Community Builders, Inc. v. Cox Media, LLC et al
Defendant: Cox Media, Cox Media, Inc., Cox Media Group Tulsa, Cox Media Group NE, Inc., Cox Radio, Inc. and Cox Local Solutions in Oklahoma
Counter Defendant: Community Builders, Inc. and Gregory J Wolter
Counter Claimant: Cox Media, LLC
Case Number: 4:2023cv00194
Filed: May 11, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Oklahoma
Presiding Judge: Terence Kern
Referring Judge: Christine D Little
2 Judge: Mark T Steele
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441 Petition for Removal- Breach of Contract
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 7, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 7, 2023 Filing 23 SUMMONS Issued by Court Clerk as to Gregory J Wolter (dla, Dpty Clk)
June 30, 2023 Filing 22 AMENDED COUNTERCLAIM against Community Builders, Inc., Gregory J Wolter (Re: #20 Counterclaim ) by Cox Media, LLC (With attachments) (Potts, Sara) Modified on 7/7/2023 to add additional "against" party (srt, Dpty Clk).
June 23, 2023 Filing 21 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT (identifying: Corporate Parent Cox Communications, Inc., Corporate Parent Cox Enterprises, Inc., Corporate Parent Cox LAHC. Inc for Cox Media, LLC) by Cox Media, LLC (Potts, Sara)
June 21, 2023 Filing 20 COUNTERCLAIM against Community Builders, Inc. by Cox Media, LLC (Potts, Sara)
June 21, 2023 Filing 19 ANSWER (Re: State Court Petition/Complaint ) by Cox Media, LLC (Potts, Sara)
June 20, 2023 Filing 18 NOTICE of Dismissal, dismissing Cox Local Solutions in Oklahoma, (Re: State Court Petition/Complaint ) by Community Builders, Inc. (Oxford, Benjamin)
June 20, 2023 Filing 17 NOTICE of Dismissal, dismissing Cox Media Group Tulsa, (Re: State Court Petition/Complaint ) by Community Builders, Inc. (Oxford, Benjamin)
June 20, 2023 Filing 16 NOTICE of Dismissal, dismissing Cox Media Group NE, Inc., (Re: State Court Petition/Complaint ) by Community Builders, Inc. (Oxford, Benjamin)
June 20, 2023 Filing 15 NOTICE of Dismissal, dismissing Cox Media, Inc., (Re: State Court Petition/Complaint ) by Community Builders, Inc. (Oxford, Benjamin)
June 20, 2023 Filing 14 NOTICE of Dismissal, dismissing Cox Media, (Re: State Court Petition/Complaint ) by Community Builders, Inc. (Oxford, Benjamin)
June 20, 2023 Filing 13 NOTICE of Dismissal, dismissing Cox Radio, Inc, (Re: State Court Petition/Complaint ) by Community Builders, Inc. (Oxford, Benjamin)
June 13, 2023 Filing 12 MINUTE ORDER by Court Clerk, reassigning case to Magistrate Judge Mark T Steele, Magistrate Judge Christine D Little no longer assigned to case, changing case number to 23-cv-194-TCK-MTS (This entry is the Official Order of the Court. No document is attached.) (srt, Dpty Clk)
June 7, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER by Judge Terence Kern Granting Second Unopposed Motion for Extension. Defendant Cox Media, LLC's response to Petition is due 6/21/2023 ; granting #10 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer (Re: #10 Second MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer ) (lmc, Chambers)
June 7, 2023 Filing 10 Second MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer (Re: State Court Petition/Complaint ) by Cox Media, LLC (Brightmire, Jon)
May 17, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 9 MINUTE ORDER by Judge Terence Kern - Defendant's Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time (Dkt. 8) is granted. Defendant's response to Plaintiff's Petition is due 6/7/2023 ; granting #8 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer (Re: #8 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer ) (This entry is the Official Order of the Court. No document is attached.) (lmc, Chambers)
May 17, 2023 Filing 8 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer (Re: State Court Petition/Complaint ) by Cox Media, LLC (Brightmire, Jon)
May 11, 2023 Filing 7 MINUTE ORDER by Court Clerk , directing Community Builders, Inc., Cox Media, Cox Media, Inc., Cox Media, LLC, Cox Media Group Tulsa, Cox Media Group NE, Inc., Cox Radio, Inc., Cox Local Solutions in Oklahoma to file a Disclosure Statement pursuant to FRCvP 7.1 and LCvR 7.1-1, if applicable. The parties shall use the form entitled Disclosure Statement available on the Courts website. (This entry is the Official Order of the Court. No document is attached.) (mlb, Dpty Clk)
May 11, 2023 Filing 6 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Michael John English on behalf of Cox Media, LLC (English, Michael)
May 11, 2023 Filing 5 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Jon E Brightmire on behalf of Cox Media, LLC (Brightmire, Jon)
May 11, 2023 Filing 4 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Sara Elizabeth Potts on behalf of Cox Media, LLC (Potts, Sara)
May 11, 2023 Filing 3 STATUS REPORT on Removed Action by Cox Media, LLC (Potts, Sara)
May 11, 2023 Filing 2 NOTICE of Removal from Tulsa County, case number CJ-2022-03526 (paid $402 filing fee; receipt number AOKNDC-2809205) by Cox Media, LLC (With attachments) (Potts, Sara)
May 11, 2023 Filing 1 CIVIL COVER SHEET by Cox Media, LLC (Potts, Sara)
November 18, 2022 PETITION/COMPLAINT with Jury Demand filed in State Court against All Defendants by Community Builders, Inc. (mlb, Dpty Clk)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oklahoma Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Community Builders, Inc. v. Cox Media, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter defendant: Community Builders, Inc.
Represented By: Benjamin J Oxford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter defendant: Gregory J Wolter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cox Media
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cox Media, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cox Media Group Tulsa
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cox Media Group NE, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cox Radio, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cox Local Solutions in Oklahoma
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter claimant: Cox Media, LLC
Represented By: Jon E Brightmire
Represented By: Michael John English
Represented By: Sara Elizabeth Potts
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?