Youngblood et al v. MVP Event Productions, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Phoenix Youngblood, Khrystal Pollard, Christopher Drake, Devin Fink, Dale Hill, Jessica Danderson, Catherine Patrick and Phuoc Vu
Defendant: MVP Event Productions, LLC a limited liability company doing business as MVP Event Staffing, Delaware North Companies Travel Hospitality Services, Inc. and Patina Golf Tour Events, LLC
Case Number: 4:2022cv00315
Filed: July 19, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Oklahoma
Presiding Judge: Claire V Eagan
Referring Judge: Susan E Huntsman
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 203 Equal Pay Act
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 7, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 22 SCHEDULING ORDER by Judge Claire V Eagan (INITIAL), setting/resetting scheduling order date(s): ( Discovery due by 1/6/2023, Dispositive Motions due by 2/10/2023, Proposed Pretrial Order due by 3/20/2023, Pretrial Conference set for 3/30/2023 at 10:30 AM before Judge Claire V Eagan, Jury Trial set for 4/17/2023 at 09:15 AM before Judge Claire V Eagan) (RGG, Chambers)
September 2, 2022 Filing 21 JOINT STATUS REPORT by Jessica Danderson, Christopher Drake, Devin Fink, Dale Hill, Catherine Patrick, Khrystal Pollard, Phuoc Vu, Phoenix Youngblood (Hickman, Steven)
August 9, 2022 Filing 20 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Erica Parks on behalf of MVP Event Productions, LLC [Note: Attorney Erica Parks added to party MVP Event Productions, LLC(pty:dft).] (Parks, Erica)
August 3, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER by Judge Claire V Eagan , directing parties to file joint status report ( Status Report due by 9/2/2022) (RGG, Chambers)
August 3, 2022 Filing 18 MINUTE ORDER by Court Clerk , directing the party name for Delaware North Companies Travel Hospitality Services, Inc. be corrected as indicated in the Notice of Party Name Correction. If any other party to this case objects to this Party Name Correction, they shall file a Motion to Reconsider Party Name Correction within seven (7) days of this order. (Re: #17 Notice of Party Name Correction ) (This entry is the Official Order of the Court. No document is attached.) (sc, Dpty Clk)
August 2, 2022 Filing 17 NOTICE of Party Name Correction by Delaware North Companies Travel Hospitality Services, Inc. (DePonte, Michael)
August 1, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER by Judge Claire V Eagan Counsel for defendant named in complaint as "Delaware North Companies Travel Hospitality Services, Inc." is directed to file, no later than 8/3/2022, a separate Notice of Party Name Correction advising of is true and correct corporate name., setting/resetting deadline(s)/hearing(s): ( Miscellaneous Deadline set for 8/3/2022) (Re: 12 Minute Order,,, ) (RGG, Chambers)
July 28, 2022 Filing 15 MINUTE ORDER by Court Clerk , directing MVP Event Productions, LLC to file a Corporate Disclosure Statement pursuant to FRCvP 7.1 within seven (7) days of this order, if they have not already done so. The parties shall use the form entitled Corporate Disclosure Statement available on the Courts website (please do not refile if already filed on non-court form unless directed to do so). If you have already filed your Corporate Disclosure Statement in this case, you are reminded to file a Supplemental Corporate Disclosure Statement within a reasonable time of any change in the information that the statement requires. (This entry is the Official Order of the Court. No document is attached.) (blc, Dpty Clk)
July 27, 2022 Filing 14 ANSWER (Re: State Court Petition/Complaint ) by MVP Event Productions, LLC (Matlock, Malinda)
July 27, 2022 Filing 13 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Malinda S Matlock on behalf of MVP Event Productions, LLC (Matlock, Malinda)
July 27, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 12 MINUTE ORDER by Judge Claire V Eagan - Counsel for defendant named in complaint as "Delaware North Companies Travel Hospitality Services, Inc." is directed to file forthwith a separate Notice of Party Name Correction advising of is true and correct corporate name.. (Re: State Court Petition/Complaint, #10 Answer ) (This entry is the Official Order of the Court. No document is attached.) (RGG, Chambers)
July 27, 2022 Filing 11 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT (identifying: Corporate Parent Delaware North Companies, Inc., Other Affiliate Patina Restaurant Group, LLC, Other Affiliate Restaurant Hospitality, Other Affiliate DNC Landmark Holdings, LLC for Delaware North Companies Travel Hospitality Services, Inc.) by Delaware North Companies Travel Hospitality Services, Inc. (DePonte, Michael)
July 27, 2022 Filing 10 ANSWER (Re: State Court Petition/Complaint ) by Delaware North Companies Travel Hospitality Services, Inc. (DePonte, Michael)
July 26, 2022 Filing 9 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by MVP Event Productions, LLC [Note: Attorney Malinda S Matlock added to party MVP Event Productions, LLC(pty:dft).] (Matlock, Malinda)
July 25, 2022 Filing 8 EXHIBIT(S) In Support of (Re: #2 Notice of Removal, ) by Delaware North Companies Travel Hospitality Services, Inc. (DePonte, Michael)
July 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 7 MINUTE ORDER by Judge Claire V Eagan - Counsel for removing defendant shall correct the removal document deficiencies listed in #6 no later than 7/27/2022., setting/resetting deadline(s)/hearing(s): ( Miscellaneous Deadline set for 7/27/2022) (Re: #6 Objection, #2 Notice of Removal, ) (This entry is the Official Order of the Court. No document is attached.) (RGG, Chambers)
July 20, 2022 Filing 6 OBJECTION to the Removal Documents (Re: #2 Notice of Removal, ) by Christopher Drake, Khrystal Pollard, Phoenix Youngblood (Hickman, Steven)
July 20, 2022 Filing 5 MINUTE ORDER by Court Clerk , directing Delaware North Companies Travel Hospitality Services, Inc. to file a Corporate Disclosure Statement pursuant to FRCvP 7.1 within seven (7) days of this order, if they have not already done so. The parties shall use the form entitled Corporate Disclosure Statement available on the Courts website (please do not refile if already filed on non-court form unless directed to do so). If you have already filed your Corporate Disclosure Statement in this case, you are reminded to file a Supplemental Corporate Disclosure Statement within a reasonable time of any change in the information that the statement requires. (This entry is the Official Order of the Court. No document is attached.) (sc, Dpty Clk)
July 20, 2022 Filing 4 NOTICE of Docket Entry Modification; Error: wrong event selected (Notice of Removal); Correction: corrected text for event (Civil Cover Sheet) (Re: #1 Notice of Removal ) (sc, Dpty Clk)
July 20, 2022 Filing 3 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Michael Joseph DePonte on behalf of Delaware North Companies Travel Hospitality Services, Inc. (DePonte, Michael)
July 20, 2022 Filing 2 NOTICE of Removal with Jury Demand from Tulsa County District Court, case number CJ-2022-1887 (paid $402 filing fee; receipt number BOKNDC-2645380) by Delaware North Companies Travel Hospitality Services, Inc. (With attachments) (DePonte, Michael) Modified on 7/20/2022 to add payment information to docket text (sc, Dpty Clk).
July 20, 2022 Filing 1 CIVIL COVERSHEET (With attachments) (DePonte, Michael) Modified on 7/20/2022 to edit text to reflect correct event (sc, Dpty Clk).
June 21, 2022 PETITION/COMPLAINT with Jury Demand filed in State Court against All Defendants by Phoenix Youngblood, Khrystal Pollard, Christopher Drake (sc, Dpty Clk)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oklahoma Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Youngblood et al v. MVP Event Productions, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Phoenix Youngblood
Represented By: Steven R Hickman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Khrystal Pollard
Represented By: Steven R Hickman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christopher Drake
Represented By: Steven R Hickman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Devin Fink
Represented By: Steven R Hickman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dale Hill
Represented By: Steven R Hickman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jessica Danderson
Represented By: Steven R Hickman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Catherine Patrick
Represented By: Steven R Hickman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Phuoc Vu
Represented By: Steven R Hickman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MVP Event Productions, LLC a limited liability company doing business as MVP Event Staffing
Represented By: Malinda S Matlock
Represented By: Erica Parks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Delaware North Companies Travel Hospitality Services, Inc.
Represented By: Malinda S Matlock
Represented By: Michael Joseph DePonte
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Patina Golf Tour Events, LLC
Represented By: Malinda S Matlock
Represented By: Michael Joseph DePonte
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?