Official Order of the Court. No document is attached.) (bjb, Dpty Clk)
December 10, 2021 Filing 4 SUMMONS Issued by Court Clerk as to 13450 S 640 Road, Miami, OK 74354, Brandy Janeal Bowen, Kathy Bowling, Ottawa County Board of Commissioners, The, Becky Smith, Spouse of Brandy Janeal Bowen (ll, Dpty Clk)
December 10, 2021 Filing 3 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by C Craig Cole on behalf of WBL SPO I, LLC (Cole, C)
December 10, 2021 Filing 2 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against All Defendants (paid $402 filing fee; receipt number AOKNDC-2526959) by WBL SPO I, LLC (Cole, C) Modified on 12/13/2021 to correct "against" party (sc, Dpty Clk).
December 10, 2021 Filing 1 CIVIL COVER SHEET by WBL SPO I, LLC (Cole, C)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oklahoma Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: WBL SPO I, LLC v. Bowen et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: WBL SPO I, LLC
Represented By: C Craig Cole
Represented By: John E Gatliff, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brandy Janeal Bowen an individual doing business as Spruce Up
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kathy Bowling
Represented By: Daniel Thomas Giraldi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Becky Smith
Represented By: Daniel Thomas Giraldi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ottawa County Board of Commissioners, The
Represented By: Daniel Thomas Giraldi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 13450 S 640 Road, Miami, OK 74354, The Occupants of the Property at
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Does
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Spouse of Brandy Janeal Bowen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Occupants of the Property at 13450 S 640 Road, Miami, OK 74354, The
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?