Briggs et al v. Slatton-Hodges et al
Plaintiff: Leslie Briggs, Evan Watson and Henry A Meyer, III
Defendant: Carrie Slatton-Hodges and Crystal Hernandez
Case Number: 4:2023cv00081
Filed: March 1, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Oklahoma
Presiding Judge: Gregory K Frizzell
Referring Judge: Jodi F Jayne
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 26, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 26, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER by Judge Gregory K Frizzell (stay until 7/25/2023) ; staying case; granting #19 Motion to Stay (Re: #19 Joint MOTION to Stay ) (kjp, Dpty Clk)
April 26, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER by Judge Gregory K Frizzell ; striking/withdrawing document(s); granting #20 Motion to Withdraw Documents(s) (Re: #16 MOTION to Dismiss , #20 Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw Document(s) ) (Documents Terminated: #16 MOTION to Dismiss ) (kjp, Dpty Clk)
April 26, 2023 Filing 20 Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw Document(s) (Re: #16 MOTION to Dismiss ) by Crystal Hernandez, Carrie Slatton-Hodges (Pederson, Devan)
April 26, 2023 Filing 19 Joint MOTION to Stay by Leslie Briggs, Henry A Meyer, III, Evan Watson (DeMuro, Paul)
April 11, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 18 PROTECTIVE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Jodi F Jayne ; granting #15 Motion for Protective Order (Re: #15 Unopposed MOTION for Protective Order ) (kah, Chambers)
April 10, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 17 MINUTE ORDER by Judge Gregory K Frizzell Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 16(b)(2), the Court finds good cause to delay issuing a scheduling order in this case pending resolution of Defendants' Motion to Dismiss at Doc. 16. (Re: #16 MOTION to Dismiss ) (This entry is the Official Order of the Court. No document is attached.) (lah, Chambers)
April 10, 2023 Filing 16 MOTION to Dismiss by Crystal Hernandez, Carrie Slatton-Hodges (With attachments) (Moore, Erin) Modified on 4/27/2023 - WITHDRAWN per #21 (lmt, Dpty Clk).
April 6, 2023 Filing 15 Unopposed MOTION for Protective Order by Crystal Hernandez, Carrie Slatton-Hodges (With attachments) (Pederson, Devan)
March 23, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER by Judge Gregory K Frizzell extending deadline to respond to Complaint: 4/10/2023 ; granting #13 Motion to Accelerate/Extend/Reset Hearing(s)/Deadline(s) (Re: #13 Unopposed MOTION to Accelerate/Extend/Reset Hearing(s)/Deadline(s) ) (kjp, Dpty Clk)
March 22, 2023 Filing 13 Unopposed MOTION to Accelerate/Extend/Reset Hearing(s)/Deadline(s) (Re: #2 Complaint ) by Crystal Hernandez, Carrie Slatton-Hodges (Pederson, Devan)
March 22, 2023 Filing 12 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Tracy Ella Neel on behalf of Crystal Hernandez, Carrie Slatton-Hodges [Note: Attorney Tracy Ella Neel added to party Crystal Hernandez(pty:dft), Attorney Tracy Ella Neel added to party Carrie Slatton-Hodges(pty:dft).] (Neel, Tracy)
March 22, 2023 Filing 11 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Erin Morgan Moore on behalf of Crystal Hernandez, Carrie Slatton-Hodges [Note: Attorney Erin Morgan Moore added to party Crystal Hernandez(pty:dft), Attorney Erin Morgan Moore added to party Carrie Slatton-Hodges(pty:dft).] (Moore, Erin)
March 22, 2023 Filing 10 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Devan A Pederson on behalf of Crystal Hernandez, Carrie Slatton-Hodges [Note: Attorney Devan A Pederson added to party Crystal Hernandez(pty:dft), Attorney Devan A Pederson added to party Carrie Slatton-Hodges(pty:dft).] (Pederson, Devan)
March 15, 2023 Filing 9 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Brian Stephen Wilkerson on behalf of All Plaintiffs [Note: Attorney Brian Stephen Wilkerson added to party Leslie Briggs(pty:pla), Attorney Brian Stephen Wilkerson added to party Henry A Meyer, III(pty:pla), Attorney Brian Stephen Wilkerson added to party Evan Watson(pty:pla).] (Wilkerson, Brian)
March 13, 2023 Filing 8 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Nicholas Southerland on behalf of Leslie Briggs, Henry A Meyer, III, Evan Watson [Note: Attorney Nicholas Southerland added to party Leslie Briggs(pty:pla), Attorney Nicholas Southerland added to party Henry A Meyer, III(pty:pla), Attorney Nicholas Southerland added to party Evan Watson(pty:pla).] (Southerland, Nicholas)
March 1, 2023 Filing 7 SUMMONS Issued by Court Clerk as to Crystal Hernandez, Carrie Slatton-Hodges (blc, Dpty Clk)
March 1, 2023 Filing 6 MINUTE ORDER by Court Clerk , directing Leslie Briggs, Evan Watson, and Henry A Meyer III to file a Disclosure Statement pursuant to FRCvP 7.1 and LCvR 7.1-1, if applicable. The parties shall use the form entitled Disclosure Statement available on the Courts website. (This entry is the Official Order of the Court. No document is attached.) (lmt, Dpty Clk)
March 1, 2023 Filing 5 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Frederic Dorwart on behalf of Leslie Briggs, Henry A Meyer, III, Evan Watson [Note: Attorney Frederic Dorwart added to party Leslie Briggs(pty:pla), Attorney Frederic Dorwart added to party Henry A Meyer, III(pty:pla), Attorney Frederic Dorwart added to party Evan Watson(pty:pla).] (Dorwart, Frederic)
March 1, 2023 Filing 4 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by David Wayne Leimbach on behalf of Leslie Briggs, Henry A Meyer, III, Evan Watson [Note: Attorney David Wayne Leimbach added to party Leslie Briggs(pty:pla), Attorney David Wayne Leimbach added to party Henry A Meyer, III(pty:pla), Attorney David Wayne Leimbach added to party Evan Watson(pty:pla).] (Leimbach, David)
March 1, 2023 Filing 3 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Paul DeMuro on behalf of Leslie Briggs, Henry A Meyer, III, Evan Watson (DeMuro, Paul)
March 1, 2023 Filing 2 COMPLAINT against All Defendants (paid $402 filing fee; receipt number AOKNDC-2768298) by Henry A Meyer, III, Leslie Briggs, Evan Watson (DeMuro, Paul)
March 1, 2023 Filing 1 CIVIL COVER SHEET by Leslie Briggs, Henry A Meyer, III, Evan Watson (DeMuro, Paul)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oklahoma Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Briggs et al v. Slatton-Hodges et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Leslie Briggs
Represented By: Frederic Dorwart
Represented By: Paul DeMuro
Represented By: David Wayne Leimbach
Represented By: Brian Stephen Wilkerson
Represented By: Nicholas Southerland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Evan Watson
Represented By: David Wayne Leimbach
Represented By: Frederic Dorwart
Represented By: Paul DeMuro
Represented By: Brian Stephen Wilkerson
Represented By: Nicholas Southerland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Henry A Meyer, III
Represented By: Frederic Dorwart
Represented By: Paul DeMuro
Represented By: David Wayne Leimbach
Represented By: Brian Stephen Wilkerson
Represented By: Nicholas Southerland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carrie Slatton-Hodges
Represented By: Devan A Pederson
Represented By: Erin Morgan Moore
Represented By: Tracy Ella Neel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Crystal Hernandez
Represented By: Devan A Pederson
Represented By: Erin Morgan Moore
Represented By: Tracy Ella Neel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?