Utgaard et al v. GT Productions, LLC
Plaintiff: Antje Utgaard, Brenda Geiger, Cielo Jean Gibson, Cora Skinner, Denise Trlica, Eva Pepaj, Hillary Hepner, Ina Schnitzer, Jennifer Archuleta, Jessica Hinton, Joanna Krupa, John Coulter, Katarina Van Derham, Lucy Pinder, Pia Muehlenbeck, Rachel Koren, Rosie Wicks, Sara Underwood, Tara Leigh Patrick and Vida Guerra
Defendant: GT Productions, LLC doing business as Body Shop Joint, The
Case Number: 4:2023cv00086
Filed: March 8, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Oklahoma
Presiding Judge: Gregory K Frizzell
Referring Judge: Christine D Little
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 1125 Trademark Infringement (Lanham Act)
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 2, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 2, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER by Judge Gregory K Frizzell (Deadline: 5/24/2023) ; granting #14 Motion to Amend (Re: #13 Order, Ruling on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer, #14 MOTION to Amend ) (kjp, Dpty Clk)
May 2, 2023 Filing 15 MINUTE ORDER by Court Clerk , directing GT Productions, LLC to file a Disclosure Statement pursuant to FRCvP 7.1 and LCvR 7.1-1, if applicable. The parties shall use the form entitled Disclosure Statement available on the Courts website. (This entry is the Official Order of the Court. No document is attached.) (lmt, Dpty Clk)
May 2, 2023 Filing 14 MOTION to Amend (Re: #13 Order, Ruling on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer ) by GT Productions, LLC (Senger, David)
April 28, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER by Judge Gregory K Frizzell (Deadline: 5/4/2023) ; granting #12 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer (Re: #12 Agreed MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer ) (kjp, Dpty Clk)
April 27, 2023 Filing 12 Agreed MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer (Re: #2 Complaint, ) by GT Productions, LLC (Senger, David)
April 27, 2023 Filing 11 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by David Charles Senger on behalf of GT Productions, LLC (Senger, David)
April 27, 2023 Filing 10 CIVIL COVER SHEET by GT Productions, LLC [Note: Attorney David Charles Senger added to party GT Productions, LLC(pty:dft).] (Senger, David)
March 14, 2023 Filing 9 SUMMONS Issued by Court Clerk as to GT Productions, LLC (dla, Dpty Clk) (Main Document 9 replaced on 3/15/2023 to include mailed to attorney notation) (lmt, Dpty Clk).
March 8, 2023 Filing 8 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Edmund S Aronowitz on behalf of All Plaintiffs [Note: Attorney Edmund S Aronowitz added to party Jennifer Archuleta(pty:pla), Attorney Edmund S Aronowitz added to party John Coulter(pty:pla), Attorney Edmund S Aronowitz added to party Brenda Geiger(pty:pla), Attorney Edmund S Aronowitz added to party Cielo Jean Gibson(pty:pla), Attorney Edmund S Aronowitz added to party Vida Guerra(pty:pla), Attorney Edmund S Aronowitz added to party Hillary Hepner(pty:pla), Attorney Edmund S Aronowitz added to party Jessica Hinton(pty:pla), Attorney Edmund S Aronowitz added to party Rachel Koren(pty:pla), Attorney Edmund S Aronowitz added to party Joanna Krupa(pty:pla), Attorney Edmund S Aronowitz added to party Pia Muehlenbeck(pty:pla), Attorney Edmund S Aronowitz added to party Tara Leigh Patrick(pty:pla), Attorney Edmund S Aronowitz added to party Eva Pepaj(pty:pla), Attorney Edmund S Aronowitz added to party Lucy Pinder(pty:pla), Attorney Edmund S Aronowitz added to party Ina Schnitzer(pty:pla), Attorney Edmund S Aronowitz added to party Cora Skinner(pty:pla), Attorney Edmund S Aronowitz added to party Denise Trlica(pty:pla), Attorney Edmund S Aronowitz added to party Sara Underwood(pty:pla), Attorney Edmund S Aronowitz added to party Antje Utgaard(pty:pla), Attorney Edmund S Aronowitz added to party Katarina Van Derham(pty:pla), Attorney Edmund S Aronowitz added to party Rosie Wicks(pty:pla).] (Aronowitz, Edmund)
March 8, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 7 MINUTE ORDER by Judge Gregory K Frizzell granting plaintiffs' motion for admission pro hac vice [Doc. 6]. Edmund S. Aronowitz is admitted pro hac vice and is directed to file a separate entry of appearance on behalf of plaintiffs forthwith ; granting #6 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice (Re: #6 MOTION for Attorney(s) Edmund S. Aronowitz to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $100 PHV fee; receipt number AOKNDC-2772272) ) (This entry is the Official Order of the Court. No document is attached.) (kjp, Dpty Clk)
March 8, 2023 Filing 6 MOTION for Attorney(s) Edmund S. Aronowitz to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $100 PHV fee; receipt number AOKNDC-2772272) by Jennifer Archuleta, John Coulter, Brenda Geiger, Cielo Jean Gibson, Vida Guerra, Hillary Hepner, Jessica Hinton, Rachel Koren, Joanna Krupa, Pia Muehlenbeck, Tara Leigh Patrick, Eva Pepaj, Lucy Pinder, Ina Schnitzer, Cora Skinner, Denise Trlica, Sara Underwood, Antje Utgaard, Katarina Van Derham, Rosie Wicks (With attachments) (Wells, Joshua)
March 8, 2023 Filing 5 REPORT on Copyrights/Patents/Trademarks (ll, Dpty Clk)
March 8, 2023 Filing 4 MINUTE ORDER by Court Clerk , directing Antje Utgaard, Brenda Geiger, Cielo Jean Gibson, Cora Skinner, Denise Trlica, Eva Pepaj, Hillary Hepner, Ina Schnitzer, Jennifer Archuleta, Jessica Hinton, Joanna Krupa, John Coulter, Katarina Van Derham, Lucy Pinder, Pia Muehlenbeck, Rachel Koren, Rosie Wicks, Sara Underwood,Tara Leigh Patrick, and Vida Guerra to file a Disclosure Statement pursuant to FRCvP 7.1 and LCvR 7.1-1, if applicable. The parties shall use the form entitled Disclosure Statement available on the Courts website. (This entry is the Official Order of the Court. No document is attached.) (ll, Dpty Clk)
March 8, 2023 Filing 3 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Joshua D Wells on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Wells, Joshua)
March 8, 2023 Filing 2 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against All Defendants (paid $402 filing fee; receipt number AOKNDC-2772266) by Sara Underwood, Rosie Wicks, Eva Pepaj, Joanna Krupa, Cora Skinner, Jennifer Archuleta, Antje Utgaard, John Coulter, Hillary Hepner, Pia Muehlenbeck, Katarina Van Derham, Lucy Pinder, Vida Guerra, Brenda Geiger, Denise Trlica, Ina Schnitzer, Tara Leigh Patrick, Jessica Hinton, Rachel Koren, Cielo Jean Gibson (Wells, Joshua)
March 8, 2023 Filing 1 CIVIL COVER SHEET by Jennifer Archuleta, John Coulter, Brenda Geiger, Cielo Jean Gibson, Vida Guerra, Hillary Hepner, Jessica Hinton, Rachel Koren, Joanna Krupa, Pia Muehlenbeck, Tara Leigh Patrick, Eva Pepaj, Lucy Pinder, Ina Schnitzer, Cora Skinner, Denise Trlica, Sara Underwood, Antje Utgaard, Katarina Van Derham, Rosie Wicks (Wells, Joshua)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oklahoma Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Utgaard et al v. GT Productions, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Antje Utgaard
Represented By: Edmund S Aronowitz
Represented By: Joshua D Wells
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brenda Geiger
Represented By: Edmund S Aronowitz
Represented By: Joshua D Wells
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cielo Jean Gibson
Represented By: Edmund S Aronowitz
Represented By: Joshua D Wells
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cora Skinner
Represented By: Edmund S Aronowitz
Represented By: Joshua D Wells
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Denise Trlica
Represented By: Edmund S Aronowitz
Represented By: Joshua D Wells
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eva Pepaj
Represented By: Joshua D Wells
Represented By: Edmund S Aronowitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hillary Hepner
Represented By: Edmund S Aronowitz
Represented By: Joshua D Wells
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ina Schnitzer
Represented By: Joshua D Wells
Represented By: Edmund S Aronowitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jennifer Archuleta
Represented By: Edmund S Aronowitz
Represented By: Joshua D Wells
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jessica Hinton
Represented By: Edmund S Aronowitz
Represented By: Joshua D Wells
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joanna Krupa
Represented By: Joshua D Wells
Represented By: Edmund S Aronowitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Coulter
Represented By: Edmund S Aronowitz
Represented By: Joshua D Wells
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Katarina Van Derham
Represented By: Edmund S Aronowitz
Represented By: Joshua D Wells
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lucy Pinder
Represented By: Edmund S Aronowitz
Represented By: Joshua D Wells
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Pia Muehlenbeck
Represented By: Edmund S Aronowitz
Represented By: Joshua D Wells
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rachel Koren
Represented By: Joshua D Wells
Represented By: Edmund S Aronowitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rosie Wicks
Represented By: Edmund S Aronowitz
Represented By: Joshua D Wells
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sara Underwood
Represented By: Edmund S Aronowitz
Represented By: Joshua D Wells
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tara Leigh Patrick
Represented By: Edmund S Aronowitz
Represented By: Joshua D Wells
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Vida Guerra
Represented By: Edmund S Aronowitz
Represented By: Joshua D Wells
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GT Productions, LLC doing business as Body Shop Joint, The
Represented By: David Charles Senger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?