Remarc Realty, LLC v. Federal National Mortgage Association et al
Plaintiff: Remarc Realty, LLC
Defendant: Federal National Mortgage Association, NationStar Mortgage LLC doing business as Mr. Cooper and Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems, Inc.
Case Number: 4:2023cv00117
Filed: March 27, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Oklahoma
Presiding Judge: Claire V Eagan
Referring Judge: Jodi F Jayne
2 Judge: Mark T Steele
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Petition to Quiet Title
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 12, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 12, 2023 Filing 20 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Remarc Realty, LLC (Linger, James)
May 11, 2023 Filing 19 ERRATA/CORRECTION (Re: #18 Appearance - Attorney ) by Remarc Realty, LLC Modified on 5/11/2023 to correct event type (lmt, Dpty Clk).
May 11, 2023 Filing 18 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by James Carter Linger on behalf of All Plaintiffs [Note: Attorney James Carter Linger added to party Remarc Realty, LLC(pty:pla).] (Linger, James)
May 11, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 17 MINUTE ORDER by Judge Claire V Eagan - Directing counsel Kristina E Bennett-White for plaintiff Remarc Realty, LLC to immediately file plaintiff's Disclosure Statement, which has been past due since 4/3/2023. (Re: 15 Minute Order,,,,, 3 Minute Order,, Directing Party(ies) to File Disclosure Statement, ) (This entry is the Official Order of the Court. No document is attached.) (RGG, Chambers) Modified on 5/11/2023 to correct typographical error in docket text (lmt, Dpty Clk).
May 11, 2023 NOTICE of Docket Entry Modification; Error: wrong event selected (Attorney Appearance); Correction: changed event (Errata/Correction) (Re: #18 Appearance - Attorney ) (lmt, Dpty Clk)
May 5, 2023 Filing 16 MINUTE ORDER by Court Clerk reassigning the magistrate judge in this case pursuant to General Order 23-6, reassigning case to Magistrate Judge Mark T Steele, Magistrate Judge Jodi F Jayne no longer assigned to case, changing case number to 23-cv-117-CVE-MTS (This entry is the Official Order of the Court. No document is attached.) (tjc, Dpty Clk)
May 3, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 15 MINUTE ORDER by Judge Claire V Eagan - Counsel for plaintiff is advised that plaintiff's disclosure statement is now past due (see Dkt. # 3). Plaintiff Remarc Realty, LLC is directed to file forthwith a Disclosure Statement pursuant to FRCvP 7.1 and LCvR 7.1-1, if applicable. The parties shall use the form entitled Disclosure Statement available on the Court's website. (Re: 3 Minute Order,, Directing Party(ies) to File Disclosure Statement, ) (This entry is the Official Order of the Court. No document is attached.) (RGG, Chambers)
May 2, 2023 Filing 14 ANSWER (Re: State Court Petition/Complaint ) by Federal National Mortgage Association (Ommerman, Rachel)
May 2, 2023 Filing 13 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Federal National Mortgage Association (Ommerman, Rachel)
May 2, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER by Judge Claire V Eagan , directing parties to file joint status report ( Status Report due by 6/2/2023) (RGG, Chambers)
May 2, 2023 Filing 11 MINUTE ORDER by Court Clerk , directing Federal National Mortgage Association and Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems, Inc. to file a Disclosure Statement pursuant to FRCvP 7.1 and LCvR 7.1-1, if applicable. The parties shall use the form entitled Disclosure Statement available on the Courts website. (This entry is the Official Order of the Court. No document is attached.) (lmt, Dpty Clk)
May 1, 2023 Filing 10 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Rachel Beth Ommerman on behalf of Federal National Mortgage Association [Note: Attorney Rachel Beth Ommerman added to party Federal National Mortgage Association(pty:dft).] (Ommerman, Rachel)
April 27, 2023 Filing 9 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT (identifying: Corporate Parent MERSCORP Holdings, Inc., Other Affiliate Intercontinental Exchange, Inc., Other Affiliate ICE Mortgage Services, LLC for Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems, Inc.) by Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems, Inc. (Ommerman, Rachel)
April 27, 2023 Filing 8 ANSWER (Re: State Court Petition/Complaint ) by Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems, Inc., NationStar Mortgage LLC (Ommerman, Rachel)
April 27, 2023 Filing 7 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Rachel Beth Ommerman on behalf of Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems, Inc. (Ommerman, Rachel)
April 6, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 6 MINUTE ORDER by Judge Claire V Eagan - The unopposed motion #5 is granted. Defendant Nationstar Mortgage LLC d/b/a Mr. Cooper shall file its answer to the complaint no later than 4/27/2023 as requested. ; setting/resetting deadline(s)/hearing(s): ( Miscellaneous Deadline set for 4/27/2023); granting #5 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer (Re: State Court Petition/Complaint, #5 MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer ) (This entry is the Official Order of the Court. No document is attached.) (RGG, Chambers)
April 6, 2023 Filing 5 MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer (Re: State Court Petition/Complaint ) by NationStar Mortgage LLC (Ommerman, Rachel)
March 30, 2023 Filing 4 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT (identifying: Corporate Parent Mr. Cooper Group Inc., Other Affiliate Vanguard Group, Inc., The, Other Affiliate Nationstar Sub1 LLC, Other Affiliate Nationstar Sub2 LLC, Other Affiliate BlackRock, Inc., Other Affiliate Nationstar Mortgage Holdings Inc. for NationStar Mortgage LLC) by NationStar Mortgage LLC (Ommerman, Rachel)
March 27, 2023 Filing 3 MINUTE ORDER by Court Clerk , directing Remarc Realty, LLC and Nationstar Mortgage LLC, d/b/a Mr. Cooper to file a Disclosure Statement pursuant to FRCvP 7.1 and LCvR 7.1-1, if applicable. The parties shall use the form entitled Disclosure Statement available on the Courts website. (This entry is the Official Order of the Court. No document is attached.) (blc, Dpty Clk)
March 27, 2023 Filing 2 NOTICE of Removal from Tulsa County District Court, case number CV-2023-335 (paid $402 filing fee; receipt number AOKNDC-2783374) by NationStar Mortgage LLC (With attachments) (Ommerman, Rachel)
March 27, 2023 Filing 1 CIVIL COVER SHEET by NationStar Mortgage LLC (Ommerman, Rachel)
February 22, 2023 PETITION/COMPLAINT filed in State Court against Federal National Mortgage Association, Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems, Inc., NationStar Mortgage LLC by Remarc Realty, LLC (blc, Dpty Clk)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oklahoma Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Remarc Realty, LLC v. Federal National Mortgage Association et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Remarc Realty, LLC
Represented By: Kristina E Bennett-White
Represented By: James Carter Linger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Federal National Mortgage Association
Represented By: Rachel Beth Ommerman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NationStar Mortgage LLC doing business as Mr. Cooper
Represented By: Rachel Beth Ommerman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems, Inc.
Represented By: Rachel Beth Ommerman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?