Montero v. Tulsa Airport Improvement Trust et al
Plaintiff: Frank R Montero
Defendant: Tulsa Airport Improvement Trust, City of Tulsa, Tammy Bruce and T.A.I.T. City of Tulsa, Tulsa, -Ok
Case Number: 4:2023cv00118
Filed: March 27, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Oklahoma
Presiding Judge: Claire V Eagan
Referring Judge: Susan E Huntsman
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 17, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 17, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 15 MAIL to Frank R Montero Returned - remailed on 05/17/2023 to Frank R Montero, 10041 So 91st East Avenue, Tulsa, OK 74133- address obtained from Notice of Appeal. (Re: appeal forms #11 ) (blc, Dpty Clk) Modified on 5/17/2023 to add language re address and to link to Notice of Appeal (blc, Dpty Clk).
April 11, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 14 APPEAL NUMBER INFORMATION from Circuit Court assigning Case Number 23-5039 (#11) (Re: #11 Notice of Appeal to Circuit Court ) (lmt, Dpty Clk)
April 11, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 13 PRELIMINARY RECORD Sent to Circuit Court (Re: #11 Notice of Appeal to Circuit Court ) (dla, Dpty Clk)
April 10, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ***Remark: misdirected notice of appeal documents received from 10th Circuit (Re: #11 Notice of Appeal to Circuit Court ) (lmt, Dpty Clk)
April 10, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 11 NOTICE OF APPEAL to Circuit Court (Re: #4 Opinion and Order,,,, Ruling on Motion to Proceed in Forma Pauperis, #5 Judgment, Dismissing/Terminating Case, ) by Frank R Montero (dla, Dpty Clk)
April 3, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 10 AFFIDAVIT/CERTIFICATE/PROOF/RETURN of Service by Frank R Montero (mlb, Dpty Clk)
April 3, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 9 AFFIDAVIT/CERTIFICATE/PROOF/RETURN of Service by Frank R Montero (mlb, Dpty Clk)
April 3, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 8 AFFIDAVIT/CERTIFICATE/PROOF/RETURN of Service by Frank R Montero (mlb, Dpty Clk)
April 3, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 7 AFFIDAVIT/CERTIFICATE/PROOF/RETURN of Service by Frank R Montero (mlb, Dpty Clk) Modified on 4/3/2023 to reflect correct event (mlb, Dpty Clk).
April 3, 2023 Opinion or Order NOTICE of Docket Entry Modification; Error: incorrect event used; Correction: Modified docket text to reflect correct event (Re: #7 Summons Returned Executed ) (mlb, Dpty Clk)
March 31, 2023 Opinion or Order ***Civil Case Terminated (see document number #5 ) (lmt, Dpty Clk)
March 31, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 6 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Frank R Montero (lmt, Dpty Clk)
March 31, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 5 JUDGMENT by Judge Claire V Eagan (JUDGMENT OF DISMISSAL), dismissing/terminating case (terminates case) (Re: #4 Opinion and Order,,,, Ruling on Motion to Proceed in Forma Pauperis, ) (RGG, Chambers)
March 31, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 4 OPINION AND ORDER by Judge Claire V Eagan - Plaintiff's complaint (Dkt. # 1) is dismissed for lack of subject matter jurisdiction. A separate judgment of dismissal is entered herewith. Plaintiff's motion to proceed in forma pauperis (Dkt. # 2) is moot. ; finding as moot #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in Forma Pauperis (Re: #1 Complaint, #2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in Forma Pauperis ) (RGG, Chambers)
March 29, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 3 MINUTE ORDER by Court Clerk , directing Frank R Montero to file a Disclosure Statement pursuant to FRCvP 7.1 and LCvR 7.1-1, if applicable. The parties shall use the form entitled Disclosure Statement available on the Courts website. (This entry is the Official Order of the Court. No document is attached.) (blc, Dpty Clk)
March 27, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in Forma Pauperis by Frank R Montero (blc, Dpty Clk)
March 27, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against Tammy Bruce, City of Tulsa, Tulsa Airport Improvement Trust by Frank R Montero (blc, Dpty Clk)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oklahoma Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Montero v. Tulsa Airport Improvement Trust et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Frank R Montero
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tulsa Airport Improvement Trust
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Tulsa
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tammy Bruce
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: T.A.I.T. City of Tulsa, Tulsa, -Ok
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?