Alert 360 OPCO, Inc. et al v. Vivint Smart Home, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Alert 360 OPCO, Inc., Central Security Group - Nationwide, Inc. doing business as Alert 360 and Guardian Security Systems, Inc. doing business as Alert 360
Defendant: Vivint Smart Home, Inc., Legacy Vivint Smart Home, Inc. and Mosaic Acquisition Corp.
Case Number: 4:2023cv00082
Filed: March 1, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Oklahoma
Presiding Judge: John F Heil
Referring Judge: Christine D Little
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331 Fed. Question
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 2, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 2, 2023 Filing 24 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Brock Zachary Pittman on behalf of Alert 360 OPCO, Inc., Central Security Group - Nationwide, Inc., Guardian Security Systems, Inc. [Note: Attorney Brock Zachary Pittman added to party Alert 360 OPCO, Inc.(pty:pla), Attorney Brock Zachary Pittman added to party Central Security Group - Nationwide, Inc.(pty:pla), Attorney Brock Zachary Pittman added to party Guardian Security Systems, Inc.(pty:pla).] (Pittman, Brock)
May 2, 2023 Filing 23 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Jonathan Michael Miles on behalf of Alert 360 OPCO, Inc., Central Security Group - Nationwide, Inc., Guardian Security Systems, Inc. [Note: Attorney Jonathan Michael Miles added to party Alert 360 OPCO, Inc.(pty:pla), Attorney Jonathan Michael Miles added to party Central Security Group - Nationwide, Inc.(pty:pla), Attorney Jonathan Michael Miles added to party Guardian Security Systems, Inc.(pty:pla).] (Miles, Jonathan)
May 1, 2023 Filing 22 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by John David Russell on behalf of All Defendants [Note: Attorney John David Russell added to party Legacy Vivint Smart Home, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney John David Russell added to party Vivint Smart Home, Inc.(pty:dft).] (Russell, John)
April 20, 2023 Filing 21 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Shannon Marie Grammel on behalf of Legacy Vivint Smart Home, Inc., Vivint Smart Home, Inc. [Note: Attorney Shannon Marie Grammel added to party Legacy Vivint Smart Home, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Shannon Marie Grammel added to party Vivint Smart Home, Inc.(pty:dft).] (Grammel, Shannon)
April 20, 2023 Filing 20 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by William Thomas Thompson on behalf of Legacy Vivint Smart Home, Inc., Vivint Smart Home, Inc. [Note: Attorney William Thomas Thompson added to party Legacy Vivint Smart Home, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney William Thomas Thompson added to party Vivint Smart Home, Inc.(pty:dft).] (Thompson, William)
April 19, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 19 MINUTE ORDER by Chief Judge John F Heil, III , granting Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of attorney Shannon Grammel for Defendants, provided that local counsel is present at all proceedings, unless otherwise ordered by the Court. Admission is conditioned on the filing of an entry of appearance and registration for electronic case filing by the applicant within seven (7) days from entry of this Order. See LCvR 83.4 and CM/ECF Administrative Guide of Policies and Procedures ; granting #17 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice (Re: #17 MOTION for Attorney(s) Shannon Grammel to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $100 PHV fee; receipt number AOKNDC-2796434) ) (This entry is the Official Order of the Court. No document is attached.) (JFH1, Chambers)
April 19, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 18 MINUTE ORDER by Chief Judge John F Heil, III , granting Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of attorney Will Thompson for Defendants, provided that local counsel is present at all proceedings, unless otherwise ordered by the Court. Admission is conditioned on the filing of an entry of appearance and registration for electronic case filing by the applicant within seven (7) days from entry of this Order. See LCvR 83.4 and CM/ECF Administrative Guide of Policies and Procedures ; granting #16 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice (Re: #16 MOTION for Attorney(s) Will Thompson to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $100 PHV fee; receipt number AOKNDC-2796420) ) (This entry is the Official Order of the Court. No document is attached.) (JFH1, Chambers)
April 19, 2023 Filing 17 MOTION for Attorney(s) Shannon Grammel to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $100 PHV fee; receipt number AOKNDC-2796434) by Legacy Vivint Smart Home, Inc., Vivint Smart Home, Inc. (With attachments) (Mansinghani, Mithun)
April 19, 2023 Filing 16 MOTION for Attorney(s) Will Thompson to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $100 PHV fee; receipt number AOKNDC-2796420) by Legacy Vivint Smart Home, Inc., Vivint Smart Home, Inc. (With attachments) (Mansinghani, Mithun)
April 7, 2023 Filing 15 MINUTE ORDER by Court Clerk , directing Vivint Smart Home, Inc. and Legacy Vivint Smart Home, Inc. to file a Disclosure Statement pursuant to FRCvP 7.1 and LCvR 7.1-1, if applicable. The parties shall use the form entitled Disclosure Statement available on the Courts website. (This entry is the Official Order of the Court. No document is attached.) (lmt, Dpty Clk)
April 6, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 14 MINUTE ORDER by Chief Judge John F Heil, III : Defendants' Motion to Extend Answer/Responsive Pleading deadline is granted. Defedants shall answer or respond to the complaint no later than May 7, 2023 ; granting #11 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer (Re: #11 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint ) (This entry is the Official Order of the Court. No document is attached.) (JFH1, Chambers)
April 5, 2023 Filing 13 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT (identifying: Corporate Parent NRG Energy, Inc. for Vivint Smart Home, Inc.) by Vivint Smart Home, Inc. (Mansinghani, Mithun)
April 5, 2023 Filing 12 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT (identifying: Corporate Parent Vivint Smart Home, Inc., Corporate Parent NRG Energy, Inc. for Legacy Vivint Smart Home, Inc.) by Legacy Vivint Smart Home, Inc. (Mansinghani, Mithun)
April 5, 2023 Filing 11 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint (Re: #2 Complaint ) by Legacy Vivint Smart Home, Inc., Vivint Smart Home, Inc. (Mansinghani, Mithun)
April 5, 2023 Filing 10 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Mithun S Mansinghani on behalf of All Defendants [Note: Attorney Mithun S Mansinghani added to party Legacy Vivint Smart Home, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Mithun S Mansinghani added to party Vivint Smart Home, Inc.(pty:dft).] (Mansinghani, Mithun)
March 13, 2023 Filing 9 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Caroline Gieser on behalf of Alert 360 OPCO, Inc., Central Security Group - Nationwide, Inc., Guardian Security Systems, Inc. [Note: Attorney Caroline Gieser added to party Alert 360 OPCO, Inc.(pty:pla), Attorney Caroline Gieser added to party Central Security Group - Nationwide, Inc.(pty:pla), Attorney Caroline Gieser added to party Guardian Security Systems, Inc.(pty:pla).] (Gieser, Caroline)
March 9, 2023 Filing 8 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT (identifying: Corporate Parent Alert 360 Topco, Inc, Corporate Parent My Alarm Center, LLC for Central Security Group - Nationwide, Inc.) by Central Security Group - Nationwide, Inc. (Scott, Jason)
March 9, 2023 Filing 7 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT (identifying: Corporate Parent Alert 360 Topco, Inc, Corporate Parent My Alarm Center, LLC for Guardian Security Systems, Inc.) by Guardian Security Systems, Inc. (Scott, Jason)
March 9, 2023 Filing 6 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT (identifying: Corporate Parent Alert 360 Topco, Inc, Corporate Parent My Alarm Center, LLC for Alert 360 OPCO, Inc.) by Alert 360 OPCO, Inc. (Scott, Jason)
March 7, 2023 Filing 5 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Jason Robert Scott on behalf of Alert 360 OPCO, Inc., Central Security Group - Nationwide, Inc., Guardian Security Systems, Inc. [Note: Attorney Jason Robert Scott added to party Alert 360 OPCO, Inc.(pty:pla), Attorney Jason Robert Scott added to party Central Security Group - Nationwide, Inc.(pty:pla), Attorney Jason Robert Scott added to party Guardian Security Systems, Inc.(pty:pla).] (Scott, Jason)
March 2, 2023 Filing 4 MINUTE ORDER by Court Clerk , directing Alert 360 OPCO, Inc., Central Security Group - Nationwide, Inc., and Guardian Security Systems, Inc. to file a Disclosure Statement pursuant to FRCvP 7.1 and LCvR 7.1-1, if applicable. The parties shall use the form entitled Disclosure Statement available on the Courts website. (This entry is the Official Order of the Court. No document is attached.) (lmt, Dpty Clk)
March 1, 2023 Filing 3 SUMMONS Issued by Court Clerk as to Legacy Vivint Smart Home, Inc., Vivint Smart Home, Inc. (blc, Dpty Clk)
March 1, 2023 Filing 2 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against All Defendants (paid $402 filing fee; receipt number AOKNDC-2768900) by Guardian Security Systems, Inc., Central Security Group - Nationwide, Inc., Alert 360 OPCO, Inc. (Christensen, J)
March 1, 2023 Filing 1 CIVIL COVER SHEET by Alert 360 OPCO, Inc., Central Security Group - Nationwide, Inc., Guardian Security Systems, Inc. (Christensen, J)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oklahoma Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Alert 360 OPCO, Inc. et al v. Vivint Smart Home, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Vivint Smart Home, Inc.
Represented By: Mithun S Mansinghani
Represented By: Shannon Marie Grammel
Represented By: William Thomas Thompson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Legacy Vivint Smart Home, Inc.
Represented By: William Thomas Thompson
Represented By: Mithun S Mansinghani
Represented By: Shannon Marie Grammel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mosaic Acquisition Corp.
Represented By: Mithun S Mansinghani
Represented By: Shannon Marie Grammel
Represented By: William Thomas Thompson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alert 360 OPCO, Inc.
Represented By: J Clay Christensen
Represented By: Caroline Gieser
Represented By: Jason Robert Scott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Central Security Group - Nationwide, Inc. doing business as Alert 360
Represented By: J Clay Christensen
Represented By: Caroline Gieser
Represented By: Jason Robert Scott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Guardian Security Systems, Inc. doing business as Alert 360
Represented By: J Clay Christensen
Represented By: Caroline Gieser
Represented By: Jason Robert Scott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?