Robertson v Calyx Energy III, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Billy Robertson, Sampson Dyer, Joseph Freeman, Matthew Wright, Taylor Deer, Jacob Lee Osborn, Dylan Scott Henderson, Kenny Ashley, Paul J Crayk and Eddie Edmundson
Defendant: Calyx Energy III, LLC and Riverside Midstream Water Resources, LLC
Case Number: 4:2023cv00234
Filed: June 7, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Oklahoma
Presiding Judge: Claire V Eagan
Referring Judge: Christine D Little
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 201 Fair Labor Standards Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 21, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 21, 2023 Filing 28 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT (identifying: Corporate Parent Calyx Energy III Holdings, LLC for Calyx Energy III, LLC) by Calyx Energy III, LLC (Fields, Robin)
July 21, 2023 Filing 27 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT (identifying: Corporate Parent Calyx Energy III, LLC for Riverside Midstream Water Resources, LLC) by Riverside Midstream Water Resources, LLC (Fields, Robin)
July 13, 2023 Filing 26 MINUTE ORDER by Court Clerk , directing Paul J Crayk and Eddie Edmundson to file a Disclosure Statement pursuant to FRCvP 7.1 and LCvR 7.1-1, if applicable. The parties shall use the form entitled Disclosure Statement available on the Courts website. (This entry is the Official Order of the Court. No document is attached.) (dla, Dpty Clk)
July 12, 2023 Filing 25 MINUTE ORDER by Court Clerk , directing Calyx Energy III, LLC and Riverside Midstream Water Resources, LLC to file a Disclosure Statement pursuant to FRCvP 7.1 and LCvR 7.1-1, if applicable. The parties shall use the form entitled Disclosure Statement available on the Courts website. (This entry is the Official Order of the Court. No document is attached.) (dla, Dpty Clk)
July 11, 2023 Filing 24 NOTICE of Consent(s) to Join by Paul J. Crayk, Eddie Edmundson [Note: Attorney Philip Bohrer added to party Paul J. Crayk(pty:pla), Attorney Philip Bohrer added to party Eddie Edmundson(pty:pla).] (Bohrer, Philip)
July 10, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 23 MINUTE ORDER by Judge Claire V Eagan - The unopposed motion #22 is granted. Defendants shall file their answers or other responsive pleadings no later than 8/11/2023 as requested. ; setting/resetting deadline(s)/hearing(s): ( Miscellaneous Deadline set for 8/11/2023); granting #22 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer (Re: #1 Complaint, #22 Agreed MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer ) (This entry is the Official Order of the Court. No document is attached.) (RGG, Chambers)
July 10, 2023 Filing 22 Agreed MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer (Re: #1 Complaint ) by Calyx Energy III, LLC, Riverside Midstream Water Resources, LLC (Fields, Robin)
July 10, 2023 Filing 21 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Robin F Fields on behalf of All Defendants [Note: Attorney Robin F Fields added to party Calyx Energy III, LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Robin F Fields added to party Riverside Midstream Water Resources, LLC(pty:dft).] (Fields, Robin)
June 29, 2023 Filing 20 MINUTE ORDER by Court Clerk , directing Kenny Ashley to file a Disclosure Statement pursuant to FRCvP 7.1 and LCvR 7.1-1, if applicable. The parties shall use the form entitled Disclosure Statement available on the Courts website. (This entry is the Official Order of the Court. No document is attached.) (lmt, Dpty Clk)
June 27, 2023 Filing 19 NOTICE of Consent(s) to Join by Kenny Ashley [Note: Attorney Philip Bohrer added to party Kenny Ashley(pty:pla).] (Bohrer, Philip)
June 22, 2023 Filing 18 SUMMONS Returned Executed re: Riverside Midstream Water Resources, LLC (Re: #1 Complaint ) by Billy Robertson (Bohrer, Philip)
June 22, 2023 Filing 17 SUMMONS Returned Executed re: Calyx Energy III, LLC (Re: #1 Complaint ) by Billy Robertson (Bohrer, Philip)
June 22, 2023 Filing 16 MINUTE ORDER by Court Clerk , directing Dylan Scott Henderson to file a Disclosure Statement pursuant to FRCvP 7.1 and LCvR 7.1-1, if applicable. The parties shall use the form entitled Disclosure Statement available on the Courts website. (This entry is the Official Order of the Court. No document is attached.) (blc, Dpty Clk)
June 21, 2023 Filing 15 MINUTE ORDER by Court Clerk , directing Jacob Lee Osborn to file a Disclosure Statement pursuant to FRCvP 7.1 and LCvR 7.1-1, if applicable. The parties shall use the form entitled Disclosure Statement available on the Courts website. (This entry is the Official Order of the Court. No document is attached.) (blc, Dpty Clk)
June 20, 2023 Filing 14 NOTICE of Consent(s) to Join by Dylan Scott Henderson [Note: Attorney Philip Bohrer added to party Dylan Scott Henderson(pty:pla).] (Bohrer, Philip)
June 20, 2023 Filing 13 MINUTE ORDER by Court Clerk , directing Taylor Deer to file a Disclosure Statement pursuant to FRCvP 7.1 and LCvR 7.1-1, if applicable. The parties shall use the form entitled Disclosure Statement available on the Courts website. (This entry is the Official Order of the Court. No document is attached.) (blc, Dpty Clk)
June 19, 2023 Filing 12 NOTICE of Consent(s) to Join by Jacob Lee Osborn [Note: Attorney Philip Bohrer added to party Jacob Lee Osborn(pty:pla).] (Bohrer, Philip) Modified on 6/20/2023 to edit filers (blc, Dpty Clk).
June 16, 2023 Filing 11 NOTICE of Consent(s) to Join by Taylor Deer [Note: Attorney Philip Bohrer added to party Taylor Deer(pty:pla).] (Bohrer, Philip) Modified on 6/20/2023 to edit filers (blc, Dpty Clk).
June 13, 2023 Filing 10 MINUTE ORDER by Court Clerk , directing Sampson Dyer, Joseph Freeman, and Matthew Wright to file a Disclosure Statement pursuant to FRCvP 7.1 and LCvR 7.1-1, if applicable. The parties shall use the form entitled Disclosure Statement available on the Courts website. (This entry is the Official Order of the Court. No document is attached.) (lmt, Dpty Clk)
June 12, 2023 Filing 9 MINUTE ORDER by Court Clerk , directing Sampson Dyer, Joseph Freeman and Matthew Wright to file a Disclosure Statement pursuant to FRCvP 7.1 and LCvR 7.1-1, if applicable. The parties shall use the form entitled Disclosure Statement available on the Courts website. (This entry is the Official Order of the Court. No document is attached.) (blc, Dpty Clk)
June 12, 2023 NOTICE of Docket Entry Modification; Error: wrong event selected; Correction: corrected event (Notice of Consent(s) to Join) (Re: #8 Notice (Other) ) (blc, Dpty Clk)
June 9, 2023 Filing 8 NOTICE of Consent(s) to Join by by Billy Robertson, Sampson Dyer, Joseph Freeman and Matthew Wright (Bohrer, Philip) Modified on 6/12/2023 to correct event and add all filers (blc, Dpty Clk).
June 8, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 7 MINUTE ORDER by Judge Claire V Eagan - Plaintiff's counsel, Philip Bohrer, advises the Court that he was admitted to practice in the Northern District of Oklahoma on June 6, 2023. Therefore, Attorney Bohrer's motion for relief from local counsel requirement (Dkt. # 6) is granted. Counsel is reminded that all future proposed orders shall be submitted in Word or WordPerfect format to the Court's CM/ECF Intake Box, and not as a PDF attachment to a pleading. ; granting #6 Motion for Relief (Re: #3 Letter re: Local Counsel Requirement, #6 MOTION for Relief from Local Rule LGnR4-3(a) Association of Local Counsel Requirement ) (This entry is the Official Order of the Court. No document is attached.) (RGG, Chambers)
June 7, 2023 Filing 6 MOTION for Relief from Local Rule LGnR4-3(a) Association of Local Counsel Requirement by Billy Robertson (With attachments) (Bohrer, Philip)
June 7, 2023 Filing 5 SUMMONS Issued by Court Clerk as to Calyx Energy III, LLC, Riverside Midstream Water Resources, LLC (dla, Dpty Clk)
June 7, 2023 Filing 4 MINUTE ORDER by Court Clerk , directing Billy Robertson to file a Disclosure Statement pursuant to FRCvP 7.1 and LCvR 7.1-1, if applicable. The parties shall use the form entitled Disclosure Statement available on the Courts website. (This entry is the Official Order of the Court. No document is attached.) (mlb, Dpty Clk)
June 7, 2023 Filing 3 LETTER re: Local Counsel Requirement sent to Philip Bohrer (mlb, Dpty Clk)
June 7, 2023 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET by Billy Robertson (Bohrer, Philip)
June 7, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against Calyx Energy III, LLC, Riverside Midstream Water Resources, LLC (paid $402 filing fee; receipt number AOKNDC-2822653) by Billy Robertson (With attachments) (Bohrer, Philip)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oklahoma Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Robertson v Calyx Energy III, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Billy Robertson
Represented By: Philip Bohrer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sampson Dyer
Represented By: Philip Bohrer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joseph Freeman
Represented By: Philip Bohrer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Matthew Wright
Represented By: Philip Bohrer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Taylor Deer
Represented By: Philip Bohrer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jacob Lee Osborn
Represented By: Philip Bohrer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dylan Scott Henderson
Represented By: Philip Bohrer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kenny Ashley
Represented By: Philip Bohrer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Paul J Crayk
Represented By: Philip Bohrer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eddie Edmundson
Represented By: Philip Bohrer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Calyx Energy III, LLC
Represented By: Robin F Fields
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Riverside Midstream Water Resources, LLC
Represented By: Robin F Fields
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?