Williams v. Saint Francis Health System, Inc.
Plaintiff: Kenna Williams, Tabitha Barber, LaVette Brooks, Jacqueline Cooper, Jason Garrett, Ericka Osborn, Jennifer Rottino, Kimberly Thurman, Megan Whittenburg, Debbi Williams, Katrina Moore, Rose Moutz and Shellie Morgan
Defendant: Saint Francis Health System, Inc.
Case Number: 4:2022cv00390
Filed: September 7, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Oklahoma
Presiding Judge: Gregory K Frizzell
Referring Judge: Christine D Little
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 201 Fair Labor Standards Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 4, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 4, 2022 Filing 19 NOTICE of Consent(s) to Join by Tabitha Barber, LaVette Brooks, Jacqueline Cooper, Jason Garrett, Katrina Moore, Rose Moutz, Ericka Osborn, Jennifer Rottino, Kimberly Thurman, Megan Whittenburg, Debbi Williams, Kenna Williams, Shellie Morgan [Note: Attorney William Clifton Alexander added to party Shellie Morgan(pty:pla).] (With attachments) (Alexander, William)
November 2, 2022 Filing 18 NOTICE of Consent(s) to Join by Kenna Williams (With attachments) (Alexander, William)
November 1, 2022 Filing 17 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Saint Francis Health System, Inc. (Broussard, Steven)
October 28, 2022 Filing 16 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Austin Anderson on behalf of Kenna Williams [Note: Attorney Austin Anderson added to party Kenna Williams(pty:pla).] (Anderson, Austin)
October 28, 2022 Filing 15 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by William Clifton Alexander on behalf of Kenna Williams [Note: Attorney William Clifton Alexander added to party Kenna Williams(pty:pla).] (Alexander, William)
October 27, 2022 Filing 14 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Carter Tilden Hastings on behalf of Kenna Williams [Note: Attorney Carter Tilden Hastings added to party Kenna Williams(pty:pla).] (Hastings, Carter)
October 27, 2022 Filing 13 NOTICE of Consent(s) to Join by Tabitha Barber, LaVette Brooks, Jacqueline Cooper, Jason Garrett, Ericka Osborn, Jennifer Rottino, Kimberly Thurman, Megan Whittenburg, Debbi Williams, Kenna Williams, Katrina Moore, Rose Moutz [Note: Attorney Hugh Michael Robert added to party Katrina Moore(pty:pla), Attorney Hugh Michael Robert added to party Rose Moutz(pty:pla).] (With attachments) (Robert, Hugh)
October 26, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 12 MINUTE ORDER by Judge Gregory K Frizzell extending deadline to November 7, 2022 ; granting #9 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer (Re: #9 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer ) (This entry is the Official Order of the Court. No document is attached.) (kjp, Dpty Clk)
October 25, 2022 Filing 11 MINUTE ORDER by Court Clerk , directing Saint Francis Health System, Inc. to file a Corporate Disclosure Statement pursuant to FRCvP 7.1 within seven (7) days of this order, if they have not already done so. The parties shall use the form entitled Corporate Disclosure Statement available on the Courts website (please do not refile if already filed on non-court form unless directed to do so). If you have already filed your Corporate Disclosure Statement in this case, you are reminded to file a Supplemental Corporate Disclosure Statement within a reasonable time of any change in the information that the statement requires. (This entry is the Official Order of the Court. No document is attached.) (sc, Dpty Clk)
October 24, 2022 Filing 10 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Kristen Pence Evans on behalf of Saint Francis Health System, Inc. [Note: Attorney Kristen Pence Evans added to party Saint Francis Health System, Inc.(pty:dft).] (Evans, Kristen)
October 21, 2022 Filing 9 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer (Re: #2 Complaint ) by Saint Francis Health System, Inc. (Broussard, Steven)
October 21, 2022 Filing 8 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Steven A. Broussard on behalf of Saint Francis Health System, Inc. [Note: Attorney Steven A. Broussard added to party Saint Francis Health System, Inc.(pty:dft).] (Broussard, Steven)
September 12, 2022 Filing 7 NOTICE of Consent(s) to Join by Kenna Williams, Tabitha Barber, LaVette Brooks, Jacqueline Cooper, Jason Garrett, Ericka Osborn, Jennifer Rottino, Kimberly Thurman, Megan Whittenburg, Debbi Williams [Note: Attorney Hugh Michael Robert added to party Tabitha Barber(pty:pla), Attorney Hugh Michael Robert added to party LaVette Brooks(pty:pla), Attorney Hugh Michael Robert added to party Jacqueline Cooper(pty:pla), Attorney Hugh Michael Robert added to party Jason Garrett(pty:pla), Attorney Hugh Michael Robert added to party Ericka Osborn(pty:pla), Attorney Hugh Michael Robert added to party Jennifer Rottino(pty:pla), Attorney Hugh Michael Robert added to party Kimberly Thurman(pty:pla), Attorney Hugh Michael Robert added to party Megan Whittenburg(pty:pla), Attorney Hugh Michael Robert added to party Debbi Williams(pty:pla).] (With attachments) (Robert, Hugh)
September 12, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 6 MINUTE ORDER by Judge Gregory K Frizzell granting plaintiff's motion for admission pro hac vice [Doc. 5]. William Clifton Alexander, Austin W. Anderson, and Carter T. Hastings are admitted pro hac vice and are directed to file separate entries of appearance forthwith ; granting #5 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice (This entry is the Official Order of the Court. No document is attached.) (kjp, Dpty Clk)
September 9, 2022 Filing 5 MOTION for Attorney(s) Carter Hastings, William Alexander, & Austin Anderson to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $150 PHV fee; receipt number AOKNDC-2674558) by Kenna Williams (With attachments) (Robert, Hugh)
September 8, 2022 Filing 4 SUMMONS Issued by Court Clerk as to Saint Francis Health System, Inc. (sc, Dpty Clk)
September 7, 2022 Filing 3 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Hugh Michael Robert on behalf of Kenna Williams (Robert, Hugh)
September 7, 2022 Filing 2 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against Saint Francis Health System, Inc. (paid $402 filing fee; receipt number COKNDC-2673226) by Kenna Williams (With attachments) (Robert, Hugh)
September 7, 2022 Filing 1 CIVIL COVER SHEET by Kenna Williams (Robert, Hugh)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oklahoma Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Williams v. Saint Francis Health System, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kenna Williams
Represented By: Hugh Michael Robert
Represented By: Austin Anderson
Represented By: Carter Tilden Hastings
Represented By: William Clifton Alexander
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tabitha Barber
Represented By: Hugh Michael Robert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LaVette Brooks
Represented By: Hugh Michael Robert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jacqueline Cooper
Represented By: Hugh Michael Robert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jason Garrett
Represented By: Hugh Michael Robert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ericka Osborn
Represented By: Hugh Michael Robert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jennifer Rottino
Represented By: Hugh Michael Robert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kimberly Thurman
Represented By: Hugh Michael Robert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Megan Whittenburg
Represented By: Hugh Michael Robert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Debbi Williams
Represented By: Hugh Michael Robert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Katrina Moore
Represented By: Hugh Michael Robert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rose Moutz
Represented By: Hugh Michael Robert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shellie Morgan
Represented By: William Clifton Alexander
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Saint Francis Health System, Inc.
Represented By: Kristen Pence Evans
Represented By: Steven A. Broussard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?