Hulse v. Team Next Level, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Jamie Hulse
Defendant: Team Next Level, Inc., John Hall, II, Doe Corporation and John Doe
Case Number: 4:2021cv00546
Filed: December 17, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Oklahoma
Presiding Judge: Claire V Eagan
Referring Judge: Jodi F Jayne
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 201
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 11, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 11, 2022 Filing 19 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Team Next Level, Inc. (Turner, William)
February 9, 2022 Filing 18 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Jacob Samuel Crawford on behalf of John Hall, II, Team Next Level, Inc. [Note: Attorney Jacob Samuel Crawford added to party John Hall, II(pty:dft), Attorney Jacob Samuel Crawford added to party Team Next Level, Inc.(pty:dft).] (Crawford, Jacob)
February 9, 2022 Filing 17 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by William Kirk Turner on behalf of John Hall, II, Team Next Level, Inc. (Turner, William)
February 9, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 16 MINUTE ORDER by Judge Claire V Eagan #15 granted contingent upon entries of appearance of new counsel within 5 days of this order. ; granting #15 Motion to Substitute Attorney (This entry is the Official Order of the Court. No document is attached.) (lmc, Chambers)
February 8, 2022 Filing 15 MOTION to Substitute Attorney by John Hall, II, Team Next Level, Inc. [Note: Attorney William Kirk Turner added to party John Hall, II(pty:dft), Attorney William Kirk Turner added to party Team Next Level, Inc.(pty:dft).] (Turner, William)
February 4, 2022 Filing 14 MINUTE ORDER by Court Clerk , directing Team Next Level, Inc. to file a Corporate Disclosure Statement pursuant to FRCvP 7.1 within seven (7) days of this order, if they have not already done so. The parties shall use the form entitled Corporate Disclosure Statement available on the Courts website (please do not refile if already filed on non-court form unless directed to do so). If you have already filed your Corporate Disclosure Statement in this case, you are reminded to file a Supplemental Corporate Disclosure Statement within a reasonable time of any change in the information that the statement requires. (This entry is the Official Order of the Court. No document is attached.) (bjb, Dpty Clk)
February 1, 2022 Filing 13 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by J. Randall Coffey on behalf of John Hall, II, Team Next Level, Inc. [Note: Attorney Melody L Rayl added to party John Hall, II(pty:dft), Attorney Melody L Rayl added to party Team Next Level, Inc.(pty:dft).] (Rayl, Melody) Modified on 2/2/2022 to edit text to correct attorney filer (sc, Dpty Clk).
January 27, 2022 NOTICE of Docket Entry Modification; Error: wrong event selected (Notice (Other)); Correction: corrected text for event (Appearance - Attorney) (Re: #11 Notice (Other), #12 Notice (Other), #10 Notice (Other) ) (sc, Dpty Clk)
January 26, 2022 Filing 12 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Andrew R. Biller on behalf of Jamie Hulse [Note: Attorney Andy Biller added to party Jamie Hulse(pty:pla).] (Biller, Andy) Modified on 1/27/2022 to edit text to reflect correct event (sc, Dpty Clk).
January 26, 2022 Filing 11 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Andrew P. Kimble on behalf of Jamie Hulse [Note: Attorney Andrew Kimble added to party Jamie Hulse(pty:pla).] (Kimble, Andrew) Modified on 1/27/2022 to edit text to reflect correct event (sc, Dpty Clk).
January 26, 2022 Filing 10 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Riley E. Kane on behalf of Jamie Hulse [Note: Attorney Riley Edward Kane added to party Jamie Hulse(pty:pla).] (Kane, Riley) Modified on 1/27/2022 to edit text to reflect correct event (sc, Dpty Clk).
January 12, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER by Judge Claire V Eagan that Andrew P. Kimble, Riley E. Kane, and Andrew R. Biller are admitted pro hac vice for the limited purpose of representing plaintiff in this matter. Counsel are directed to file separate entries of appearance forthwith. ; granting #6 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice; granting #7 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice; granting #8 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice (RGG, Chambers)
January 12, 2022 Filing 8 MOTION for Attorney(s) Andrew Biller to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $50 PHV fee; receipt number AOKNDC-2543314) by Jamie Hulse (With attachments) (Taylor, Jeffery)
January 12, 2022 Filing 7 MOTION for Attorney(s) Riley Kane to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $50 PHV fee; receipt number AOKNDC-2543294) by Jamie Hulse (With attachments) (Taylor, Jeffery)
January 12, 2022 Filing 6 MOTION for Attorney(s) Andrew Kimble to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $50 PHV fee; receipt number AOKNDC-2543283) by Jamie Hulse (With attachments) (Taylor, Jeffery)
January 10, 2022 Filing 5 WAIVER of Service of Summons sent to John Hall, II Returned Executed (Re: #2 Complaint ) by Jamie Hulse (Taylor, Jeffery)
January 10, 2022 Filing 4 WAIVER of Service of Summons sent to Team Next Level, Inc. Returned Executed (Re: #2 Complaint ) by Jamie Hulse (Taylor, Jeffery)
December 20, 2021 Filing 3 SUMMONS Issued by Court Clerk as to John Hall, II, Team Next Level, Inc. (lmt, Dpty Clk) (Main Document 3 replaced on 12/22/2021 to correct page order) (lmt, Dpty Clk).
December 17, 2021 Filing 2 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against All Defendants (paid $402 filing fee; receipt number AOKNDC-2530926) by Jamie Hulse (Taylor, Jeffery)
December 17, 2021 Filing 1 CIVIL COVER SHEET by Jamie Hulse (Taylor, Jeffery)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oklahoma Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hulse v. Team Next Level, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jamie Hulse
Represented By: Jeffery A Taylor
Represented By: Riley Edward Kane
Represented By: Andrew Kimble
Represented By: Andy Biller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Team Next Level, Inc.
Represented By: Jacob Samuel Crawford
Represented By: James Randall Coffey
Represented By: Melody L Rayl
Represented By: William Kirk Turner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Hall, II
Represented By: Jacob Samuel Crawford
Represented By: James Randall Coffey
Represented By: Melody L Rayl
Represented By: William Kirk Turner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Doe Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?