I Dig Texas, LLC v. Creager Services, LLC et al
Plaintiff: I Dig Texas, LLC
Defendant: Creager Services, LLC and Kerry Creager
3Rd Party Defendant: Amarekan Manufacturing, LLC, Mareka Holdings, LLC, Thomas Marek and Mary Marek
Case Number: 4:2022cv00097
Filed: March 4, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Oklahoma
Presiding Judge: John F Heil
Referring Judge: Jodi F Jayne
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17 U.S.C. ยง 101 Copyright Infringement
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 24, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 22 AMENDED ANSWER (Re: #18 Amended Answer ) by I Dig Texas, LLC, Mary Marek, Thomas Marek (Oubre, Zachary)
April 20, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER by Chief Judge John F Heil, III Creager Defendants' Motions to Vacate Default Judgment are granted. Plaintiff/Third-Party Defendants' Motion to Strike/Dismiss is denied as moot ; finding as moot #12 Motion to Strike Document(s); finding as moot #12 Motion to Dismiss; granting #15 Motion to Vacate Order/Judgment; granting #16 Motion to Vacate Order/Judgment (Re: #2 Notice of Removal ) (JFH1, Chambers)
April 13, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 20 REPLY to Response to Motion (Re: #12 MOTION to Strike Document(s) and, in Addition or in the Alternative MOTION to Dismiss Answer, Counterclaims and Third-Party Claims ) by Amarekan Manufacturing, LLC, I Dig Texas, LLC, Mary Marek, Thomas Marek, Mareka Holdings, LLC ; (Oubre, Zachary)
April 13, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 19 Joint STIPULATION (Re: #15 MOTION to Vacate Order/Judgment, #16 MOTION to Vacate Order/JudgmentRenewed ) by I Dig Texas, LLC (Oubre, Zachary)
April 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 18 AMENDED ANSWER with Jury Demand (Re: Third Party Complaint filed in State Court, State Court Petition/Complaint, Counterclaim filed in State Court ) by Kerry Creager, Creager Services, LLC (With attachments) (Talley, Evan)
April 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 17 RESPONSE in Opposition to Motion (Re: #12 MOTION to Strike Document(s) and, in Addition or in the Alternative MOTION to Dismiss Answer, Counterclaims and Third-Party Claims ) by Kerry Creager, Creager Services, LLC ; (Talley, Evan)
March 23, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 16 MOTION to Vacate Order/JudgmentRenewed by Creager Services, LLC (With attachments) (Talley, Evan)
March 23, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 15 MOTION to Vacate Order/Judgment by Kerry Creager (With attachments) (Talley, Evan)
March 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 14 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Mareka Holdings, LLC (Oubre, Zachary)
March 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 13 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Amarekan Manufacturing, LLC (Oubre, Zachary)
March 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 12 MOTION to Strike Document(s) and, in Addition or in the Alternative, MOTION to Dismiss Answer, Counterclaims and Third-Party Claims (Re: #2 Notice of Removal, Third Party Complaint filed in State Court, Counterclaim filed in State Court ) by Amarekan Manufacturing, LLC, I Dig Texas, LLC, I Dig Texas, LLC, Mary Marek, Thomas Marek, Mareka Holdings, LLC (With attachments) (Oubre, Zachary)
March 16, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 11 MINUTE ORDER by Court Clerk , directing Amarekan Manufacturing, LLC and Mareka Holdings, LLC to file a Corporate Disclosure Statement pursuant to FRCvP 7.1 within seven (7) days of this order, if they have not already done so. The parties shall use the form entitled Corporate Disclosure Statement available on the Courts website (please do not refile if already filed on non-court form unless directed to do so). If you have already filed your Corporate Disclosure Statement in this case, you are reminded to file a Supplemental Corporate Disclosure Statement within a reasonable time of any change in the information that the statement requires. (This entry is the Official Order of the Court. No document is attached.) (bjb, Dpty Clk)
March 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Nate Arrington on behalf of Amarekan Manufacturing, LLC, I Dig Texas, LLC, I Dig Texas, LLC, Mary Marek, Thomas Marek, Mareka Holdings, LLC [Note: Attorney Nate Arrington added to party Amarekan Manufacturing, LLC(pty:3pd), Attorney Nate Arrington added to party I Dig Texas, LLC(pty:cd), Attorney Nate Arrington added to party I Dig Texas, LLC(pty:pla), Attorney Nate Arrington added to party Mary Marek(pty:3pd), Attorney Nate Arrington added to party Thomas Marek(pty:3pd), Attorney Nate Arrington added to party Mareka Holdings, LLC(pty:3pd).] (Arrington, Nate)
March 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 9 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by I Dig Texas, LLC, I Dig Texas, LLC (Oubre, Zachary)
March 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Ronald Theodore Shinn, Jr on behalf of Amarekan Manufacturing, LLC, I Dig Texas, LLC, I Dig Texas, LLC, Mary Marek, Thomas Marek, Mareka Holdings, LLC [Note: Attorney Ronald Theodore Shinn, Jr added to party Amarekan Manufacturing, LLC(pty:3pd), Attorney Ronald Theodore Shinn, Jr added to party Mary Marek(pty:3pd), Attorney Ronald Theodore Shinn, Jr added to party Thomas Marek(pty:3pd), Attorney Ronald Theodore Shinn, Jr added to party Mareka Holdings, LLC(pty:3pd).] (Shinn, Ronald)
March 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Zachary A.P. Oubre on behalf of Amarekan Manufacturing, LLC, I Dig Texas, LLC, I Dig Texas, LLC, Mary Marek, Thomas Marek, Mareka Holdings, LLC [Note: Attorney Zachary A.P. Oubre added to party Amarekan Manufacturing, LLC(pty:3pd), Attorney Zachary A.P. Oubre added to party I Dig Texas, LLC(pty:cd), Attorney Zachary A.P. Oubre added to party Mary Marek(pty:3pd), Attorney Zachary A.P. Oubre added to party Thomas Marek(pty:3pd), Attorney Zachary A.P. Oubre added to party Mareka Holdings, LLC(pty:3pd).] (Oubre, Zachary)
March 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 6 REPORT on Filing Copyright Action by Creager Services, LLC (Talley, Evan)
March 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 5 MINUTE ORDER by Court Clerk , directing I Dig Texas, LLC to file a Corporate Disclosure Statement pursuant to FRCvP 7.1 within seven (7) days of this order, if they have not already done so. The parties shall use the form entitled Corporate Disclosure Statement available on the Courts website (please do not refile if already filed on non-court form unless directed to do so). If you have already filed your Corporate Disclosure Statement in this case, you are reminded to file a Supplemental Corporate Disclosure Statement within a reasonable time of any change in the information that the statement requires. (This entry is the Official Order of the Court. No document is attached.) (lmt, Dpty Clk)
March 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 4 MINUTE ORDER by Court Clerk , directing Creager Services, LLC to file a Corporate Disclosure Statement pursuant to FRCvP 7.1 within seven (7) days of this order, if they have not already done so. The parties shall use the form entitled Corporate Disclosure Statement available on the Courts website (please do not refile if already filed on non-court form unless directed to do so). If you have already filed your Corporate Disclosure Statement in this case, you are reminded to file a Supplemental Corporate Disclosure Statement within a reasonable time of any change in the information that the statement requires. (This entry is the Official Order of the Court. No document is attached.) (blc, Dpty Clk)
March 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 3 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Creager Services, LLC (Talley, Evan)
March 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 2 NOTICE of Removal with Jury Demand from Tulsa County, case number CJ-22-00193 (paid $402 filing fee; receipt number AOKNDC-2571948) by Kerry Creager, Creager Services, LLC (With attachments) (Talley, Evan)
March 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1 CIVIL COVER SHEET by Kerry Creager, Creager Services, LLC (Talley, Evan)
February 25, 2022 Opinion or Order COUNTERCLAIM with Jury Demand filed in State Court against I Dig Texas, LLC by Creager Services, LLC (blc, Dpty Clk)
February 25, 2022 Opinion or Order THIRD PARTY COMPLAINT with Jury Demand filed in State Court against Amarekan Manufacturing, LLC, Mary Marek, Thomas Marek, Mareka Holdings, LLC by Creager Services, LLC (blc, Dpty Clk)
January 19, 2022 Opinion or Order PETITION/COMPLAINT with Jury Demand filed in State Court against Kerry Creager, Creager Services, LLC by I Dig Texas, LLC (blc, Dpty Clk)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oklahoma Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: I Dig Texas, LLC v. Creager Services, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: I Dig Texas, LLC
Represented By: Nathan Arrington
Represented By: Ronald Theodore Shinn, Jr
Represented By: Zachary A.P. Oubre
Represented By: Nate Arrington
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Creager Services, LLC
Represented By: Evan W Talley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kerry Creager
Represented By: Evan W Talley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party defendant: Amarekan Manufacturing, LLC
Represented By: Nate Arrington
Represented By: Ronald Theodore Shinn, Jr
Represented By: Zachary A.P. Oubre
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party defendant: Mareka Holdings, LLC
Represented By: Nate Arrington
Represented By: Ronald Theodore Shinn, Jr
Represented By: Zachary A.P. Oubre
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party defendant: Thomas Marek
Represented By: Nate Arrington
Represented By: Ronald Theodore Shinn, Jr
Represented By: Zachary A.P. Oubre
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party defendant: Mary Marek
Represented By: Nate Arrington
Represented By: Ronald Theodore Shinn, Jr
Represented By: Zachary A.P. Oubre
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?