Grayson v. Buchanan et al
Plaintiff: Robert W Grayson, Jr
Defendant: Kevin D Buchanan, Will Drake, Linda Thomas, Jared Stigler, Chris Cornwell, Washington County Commissioners and Scott Owens
Case Number: 4:2022cv00196
Filed: April 28, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Oklahoma
Presiding Judge: John F Heil
Referring Judge: Susan E Huntsman
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 16, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 10, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 14 SUMMONS Issued by Court Clerk as to Washington County Commissioners (ll, Dpty Clk)
June 9, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER by Chief Judge John F Heil, III Plaintiff's Motion for Appointment of Counsel is denied ; denying #6 Motion for Appointment of Counsel (JFH1, Chambers)
May 24, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 12 SUMMONS Issued by Court Clerk as to Will Drake, Scott Owens, Jared Stigler (lmt, Dpty Clk)
May 24, 2022 Opinion or Order ***Remark: 1 blank summons (could not issue), 1 completed USM 285, 1 complaint in hold tray (lmt, Dpty Clk)
May 19, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 11 LETTER from Plaintiff re: service (3 summons and 3 USM 285 forms forwarded to USMS for service) by Robert W Grayson, Jr (sc, Dpty Clk)
May 19, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 10 SUMMONS Issued by Court Clerk as to Chris Cornwell (sc, Dpty Clk)
May 19, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 9 NOTICE of Change of Address by Robert W Grayson, Jr (sc, Dpty Clk)
May 12, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 8 LETTER to Plaintiff (docket sheet sent) (ll, Dpty Clk)
May 12, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 7 LETTER from Plaintiff requesting copies by Robert W Grayson, Jr (ll, Dpty Clk)
May 12, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 6 MOTION for Appointment of Counsel by Robert W Grayson, Jr (ll, Dpty Clk)
May 10, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 5 SUMMONS Issued by Court Clerk as to Kevin D Buchanan, Chris Cornwell, Linda Thomas (ll, Dpty Clk)
May 4, 2022 Opinion or Order ***Remark: per dkt #4 3 blank summons mailed to Plaintiff (Re: #4 Minute Order, Setting/Resetting Deadline(s)/Hearing(s), Ruling on Motion to Proceed in Forma Pauperis ) (lmt, Dpty Clk)
May 3, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 4 MINUTE ORDER by Chief Judge John F Heil, III ; setting/resetting deadline(s)/hearing(s): re: summons ( Miscellaneous Deadline set for 6/2/2022); granting #3 Motion for Leave to Proceed in Forma Pauperis (JFH1, Chambers)
April 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 3 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in Forma Pauperis by Robert W Grayson, Jr (blc, Dpty Clk)
April 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 2 COMPLAINT against All Defendants by Robert W Grayson, Jr (blc, Dpty Clk)
April 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1 CIVIL COVER SHEET by Robert W Grayson, Jr (blc, Dpty Clk)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oklahoma Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Grayson v. Buchanan et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert W Grayson, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kevin D Buchanan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Will Drake
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Linda Thomas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jared Stigler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chris Cornwell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Washington County Commissioners
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Scott Owens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?