Nelson v. Harris United, LLC
Plaintiff: Matt Nelson, Jonathan Brock, Britt Duncan, Ricky Jett, Landon Jones, Seth Wheeler and Joshua Whitten
Defendant: Harris United, LLC
Case Number: 4:2022cv00384
Filed: September 2, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Oklahoma
Presiding Judge: Claire V Eagan
Referring Judge: Christine D Little
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 201 Fair Labor Standards Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 5, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 19 MOTION to Dismiss Defendant Harris United, LLC's Counterclaims and Brief in Support by Matt Nelson (Alexander, William)
October 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Carter Tilden Hastings on behalf of Matt Nelson [Note: Attorney Carter Tilden Hastings added to party Matt Nelson(pty:pla).] (Hastings, Carter)
October 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Austin Anderson on behalf of Matt Nelson [Note: Attorney Austin Anderson added to party Matt Nelson(pty:pla).] (Anderson, Austin)
October 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by William Clifton Alexander on behalf of Matt Nelson [Note: Attorney William Clifton Alexander added to party Matt Nelson(pty:pla).] (Alexander, William)
October 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 15 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Harris United, LLC (Crawford, Jacob)
October 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 14 MINUTE ORDER by Court Clerk , directing Harris United, LLC to file a Corporate Disclosure Statement pursuant to FRCvP 7.1 within seven (7) days of this order, if they have not already done so. The parties shall use the form entitled Corporate Disclosure Statement available on the Courts website (please do not refile if already filed on non-court form unless directed to do so). If you have already filed your Corporate Disclosure Statement in this case, you are reminded to file a Supplemental Corporate Disclosure Statement within a reasonable time of any change in the information that the statement requires. (This entry is the Official Order of the Court. No document is attached.) (blc, Dpty Clk)
October 17, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 13 SUMMONS Returned Executed re: Harris United, LLC (Re: #2 Complaint ) by Matt Nelson (Robert, Hugh)
October 17, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 12 NOTICE of Consent(s) to Join by Matt Nelson, Jonathan Brock, Britt Duncan, Ricky Jett, Landon Jones, Seth Wheeler, Joshua Whitten [Note: Attorney Hugh Michael Robert added to party Jonathan Brock(pty:pla), Attorney Hugh Michael Robert added to party Britt Duncan(pty:pla), Attorney Hugh Michael Robert added to party Ricky Jett(pty:pla), Attorney Hugh Michael Robert added to party Landon Jones(pty:pla), Attorney Hugh Michael Robert added to party Seth Wheeler(pty:pla), Attorney Hugh Michael Robert added to party Joshua Whitten(pty:pla).] (With attachments) (Robert, Hugh)
October 17, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER by Judge Claire V Eagan , directing parties to file joint status report ( Status Report due by 11/16/2022) (RGG, Chambers)
October 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 10 COUNTERCLAIM against Matt Nelson by Harris United, LLC (Crawford, Jacob)
October 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ANSWER (Re: #2 Complaint ) by Harris United, LLC (Crawford, Jacob)
October 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Jacob Samuel Crawford on behalf of Harris United, LLC [Note: Attorney Jacob Samuel Crawford added to party Harris United, LLC(pty:dft).] (Crawford, Jacob)
October 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by William Kirk Turner on behalf of Harris United, LLC [Note: Attorney William Kirk Turner added to party Harris United, LLC(pty:dft).] (Turner, William)
September 12, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER by Judge Claire V Eagan - The motion #5 is granted. Austin W. Anderson, Carter T. Hastings, and William C. Alexander are admitted pro hac vice for the limited purpose of representing plaintiff in this matter. Counsel are directed to file separate entries of appearance forthwith. ; granting #5 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice (RGG, Chambers)
September 9, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 5 MOTION for Attorney(s) William Alexander, Carter Hastings & Austin Anderson to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $150 PHV fee; receipt number AOKNDC-2674622) by Matt Nelson (With attachments) (Robert, Hugh)
September 6, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 4 SUMMONS Issued by Court Clerk as to Harris United, LLC (blc, Dpty Clk)
September 2, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Hugh Michael Robert on behalf of Matt Nelson (Robert, Hugh)
September 2, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 2 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against Harris United, LLC (paid $402 filing fee; receipt number AOKNDC-2671220) by Matt Nelson (With attachments) (Robert, Hugh)
September 2, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1 CIVIL COVER SHEET by Matt Nelson (Robert, Hugh)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oklahoma Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Nelson v. Harris United, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Matt Nelson
Represented By: Hugh Michael Robert
Represented By: William Clifton Alexander
Represented By: Austin Anderson
Represented By: Carter Tilden Hastings
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jonathan Brock
Represented By: Hugh Michael Robert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Britt Duncan
Represented By: Hugh Michael Robert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ricky Jett
Represented By: Hugh Michael Robert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Landon Jones
Represented By: Hugh Michael Robert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Seth Wheeler
Represented By: Hugh Michael Robert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joshua Whitten
Represented By: Hugh Michael Robert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Harris United, LLC
Represented By: Jacob Samuel Crawford
Represented By: William Kirk Turner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?