Hoye et al v. State Farm Fire and Casualty Company
Plaintiff: Mary Catherine Hoye and David Dean
Defendant: State Farm Fire and Casualty Co and State Farm Fire and Casualty Company
Case Number: 4:2022cv00234
Filed: May 26, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Oklahoma
Presiding Judge: Gregory K Frizzell
Referring Judge: Jodi F Jayne
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Insurance Contract
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 19, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 19, 2022 Filing 18 JOINT STATUS REPORT by State Farm Fire and Casualty Company (Dickerson, Jessica)
July 6, 2022 Filing 17 ANSWER (Re: State Court Petition/Complaint ) by State Farm Fire and Casualty Company (Dickerson, Jessica)
June 27, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER by Judge Gregory K Frizzell , directing parties to file joint status report ( Status Report due by 7/19/2022) (kjp, Dpty Clk)
June 24, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 15 MINUTE ORDER by Judge Gregory K Frizzell Plaintiffs Mary Catherine Hoye and David Dean have filed an Amended Notice of Dismissal, voluntarily dismissing their breach of contract claim pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a)(1)(A)(1). A voluntary dismissal is self-executing, i.e., it is effective at the moment the notice is filed with the clerk. Janssen v. Harris, 321 F.3d 998, 1000 (10th Cir. 2003). Thus, plaintiffs having dismissed the breach of contract claim, the Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Claim for Breach of Contract [Doc. 5] of defendant State Farm Fire & Casualty Company is moot. ; finding as moot #5 Motion to Dismiss (This entry is the Official Order of the Court. No document is attached.) (lah, Chambers)
June 24, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 14 MINUTE ORDER by Judge Gregory K Frizzell Plaintiffs Mary Catherine Hoye and David Dean having filed an Amended Notice of Dismissal [Doc. 13], plaintiffs' Notice of Dismissal filed at [Doc. 12] is stricken as moot., striking/withdrawing document(s) (Re: #12 Notice of Dismissal ) (Documents Terminated: #12 Notice of Dismissal ) (This entry is the Official Order of the Court. No document is attached.) (lah, Chambers)
June 23, 2022 Filing 13 NOTICE of Dismissal dismissing Claim 1, (Re: State Court Petition/Complaint ) by David Dean, Mary Catherine Hoye (Garrett, Amber)
June 23, 2022 Filing 12 NOTICE of Dismissal dismissing Claim 2 of Plaintiffs complaint, (Re: State Court Petition/Complaint ) by David Dean, Mary Catherine Hoye (Garrett, Amber) Modified on 6/27/2022 - STRICKEN per 14 (sc, Dpty Clk).
June 17, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 11 MINUTE ORDER by Judge Gregory K Frizzell resetting plaintiffs' response date to Defendant's Motion to Dismiss [Doc. 5] to June 23, 2022; any reply shall be due on or before July 7, 2022. ; setting/resetting deadline(s)/hearing(s): ( Responses due by 6/23/2022, Replies due by 7/7/2022); granting #10 Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Motion (This entry is the Official Order of the Court. No document is attached.) (lah, Chambers)
June 16, 2022 Filing 10 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Motion (Re: #5 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Claim for Breach of Contract and Brief in Support ) by David Dean, Mary Catherine Hoye (Garrett, Amber)
May 27, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 9 MINUTE ORDER by Judge Gregory K Frizzell Defendant Jane E. Doss shall respond to plaintiff Aveanna Healthcare, LLC's Motion for Leave to Amend Complaint [Doc. 22] on or before June 3, 2022., setting/resetting deadline(s)/hearing(s): ( Responses due by 6/3/2022) (Re: 5 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Claim for Breach of Contract and Brief in Support ) (This entry is the Official Order of the Court. No document is attached.) (lah, Chambers) Modified on 5/27/2022 - ENTERED IN ERROR - filed to this case in error (a-hc, Dpty Clk).
May 27, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 8 MINUTE ORDER by Judge Gregory K Frizzell Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 16(b)(2), the Court finds good cause for delay in issuing a scheduling order in this case until resolution of Defendant's Motion to Dismiss at Doc. 5. (This entry is the Official Order of the Court. No document is attached.) (lah, Chambers)
May 27, 2022 Filing 7 MINUTE ORDER by Court Clerk , directing State Farm Fire and Casualty Co to file a Corporate Disclosure Statement pursuant to FRCvP 7.1 within seven (7) days of this order, if they have not already done so. The parties shall use the form entitled Corporate Disclosure Statement available on the Courts website (please do not refile if already filed on non-court form unless directed to do so). If you have already filed your Corporate Disclosure Statement in this case, you are reminded to file a Supplemental Corporate Disclosure Statement within a reasonable time of any change in the information that the statement requires. (This entry is the Official Order of the Court. No document is attached.) (ll, Dpty Clk)
May 27, 2022 NOTICE of Docket Entry Modification; Error: entry filed to this case in error; Correction: marked entry as entered in error; reentered in correct case (Re: 9 Minute Order,,, Setting/Resetting Deadline(s)/Hearing(s),, ) (a-hc, Dpty Clk)
May 26, 2022 Filing 6 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by William J. Holland on behalf of State Farm Fire and Casualty Co [Note: Attorney William J. Holland added to party State Farm Fire and Casualty Co(pty:dft).] (Holland, William)
May 26, 2022 Filing 5 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Claim for Breach of Contract and Brief in Support by State Farm Fire and Casualty Co (With attachments) (Dickerson, Jessica)
May 26, 2022 Filing 4 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT (identifying: Corporate Parent State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company for State Farm Fire and Casualty Co) by State Farm Fire and Casualty Co (Dickerson, Jessica)
May 26, 2022 Filing 3 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Jessica Lynn Dickerson on behalf of State Farm Fire and Casualty Co (Dickerson, Jessica)
May 26, 2022 Filing 2 NOTICE of Removal with Jury Demand from Rogers County, case number CJ-2022-115 (paid $402 filing fee; receipt number AOKNDC-2618099) by State Farm Fire and Casualty Co (With attachments) (Dickerson, Jessica)
May 26, 2022 Filing 1 CIVIL COVER SHEET by State Farm Fire and Casualty Co (Dickerson, Jessica)
March 25, 2022 PETITION/COMPLAINT filed in State Court against State Farm Fire and Casualty Co by Mary Catherine Hoye, David Dean (ll, Dpty Clk)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oklahoma Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hoye et al v. State Farm Fire and Casualty Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mary Catherine Hoye
Represented By: Amber Nicole Garrett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Dean
Represented By: Amber Nicole Garrett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State Farm Fire and Casualty Co
Represented By: Jessica Lynn Dickerson
Represented By: William J. Holland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State Farm Fire and Casualty Company
Represented By: Jessica Lynn Dickerson
Represented By: William J. Holland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?