Hall v. Kia Motors Corporation et al
Plaintiff: Donna Hall
Defendant: Kia Motors Corporation, Kia Corporation, Kia America, Inc., Kia Motors, S.A. DE C.V. and Ferguson Advantage Imports Isuzu-Subaru-Kia-Suzuki, LLC an Oklahoma Limited Liability Company doing business as Ferguson Superstore
Case Number: 4:2022cv00080
Filed: February 22, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Oklahoma
Presiding Judge: Susan E Huntsman
Referring Judge: Jodi F Jayne
2 Judge: Terence Kern
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Motor Vehicle Product Liability
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 14, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 14, 2022 Filing 14 RESPONSE in Opposition to Motion and Objection to Plaintiff's Motion to Remand (Re: #11 MOTION to Remand ) by Kia America, Inc. ; (Vincent, Evan)
April 5, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 13 MINUTE ORDER by Judge Terence Kern - Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 16(b)(2), the Court finds good cause for delay in issuing a scheduling order in this case as there is a pending Motion to Remand (Dkt. 11) which should first be resolved. (Re: #11 MOTION to Remand ) (This entry is the Official Order of the Court. No document is attached.) (lmc, Chambers)
March 31, 2022 Filing 12 JOINT STATUS REPORT by Kia America, Inc. (Vincent, Evan)
March 24, 2022 Filing 11 MOTION to Remand by Donna Hall (Denton, Michael)
March 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER by Judge Terence Kern for Joint Status Report, directing parties to file joint status report ( Status Report due by 4/1/2022) (lmc, Chambers)
March 1, 2022 Filing 9 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT (identifying: Corporate Parent Kia Corporation, Inc., Other Affiliate Hyundai Motor Company for Kia America, Inc.) by Kia America, Inc. (Cook, Rodney)
March 1, 2022 Filing 8 ANSWER (Re: State Court Petition/Complaint ) by Kia America, Inc. (Cook, Rodney)
February 23, 2022 Filing 7 MINUTE ORDER by Court Clerk randomly reassigning case due to conflict, recusing Magistrate Judge Susan E Huntsman. Magistrate Judge Jodi F Jayne reassigned to case., changing case number to 22-cv-80-TCK-JFJ (This entry is the Official Order of the Court. No document is attached.) (dlg, Dpty Clk)
February 22, 2022 Filing 6 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Rodney Lynn Cook on behalf of Kia America, Inc. [Note: Attorney Rodney Lynn Cook added to party Kia America, Inc.(pty:dft).] (Cook, Rodney)
February 22, 2022 Filing 5 MINUTE ORDER by Court Clerk , directing Kia America, Inc. to file a Corporate Disclosure Statement pursuant to FRCvP 7.1 within seven (7) days of this order, if they have not already done so. The parties shall use the form entitled Corporate Disclosure Statement available on the Courts website (please do not refile if already filed on non-court form unless directed to do so). If you have already filed your Corporate Disclosure Statement in this case, you are reminded to file a Supplemental Corporate Disclosure Statement within a reasonable time of any change in the information that the statement requires. (This entry is the Official Order of the Court. No document is attached.) (bjb, Dpty Clk)
February 22, 2022 Filing 4 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Evan Grant Ellis Vincent on behalf of Kia America, Inc. (bjb, Dpty Clk)
February 22, 2022 Filing 3 FILING FEES Paid in Full by Kia America, Inc. (bjb, Dpty Clk)
February 22, 2022 Filing 2 NOTICE of Removal from Creek County District Court, case number B-CJ-2021-00014 by Kia America, Inc. (bjb, Dpty Clk)
February 22, 2022 Filing 1 CIVIL COVER SHEET by Kia America, Inc. (bjb, Dpty Clk)
December 8, 2021 Amended PETITION/COMPLAINT with Jury Demand filed in State Court against All Defendants by Donna Hall (bjb, Dpty Clk)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oklahoma Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hall v. Kia Motors Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kia Motors Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kia Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kia America, Inc.
Represented By: Evan Grant Ellis Vincent
Represented By: Rodney Lynn Cook
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kia Motors, S.A. DE C.V.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ferguson Advantage Imports Isuzu-Subaru-Kia-Suzuki, LLC an Oklahoma Limited Liability Company doing business as Ferguson Superstore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Donna Hall
Represented By: Michael D Denton, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?