Prior v. BOKF, NA
Plaintiff: Judy S Prior
Defendant: BOK Financial Corporation and BOKF, NA
Case Number: 4:2022cv00136
Filed: March 28, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Oklahoma
Presiding Judge: John F Heil
Referring Judge: Susan E Huntsman
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331 Fed. Question: Employment Discrimination
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 26, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 26, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Susan E Huntsman , setting/resetting deadline(s)/hearing(s): ( Miscellaneous Deadline set for 6/2/2022, Discovery Hearing set for 6/7/2022 at 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Susan E Huntsman) (Re: 19 Minute Order, Referring Document(s)/Issue(s), #16 Joint Status Report per LCvR16-1(b)(1) ) (kah, Chambers)
May 25, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 21 PROTECTIVE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Susan E Huntsman ; granting #17 Motion for Protective Order (kah, Chambers)
May 25, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 20 MINUTE ORDER by Chief Judge John F Heil, III , referring motion(s) to Magistrate Judge Huntsman (Re: #15 MOTION to Strike Affirmative Defenses with Authority ) (This entry is the Official Order of the Court. No document is attached.) (JFH1, Chambers)
May 25, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 19 MINUTE ORDER by Chief Judge John F Heil, III , referring Discovery Conference to Magistrate Judge Huntsman (This entry is the Official Order of the Court. No document is attached.) (JFH1, Chambers)
May 25, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 18 SCHEDULING ORDER by Chief Judge John F Heil, III , setting/resetting scheduling order date(s): ( Dispositive Motions due by 12/26/2022, Discovery due by 1/10/2023, Proposed Pretrial Order due by 5/17/2023, Pretrial Conference set for 5/31/2023 at 09:00 AM before Chief Judge John F Heil III) (JFH1, Chambers)
May 24, 2022 Filing 17 Unopposed MOTION for Protective Order by BOKF, NA (With attachments) (O'Neill, Nora)
May 24, 2022 Filing 16 JOINT STATUS REPORT by Judy S Prior (Hammons, Mark)
May 23, 2022 Filing 15 MOTION to Strike Affirmative Defenses with Authority by Judy S Prior (With attachments) (Hammons, Mark)
May 5, 2022 Filing 14 MINUTE ORDER by Court Clerk , directing BOKF, NA to file a Corporate Disclosure Statement pursuant to FRCvP 7.1 within seven (7) days of this order, if they have not already done so. The parties shall use the form entitled Corporate Disclosure Statement available on the Courts website (please do not refile if already filed on non-court form unless directed to do so). If you have already filed your Corporate Disclosure Statement in this case, you are reminded to file a Supplemental Corporate Disclosure Statement within a reasonable time of any change in the information that the statement requires. (This entry is the Official Order of the Court. No document is attached.) (lmt, Dpty Clk)
May 5, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER by Chief Judge John F Heil, III , directing parties to file joint status report ( Status Report due by 5/24/2022) (JFH1, Chambers)
May 3, 2022 Filing 12 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT (identifying: Corporate Parent BOK Financial Corporation for BOKF, NA) by BOKF, NA (O'Neill, Nora)
May 3, 2022 Filing 11 ANSWER (Re: #5 Amended Complaint ) by BOKF, NA (O'Neill, Nora)
May 3, 2022 Filing 10 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Erica Anne Dorwart on behalf of BOKF, NA [Note: Attorney Erica Anne Dorwart added to party BOKF, NA(pty:dft).] (Dorwart, Erica)
May 3, 2022 Filing 9 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Nora R. O'Neill on behalf of BOKF, NA [Note: Attorney Nora R. O'Neill added to party BOKF, NA(pty:dft).] (O'Neill, Nora)
April 19, 2022 Filing 8 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Brandon Douglas Roberts on behalf of All Plaintiffs [Note: Attorney Brandon Douglas Roberts added to party Judy S Prior(pty:pla).] (Roberts, Brandon)
April 19, 2022 Filing 7 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Amber Lynn Hurst on behalf of All Plaintiffs [Note: Attorney Amber Lynn Hurst added to party Judy S Prior(pty:pla).] (Hurst, Amber)
April 19, 2022 Filing 6 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Mark Edgar Hammons on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Hammons, Mark)
April 19, 2022 Filing 5 AMENDED COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against All Defendants (Re: #2 Complaint ) by Judy S Prior (Hammons, Mark)
April 14, 2022 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed re: All Defendants (Re: #2 Complaint ) by Judy S Prior (Hammons, Mark)
March 28, 2022 Filing 3 SUMMONS Issued by Court Clerk as to BOK Financial Corporation (sc, Dpty Clk)
March 28, 2022 Filing 2 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against All Defendants (paid $402 filing fee; receipt number AOKNDC-2585050) by Judy S Prior (Hammons, Mark)
March 28, 2022 Filing 1 CIVIL COVER SHEET by Judy S Prior (Hammons, Mark)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oklahoma Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Prior v. BOKF, NA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Judy S Prior
Represented By: Mark Edgar Hammons
Represented By: Amber Lynn Hurst
Represented By: Brandon Douglas Roberts
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BOK Financial Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BOKF, NA
Represented By: Erica Anne Dorwart
Represented By: Nora R. O'Neill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?