Grant et al v. Flying Bud Farms, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Keith Grant and Stephanie Grant
Defendant: Flying Bud Farms, LLC, Paragon Industries, Inc., Assurance Restoration, LLC, Gary David Bacon, Jr, Bacon Investments, LLC, Derek Wachob, D-Luxe Dispensary, LLC, D-Luxe IP, LLC, D-Luxe Farms, LLC, D-Luxe Disposal, LLC, D-Luxe Properties, LLC, D-Luxe Processing, LLC, D-Luxe Holdings, LLC, D-Luxe Holdings I, LLC, D-Luxe Holdings II, LLC, D-Luxe Holdings III, LLC, D-Luxe Holdings IV, LLC, D-Luxe Investments I, LLC, D-Luxe Transportation, LLC, D-Luxe Express Dispensary, LLC and WIT D-Luxe Holdings, LLC
Case Number: 4:2022cv00001
Filed: January 3, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Oklahoma
Presiding Judge: Jodi F Jayne
Referring Judge: Terence Kern
2 Judge: Christine D Little
Nature of Suit: Racketeer/Corrupt Organization
Cause of Action: 18 U.S.C. ยง 1961 Racketeering (RICO) Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 26, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 3, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 19 MOTION for Attorney(s) Jerauld E. Brydges to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $50 PHV fee; receipt number AOKNDC-2570650) by Assurance Restoration, LLC, Gary David Bacon, Jr, Bacon Investments, LLC, D-Luxe Dispensary, LLC, D-Luxe Disposal, LLC, D-Luxe Express Dispensary, LLC, D-Luxe Farms, LLC, D-Luxe Holdings I, LLC, D-Luxe Holdings II, LLC, D-Luxe Holdings III, LLC, D-Luxe Holdings IV, LLC, D-Luxe Holdings, LLC, D-Luxe IP, LLC, D-Luxe Investments I, LLC, D-Luxe Processing, LLC, D-Luxe Properties, LLC, D-Luxe Transportation, LLC, Flying Bud Farms, LLC, Paragon Industries, Inc., WIT D-Luxe Holdings, LLC, Derek Wachob (With attachments) (Buchan, James)
February 25, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Christine D Little ; granting 16 Motion to Stay; granting 16 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer (tjc, Dpty Clk)
February 25, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 17 MINUTE ORDER by Judge Terence Kern , referring motion(s) to Magistrate Judge Little (Re: 16 MOTION to Stay MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer (submitted as part of #12 ) (This entry is the Official Order of the Court. No document is attached.) (lmc, Chambers)
February 25, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 15 MINUTE ORDER by Judge Terence Kern , referring motion(s) to Magistrate Judge Little (Re: #12 MOTION for Discovery Concerning GableGotwals' Representation of Defendant Gary David Bacon, Jr., Motion to Stay, and Brief in Support ) (This entry is the Official Order of the Court. No document is attached.) (lmc, Chambers)
February 25, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 14 MINUTE ORDER by Court Clerk , directing Flying Bud Farms, LLC; Paragon Industries, Inc.; Assurance Restoration, LLC; Bacon Investments, LLC, D-Luxe Dispensary, LLC; D-Luxe IP, LLC; D-Luxe Farms, LLC; D-Luxe Disposal, LLC; D-Luxe Properties, LLC; D-Luxe Processing, LLC; D-Luxe Holdings, LLC; D-Luxe Holdings I, LLC; D-Luxe Holdings II, LLC; D-Luxe Holdings III, LLC; D-Luxe Holdings IV, LLC; D-Luxe Investments I, LLC; D-Luxe Transportation, LLC; D-Luxe Express Dispensary, LLC; WIT D-Luxe Holdings, LLC to file a Corporate Disclosure Statement pursuant to FRCvP 7.1 within seven (7) days of this order, if they have not already done so. The parties shall use the form entitled Corporate Disclosure Statement available on the Courts website (please do not refile if already filed on non-court form unless directed to do so). If you have already filed your Corporate Disclosure Statement in this case, you are reminded to file a Supplemental Corporate Disclosure Statement within a reasonable time of any change in the information that the statement requires. (This entry is the Official Order of the Court. No document is attached.) (blc, Dpty Clk)
February 25, 2022 Opinion or Order NOTICE of Docket Entry Modification; Error: Document #12 is a multi-part motion, but not all parts were filed; Correction: Filed the remaining motion parts as Document # 16 (Re: #12 MOTION for Discovery Concerning GableGotwals' Representation of Defendant Gary David Bacon, Jr., Motion to Stay, and Brief in Support ) (sc, Dpty Clk)
February 24, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 13 MINUTE ORDER Court Clerk, recusing Magistrate Judge Jodi F Jayne. Magistrate Judge Christine D Little reassigned to case., changing case number to 21-cv-001-TCK-CDL (This entry is the Official Order of the Court. No document is attached.) (sdc, Dpty Clk)
February 23, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 16 MOTION to Stay , MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer (submitted as part of #12 ) (Re: #2 Complaint ) by Assurance Restoration, LLC, Gary David Bacon, Jr, Bacon Investments, LLC, D-Luxe Dispensary, LLC, D-Luxe Disposal, LLC, D-Luxe Express Dispensary, LLC, D-Luxe Farms, LLC, D-Luxe Holdings I, LLC, D-Luxe Holdings II, LLC, D-Luxe Holdings III, LLC, D-Luxe Holdings IV, LLC, D-Luxe Holdings, LLC, D-Luxe IP, LLC, D-Luxe Investments I, LLC, D-Luxe Processing, LLC, D-Luxe Properties, LLC, D-Luxe Transportation, LLC, Flying Bud Farms, LLC, Paragon Industries, Inc., WIT D-Luxe Holdings, LLC, Derek Wachob (sc, Dpty Clk)
February 23, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 12 MOTION for Discovery Concerning GableGotwals' Representation of Defendant Gary David Bacon, Jr., Motion to Stay, and Brief in Support by Assurance Restoration, LLC, Gary David Bacon, Jr, Bacon Investments, LLC, D-Luxe Dispensary, LLC, D-Luxe Disposal, LLC, D-Luxe Express Dispensary, LLC, D-Luxe Farms, LLC, D-Luxe Holdings I, LLC, D-Luxe Holdings II, LLC, D-Luxe Holdings III, LLC, D-Luxe Holdings IV, LLC, D-Luxe Holdings, LLC, D-Luxe IP, LLC, D-Luxe Investments I, LLC, D-Luxe Processing, LLC, D-Luxe Properties, LLC, D-Luxe Transportation, LLC, Flying Bud Farms, LLC, Paragon Industries, Inc., WIT D-Luxe Holdings, LLC, Derek Wachob (With attachments) (Buchan, James) Modified on 2/25/2022 This is a multi-event document, see Doc # 16 for remaining events (sc, Dpty Clk).
February 23, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Micah John Petersen on behalf of All Defendants [Note: Attorney Micah John Petersen added to party Assurance Restoration, LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Micah John Petersen added to party Gary David Bacon, Jr(pty:dft), Attorney Micah John Petersen added to party Bacon Investments, LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Micah John Petersen added to party D-Luxe Dispensary, LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Micah John Petersen added to party D-Luxe Disposal, LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Micah John Petersen added to party D-Luxe Express Dispensary, LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Micah John Petersen added to party D-Luxe Farms, LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Micah John Petersen added to party D-Luxe Holdings I, LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Micah John Petersen added to party D-Luxe Holdings II, LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Micah John Petersen added to party D-Luxe Holdings III, LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Micah John Petersen added to party D-Luxe Holdings IV, LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Micah John Petersen added to party D-Luxe Holdings, LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Micah John Petersen added to party D-Luxe IP, LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Micah John Petersen added to party D-Luxe Investments I, LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Micah John Petersen added to party D-Luxe Processing, LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Micah John Petersen added to party D-Luxe Properties, LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Micah John Petersen added to party D-Luxe Transportation, LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Micah John Petersen added to party Flying Bud Farms, LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Micah John Petersen added to party Paragon Industries, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Micah John Petersen added to party WIT D-Luxe Holdings, LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Micah John Petersen added to party Derek Wachob(pty:dft).] (Petersen, Micah)
February 23, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Katie Gant Crane on behalf of All Defendants [Note: Attorney Katie Gant Crane added to party Assurance Restoration, LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Katie Gant Crane added to party Gary David Bacon, Jr(pty:dft), Attorney Katie Gant Crane added to party Bacon Investments, LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Katie Gant Crane added to party D-Luxe Dispensary, LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Katie Gant Crane added to party D-Luxe Disposal, LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Katie Gant Crane added to party D-Luxe Express Dispensary, LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Katie Gant Crane added to party D-Luxe Farms, LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Katie Gant Crane added to party D-Luxe Holdings I, LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Katie Gant Crane added to party D-Luxe Holdings II, LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Katie Gant Crane added to party D-Luxe Holdings III, LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Katie Gant Crane added to party D-Luxe Holdings IV, LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Katie Gant Crane added to party D-Luxe Holdings, LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Katie Gant Crane added to party D-Luxe IP, LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Katie Gant Crane added to party D-Luxe Investments I, LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Katie Gant Crane added to party D-Luxe Processing, LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Katie Gant Crane added to party D-Luxe Properties, LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Katie Gant Crane added to party D-Luxe Transportation, LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Katie Gant Crane added to party Flying Bud Farms, LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Katie Gant Crane added to party Paragon Industries, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Katie Gant Crane added to party WIT D-Luxe Holdings, LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Katie Gant Crane added to party Derek Wachob(pty:dft).] (Crane, Katie)
February 23, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by James Craig Buchan on behalf of All Defendants [Note: Attorney James Craig Buchan added to party Assurance Restoration, LLC(pty:dft), Attorney James Craig Buchan added to party Gary David Bacon, Jr(pty:dft), Attorney James Craig Buchan added to party Bacon Investments, LLC(pty:dft), Attorney James Craig Buchan added to party D-Luxe Dispensary, LLC(pty:dft), Attorney James Craig Buchan added to party D-Luxe Disposal, LLC(pty:dft), Attorney James Craig Buchan added to party D-Luxe Express Dispensary, LLC(pty:dft), Attorney James Craig Buchan added to party D-Luxe Farms, LLC(pty:dft), Attorney James Craig Buchan added to party D-Luxe Holdings I, LLC(pty:dft), Attorney James Craig Buchan added to party D-Luxe Holdings II, LLC(pty:dft), Attorney James Craig Buchan added to party D-Luxe Holdings III, LLC(pty:dft), Attorney James Craig Buchan added to party D-Luxe Holdings IV, LLC(pty:dft), Attorney James Craig Buchan added to party D-Luxe Holdings, LLC(pty:dft), Attorney James Craig Buchan added to party D-Luxe IP, LLC(pty:dft), Attorney James Craig Buchan added to party D-Luxe Investments I, LLC(pty:dft), Attorney James Craig Buchan added to party D-Luxe Processing, LLC(pty:dft), Attorney James Craig Buchan added to party D-Luxe Properties, LLC(pty:dft), Attorney James Craig Buchan added to party D-Luxe Transportation, LLC(pty:dft), Attorney James Craig Buchan added to party Flying Bud Farms, LLC(pty:dft), Attorney James Craig Buchan added to party Paragon Industries, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney James Craig Buchan added to party WIT D-Luxe Holdings, LLC(pty:dft), Attorney James Craig Buchan added to party Derek Wachob(pty:dft).] (Buchan, James)
January 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 8 SUMMONS Issued by Court Clerk as to All Defendants (lmt, Dpty Clk)
January 3, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Amelia Ann Fogleman on behalf of All Plaintiffs [Note: Attorney Amelia Ann Fogleman added to party Keith Grant(pty:pla), Attorney Amelia Ann Fogleman added to party Stephanie Grant(pty:pla).] (Fogleman, Amelia)
January 3, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Justin Andrew Lollman on behalf of All Plaintiffs [Note: Attorney Justin Andrew Lollman added to party Keith Grant(pty:pla), Attorney Justin Andrew Lollman added to party Stephanie Grant(pty:pla).] (Lollman, Justin)
January 3, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by John David Russell on behalf of All Plaintiffs [Note: Attorney John David Russell added to party Keith Grant(pty:pla), Attorney John David Russell added to party Stephanie Grant(pty:pla).] (Russell, John)
January 3, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Barrett Lynn Powers on behalf of All Plaintiffs [Note: Attorney Barrett Lynn Powers added to party Keith Grant(pty:pla), Attorney Barrett Lynn Powers added to party Stephanie Grant(pty:pla).] (Powers, Barrett)
January 3, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Trent Shores on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Shores, Trent)
January 3, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 2 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against All Defendants (paid $402 filing fee; receipt number AOKNDC-2537288) by Keith Grant, Stephanie Grant (Shores, Trent)
January 3, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1 CIVIL COVER SHEET by Keith Grant, Stephanie Grant (Shores, Trent)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oklahoma Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Grant et al v. Flying Bud Farms, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Keith Grant
Represented By: Amelia Ann Fogleman
Represented By: Barrett Lynn Powers
Represented By: John David Russell
Represented By: Justin Andrew Lollman
Represented By: Trent Shores
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stephanie Grant
Represented By: Amelia Ann Fogleman
Represented By: Barrett Lynn Powers
Represented By: John David Russell
Represented By: Justin Andrew Lollman
Represented By: Trent Shores
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Flying Bud Farms, LLC
Represented By: James Craig Buchan
Represented By: Katie Gant Crane
Represented By: Micah John Petersen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Paragon Industries, Inc.
Represented By: James Craig Buchan
Represented By: Katie Gant Crane
Represented By: Micah John Petersen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Assurance Restoration, LLC
Represented By: James Craig Buchan
Represented By: Katie Gant Crane
Represented By: Micah John Petersen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gary David Bacon, Jr
Represented By: James Craig Buchan
Represented By: Katie Gant Crane
Represented By: Micah John Petersen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bacon Investments, LLC
Represented By: James Craig Buchan
Represented By: Katie Gant Crane
Represented By: Micah John Petersen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Derek Wachob
Represented By: James Craig Buchan
Represented By: Katie Gant Crane
Represented By: Micah John Petersen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: D-Luxe Dispensary, LLC
Represented By: James Craig Buchan
Represented By: Katie Gant Crane
Represented By: Micah John Petersen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: D-Luxe IP, LLC
Represented By: James Craig Buchan
Represented By: Katie Gant Crane
Represented By: Micah John Petersen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: D-Luxe Farms, LLC
Represented By: James Craig Buchan
Represented By: Katie Gant Crane
Represented By: Micah John Petersen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: D-Luxe Disposal, LLC
Represented By: James Craig Buchan
Represented By: Katie Gant Crane
Represented By: Micah John Petersen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: D-Luxe Properties, LLC
Represented By: James Craig Buchan
Represented By: Katie Gant Crane
Represented By: Micah John Petersen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: D-Luxe Processing, LLC
Represented By: Katie Gant Crane
Represented By: Micah John Petersen
Represented By: James Craig Buchan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: D-Luxe Holdings, LLC
Represented By: James Craig Buchan
Represented By: Katie Gant Crane
Represented By: Micah John Petersen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: D-Luxe Holdings I, LLC
Represented By: James Craig Buchan
Represented By: Katie Gant Crane
Represented By: Micah John Petersen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: D-Luxe Holdings II, LLC
Represented By: Katie Gant Crane
Represented By: James Craig Buchan
Represented By: Micah John Petersen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: D-Luxe Holdings III, LLC
Represented By: Micah John Petersen
Represented By: James Craig Buchan
Represented By: Katie Gant Crane
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: D-Luxe Holdings IV, LLC
Represented By: James Craig Buchan
Represented By: Katie Gant Crane
Represented By: Micah John Petersen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: D-Luxe Investments I, LLC
Represented By: James Craig Buchan
Represented By: Katie Gant Crane
Represented By: Micah John Petersen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: D-Luxe Transportation, LLC
Represented By: James Craig Buchan
Represented By: Katie Gant Crane
Represented By: Micah John Petersen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: D-Luxe Express Dispensary, LLC
Represented By: James Craig Buchan
Represented By: Micah John Petersen
Represented By: Katie Gant Crane
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WIT D-Luxe Holdings, LLC
Represented By: James Craig Buchan
Represented By: Micah John Petersen
Represented By: Katie Gant Crane
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?