Hardy v. NiSource Inc.
Plaintiff: Joshua Hardy
Defendant: NiSource Inc.
Case Number: 4:2023cv00204
Filed: May 12, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Oklahoma
Office: Tulsa Office
Presiding Judge: Susan E Huntsman
Referring Judge: Terence Kern
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 201 Denial of Overtime Compensation
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 28, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 28, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 42 ORDER by Judge Terence Kern Granting Joint Stipulation to Stay Pending Arbitration, staying case (Re: #41 Stipulation ) (lmc, Chambers)
June 23, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 41 Joint STIPULATION to Stay Pending Arbitration by Joshua Hardy (Fitz, Carl)
May 23, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 40 MINUTE ORDER by Judge Terence Kern - Defendant's Motion for Relief from Local Counsel Requirement (Dkt. 35) is granted. Non-Resident counsel, Jessica L. Craft, is allowed to appear without local counsel. ; granting #35 Motion for Relief (Re: #35 MOTION for Relief from Local Counsel Requirement and Brief in Support Thereof ) (This entry is the Official Order of the Court. No document is attached.) (lmc, Chambers)
May 22, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Michael A Josephson on behalf of Joshua Hardy [Note: Attorney Michael A Josephson added to party Joshua Hardy(pty:pla).] (Josephson, Michael)
May 22, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Carl A. Fitz on behalf of Joshua Hardy [Note: Attorney Carl A. Fitz added to party Joshua Hardy(pty:pla).] (Fitz, Carl)
May 19, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 37 MINUTE ORDER by Judge Terence Kern denying the Motion to Stay and granting the Alternative Motion to extend the time in which Defendant may file its responsive pleading by forty (40) days, making its responsive pleading due on or before June 28, 2023. ; granting in part and denying in part #36 Motion to Stay (Re: #36 Unopposed MOTION to Stay , or in the alternative, Motion for Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Plead ) (This entry is the Official Order of the Court. No document is attached.) (lmc, Chambers)
May 19, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 36 Unopposed MOTION to Stay , or in the alternative, Motion for Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Plead by NiSource Inc. (Craft, Jessica)
May 19, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 35 MOTION for Relief from Local Counsel Requirement and Brief in Support Thereof by NiSource Inc. (Craft, Jessica)
May 19, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Jessica L. Craft on behalf of NiSource Inc. [Note: Attorney Jessica L. Craft added to party NiSource Inc.(pty:dft).] (Craft, Jessica)
May 12, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 33 LETTER re: Local Counsel Requirement sent to Bianca V Black (dla, Dpty Clk)
May 12, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 32 LETTER re: Local Counsel Requirement sent to Ryan Steinhart (dla, Dpty Clk)
May 12, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 31 LETTER re: Local Counsel Requirement sent to Carl A Fitz (dla, Dpty Clk)
May 12, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 30 LETTER re: Local Counsel Requirement sent to Andrew Dunlap (dla, Dpty Clk)
May 12, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 29 MINUTE ORDER by Court Clerk , changing case number to 23-cv-204-TCK-SH (This entry is the Official Order of the Court. No document is attached.) (dla, Dpty Clk)
May 12, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 28 MINUTE ORDER by Court Clerk , directing Joshua Hardy and NiSource Inc. to file a Disclosure Statement pursuant to FRCvP 7.1 and LCvR 7.1-1, if applicable. The parties shall use the form entitled Disclosure Statement available on the Courts website. (This entry is the Official Order of the Court. No document is attached.) (dla, Dpty Clk)
May 12, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 27 CASE TRANSFERRED IN from Indiana Northern
May 12, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 26 OPINION AND ORDER: The GRANTS the Motion to Transfer #16 and DIRECTS the Clerk of Court to transfer this case to the United States District Court for th Northern District of Oklahoma. Signed by Magistrate Judge John E Martin on 5/12/2023. (rmf) [Transferred from Indiana Northern on 5/12/2023.]
February 10, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 25 REPLY to Response to Motion re #16 First MOTION to Transfer Case filed by NiSource Inc.. (Black, Bianca) [Transferred from Indiana Northern on 5/12/2023.]
February 9, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER granting #23 Application to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Carl A Fitz PHV for Joshua Hardy. Signed by Magistrate Judge John E Martin on 2/9/2023. (ace) [Transferred from Indiana Northern on 5/12/2023.]
February 7, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 23 Application for Attorney Carl A. Fitz to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Joshua Hardy. Pro Hac Vice fee of $ 96 has been received, receipt number AINNDC-5153281 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A - Federal Court Admissions, #2 Exhibit Certificate pf Good Standing)(Fitz, Carl) [Transferred from Indiana Northern on 5/12/2023.]
January 31, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER granting #21 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Ryan Steinhart PHV ORDERED WITHDRAWN. Text order entry. By Magistrate Judge John E Martin on 1/31/2023. (smb) [Transferred from Indiana Northern on 5/12/2023.]
January 30, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 21 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney Ryan Steinhart by Plaintiff Joshua Hardy. (Dunlap PHV, Andrew) [Transferred from Indiana Northern on 5/12/2023.]
January 30, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 20 NOTICE by Joshua Hardy of Consent for Travis Herring (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Notice of Consent)(Dunlap PHV, Andrew) [Transferred from Indiana Northern on 5/12/2023.]
January 27, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 19 RESPONSE to Motion re #16 First MOTION to Transfer Case filed by Joshua Hardy. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Order Confirming Second Modified Plan, #2 Exhibit 2 - Notice re: Executory Contracts Assumed, #3 Exhibit 3 - Notice re: Additional Executory Contracts Assumed, #4 Exhibit 4 - Order for Joint Administration, #5 Exhibit 5 - Notice of Effective Date)(Dunlap PHV, Andrew) [Transferred from Indiana Northern on 5/12/2023.]
January 4, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 18 NOTICE by Joshua Hardy re #16 First MOTION to Transfer Case of Parties Agreement to Extend Briefing Deadlines (Dunlap PHV, Andrew) [Transferred from Indiana Northern on 5/12/2023.]
January 3, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER VACATING the Preliminary Rule 16b Pretrial Conference on 1/12/2023 and related deadline to submit a joint proposed discovery plan pending ruling on #16 First MOTION to Transfer Case filed by NiSource Inc. Text entry order. By Magistrate Judge John E Martin on 1/4/2023. (smb) [Transferred from Indiana Northern on 5/12/2023.]
December 23, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 16 First MOTION to Transfer Case by Defendant NiSource Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1 - Declaration of Kim Thompson)(Black, Bianca) [Transferred from Indiana Northern on 5/12/2023.]
December 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER granting #13 Application to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Ryan Steinhart PHV for Joshua Hardy. Signed by Magistrate Judge John E Martin on 12/22/2022. (ace) [Transferred from Indiana Northern on 5/12/2023.]
December 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER granting #12 Application to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Andrew Dunlap PHV for Joshua Hardy. Signed by Magistrate Judge John E Martin on 12/21/2022. (ace) [Transferred from Indiana Northern on 5/12/2023.]
December 20, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 13 Application for Attorney Ryan W. Steinhart to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Joshua Hardy. Pro Hac Vice fee of $ 96 has been received, receipt number AINNDC-5111759 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing)(Dunlap, Andrew) [Transferred from Indiana Northern on 5/12/2023.]
November 30, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 12 Application for Attorney Andrew Dunlap to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Joshua Hardy. Pro Hac Vice fee of $ 96 has been received, receipt number AINNDC-5092240 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Dunlap, Andrew) (Additional attachment(s) added on 12/20/2022: #2 Federal Court Admission Addendum) (ace). [Transferred from Indiana Northern on 5/12/2023.]
November 23, 2022 Opinion or Order Set Answer Deadlines: NiSource Inc. answer due 12/23/2022 re #7 . (nhc) [Transferred from Indiana Northern on 5/12/2023.]
November 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 11 MAGISTRATE JUDGE CONSENT FORMS sent to all parties.. (smb) [Transferred from Indiana Northern on 5/12/2023.]
November 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER & NOTICE OF HEARING: Telephonic Rule 16 Preliminary Pretrial Conference set for 1/12/2023 01:00 PM Central before Magistrate Judge John E Martin. Proposed joint discovery plan in accordance with FRCP 26(f) due by 1/6/2023. Signed by Magistrate Judge John E Martin on 11/22/2022. (smb) [Transferred from Indiana Northern on 5/12/2023.]
November 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER: Each party and each attorney in this case shall take reasonable steps to preserve electronically stored information (ESI) that is relevant to any claim or defense in this case, whether or not the information is admissible at trial. This requirement relates back to the point in time when the party or attorney reasonably anticipated litigation about these matters. Text entry order. By Magistrate Judge John E Martin on 11/22/2022. (smb) [Transferred from Indiana Northern on 5/12/2023.]
November 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 8 Corporate Disclosure Statement by NiSource Inc.. (Black, Bianca) [Transferred from Indiana Northern on 5/12/2023.]
November 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 7 AGREED NOTICE to extend time to file answer filed by NiSource Inc. ; answer due by December 23, 2022. (Black, Bianca) [Transferred from Indiana Northern on 5/12/2023.]
November 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Bianca V Black on behalf of All Defendants (Black, Bianca) [Transferred from Indiana Northern on 5/12/2023.]
November 9, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Joshua Hardy. NiSource Inc. served on 11/7/2022, answer due 11/28/2022. (Werman, Douglas) [Transferred from Indiana Northern on 5/12/2023.]
November 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Summons Issued as to NiSource Inc.. NOTE:The attached document is accessible by court personnel only. Summons forms that were electronically submitted to the court for issuance will be returned to counsel via e-mail. (rmf) [Transferred from Indiana Northern on 5/12/2023.]
November 2, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Proposed Summons filed by Joshua Hardy. (Werman, Douglas) [Transferred from Indiana Northern on 5/12/2023.]
November 1, 2022 Opinion or Order Counsel did not submit Summons or a Notice of Request for Waiver of Service. (sej) [Transferred from Indiana Northern on 5/12/2023.]
November 1, 2022 Opinion or Order **NEW CASE** Judge Theresa L Springmann and Magistrate Judge John E Martin added. (sej) [Transferred from Indiana Northern on 5/12/2023.]
November 1, 2022 Opinion or Order **Case reassigned due to initial assignment error** Judge Philip P Simon added. Judge Theresa L Springmann no longer assigned to case. (sej) [Transferred from Indiana Northern on 5/12/2023.]
October 31, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Douglas M Werman on behalf of Joshua Hardy (Werman, Douglas) [Transferred from Indiana Northern on 5/12/2023.]
October 31, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against NiSource Inc.( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number AINNDC-5065471.), filed by Joshua Hardy. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Werman, Douglas) [Transferred from Indiana Northern on 5/12/2023.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oklahoma Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hardy v. NiSource Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joshua Hardy
Represented By: Andrew Dunlap PHV
Represented By: Ryan Steinhart PHV
Represented By: Carl A Fitz PHV
Represented By: Douglas M Werman
Represented By: Carl A. Fitz
Represented By: Michael A Josephson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NiSource Inc.
Represented By: Bianca V Black
Represented By: Jessica L. Craft
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?