Novo Nordisk A/S et al v. Ross Medical Care, P.C.
Plaintiff: Novo Nordisk A/S and Novo Nordisk Inc.
Defendant: Ross Medical Care, P.C.
Case Number: 4:2023cv00256
Filed: June 27, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Oklahoma
Presiding Judge: Gregory K Frizzell
Referring Judge: Susan E Huntsman
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 1114 Trademark Infringement
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 14, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 14, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER by Judge Gregory K Frizzell extending deadline to 10/18/2023 ; granting #29 Motion to Accelerate/Extend/Reset Hearing(s)/Deadline(s) (Re: #29 Unopposed MOTION to Accelerate/Extend/Reset Hearing(s)/Deadline(s) ) (alg, Dpty Clk)
September 14, 2023 Filing 29 Unopposed MOTION to Accelerate/Extend/Reset Hearing(s)/Deadline(s) by Ross Medical Care, P.C. (King, Michael)
August 17, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER by Judge Gregory K Frizzell (Deadline extended to 9/17/2023) ; granting #27 Motion to Accelerate/Extend/Reset Hearing(s)/Deadline(s) (Re: #27 Unopposed MOTION to Accelerate/Extend/Reset Hearing(s)/Deadline(s) ) (kjp, Dpty Clk)
August 17, 2023 Filing 27 Unopposed MOTION to Accelerate/Extend/Reset Hearing(s)/Deadline(s) by Ross Medical Care, P.C. (King, Michael)
August 7, 2023 Filing 26 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Joseph N Akrotirianakis on behalf of Novo Nordisk A/S, Novo Nordisk Inc. [Note: Attorney Joseph N Akrotirianakis added to party Novo Nordisk A/S(pty:pla), Attorney Joseph N Akrotirianakis added to party Novo Nordisk Inc.(pty:pla).] (Akrotirianakis, Joseph)
August 4, 2023 Filing 25 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Bruce W. Baber on behalf of Novo Nordisk A/S, Novo Nordisk Inc. [Note: Attorney Bruce W. Baber added to party Novo Nordisk A/S(pty:pla), Attorney Bruce W. Baber added to party Novo Nordisk Inc.(pty:pla).] (Baber, Bruce)
August 3, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 24 MINUTE ORDER by Judge Gregory K Frizzell granting plaintiffs' motions for admission pro hac vice [Docs. 21 & 22]. Bruce W. Baber and Joseph N. Akrotirianakis are admitted pro hac vice and are directed to file separate entries of appearances forthwith. ; granting #21 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice; granting #22 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice (Re: #21 MOTION for Attorney(s) Bruce W. Baber to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $100 PHV fee; receipt number AOKNDC-2852257), #22 MOTION for Attorney(s) Joseph N. Akrotirianakis to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $100 PHV fee; receipt number AOKNDC-2852402) ) (This entry is the Official Order of the Court. No document is attached.) (kjp, Dpty Clk)
August 2, 2023 Filing 23 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Aaron Samuel Bennett Craig on behalf of Novo Nordisk A/S, Novo Nordisk Inc. (Craig, Aaron)
August 2, 2023 Filing 22 MOTION for Attorney(s) Joseph N. Akrotirianakis to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $100 PHV fee; receipt number AOKNDC-2852402) by Novo Nordisk A/S, Novo Nordisk Inc. (With attachments) (Sullivan, Timothy)
August 2, 2023 Filing 21 MOTION for Attorney(s) Bruce W. Baber to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $100 PHV fee; receipt number AOKNDC-2852257) by Novo Nordisk A/S, Novo Nordisk Inc. (With attachments) (Sullivan, Timothy)
August 2, 2023 Filing 20 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Ross Medical Care, P.C. (Pittman, Spencer)
August 2, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 19 MINUTE ORDER by Judge Gregory K Frizzell granting plaintiffs' motion for admission pro hac vice of Aaron B. Craig [Doc. 18]. Counsel is directed to file separate entry of appearance forthwith. ; granting #18 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice (Re: #18 MOTION for Attorney(s) Aaron B. Craig to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $100 PHV fee; receipt number AOKNDC-2851944) ) (This entry is the Official Order of the Court. No document is attached.) (kjp, Dpty Clk)
August 2, 2023 Filing 18 MOTION for Attorney(s) Aaron B. Craig to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $100 PHV fee; receipt number AOKNDC-2851944) by Novo Nordisk A/S, Novo Nordisk Inc. (With attachments) (Sullivan, Timothy)
July 31, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER by Judge Gregory K Frizzell , Consent Preliminary Injunction Order ; granting #15 Motion for Preliminary Injunction (Re: #15 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction ) (kjp, Dpty Clk)
July 31, 2023 Filing 16 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Spencer Conrad Pittman on behalf of Ross Medical Care, P.C. (Pittman, Spencer)
July 28, 2023 Filing 15 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by Novo Nordisk A/S, Novo Nordisk Inc. (Sullivan, Timothy)
July 20, 2023 Filing 14 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Timothy J Sullivan, II on behalf of Novo Nordisk A/S, Novo Nordisk Inc. [Note: Attorney Timothy J Sullivan, II added to party Novo Nordisk A/S(pty:pla), Attorney Timothy J Sullivan, II added to party Novo Nordisk Inc.(pty:pla).] (Sullivan, Timothy)
July 20, 2023 Filing 13 MINUTE ORDER by Court Clerk , directing Ross Medical Care, P.C. to file a Disclosure Statement pursuant to FRCvP 7.1 and LCvR 7.1-1, if applicable. The parties shall use the form entitled Disclosure Statement available on the Courts website. (This entry is the Official Order of the Court. No document is attached.) (blc, Dpty Clk)
July 18, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER by Judge Gregory K Frizzell (Deadline extended to 8/17/2023) ; granting #11 Motion to Accelerate/Extend/Reset Hearing(s)/Deadline(s) (Re: #11 Unopposed MOTION to Accelerate/Extend/Reset Hearing(s)/Deadline(s) ) (kjp, Dpty Clk)
July 18, 2023 Filing 11 Unopposed MOTION to Accelerate/Extend/Reset Hearing(s)/Deadline(s) (Re: #2 Complaint ) by Ross Medical Care, P.C. (King, Michael)
July 18, 2023 Filing 10 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Michael James King on behalf of Ross Medical Care, P.C. [Note: Attorney Michael James King added to party Ross Medical Care, P.C.(pty:dft).] (King, Michael)
June 30, 2023 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed re: Ross Medical Care, P.C. (Re: #2 Complaint ) by Novo Nordisk A/S, Novo Nordisk Inc. (Richter, John)
June 27, 2023 Filing 8 REPORT on Copyrights/Patents/Trademarks (lmt, Dpty Clk)
June 27, 2023 Filing 7 LETTER re: Local Counsel Requirement sent to John C. Richter King & Spalding 1700 Pennsylvania Ave NW Ste 200 Washington DC, DC 20006 (lmt, Dpty Clk)
June 27, 2023 Filing 6 MINUTE ORDER by Court Clerk , directing Novo Nordisk A/S and Novo Nordisk Inc. to file a Disclosure Statement pursuant to FRCvP 7.1 and LCvR 7.1-1, if applicable. The parties shall use the form entitled Disclosure Statement available on the Courts website. (This entry is the Official Order of the Court. No document is attached.) (lmt, Dpty Clk)
June 27, 2023 Filing 5 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT (identifying: Corporate Parent Novo Nordisk A/S, Corporate Parent Novo Nordisk US Commercial Holdings, Inc., Corporate Parent Novo Nordisk US Holdings, Inc., Corporate Parent Novo Nordisk Foundation for Novo Nordisk Inc.) by Novo Nordisk Inc. (Richter, John)
June 27, 2023 Filing 4 SUMMONS Issued by Court Clerk as to Ross Medical Care, P.C. (mlb, Dpty Clk)
June 27, 2023 Filing 3 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT (identifying: Corporate Parent Novo Holdings A/S for Novo Nordisk A/S) by Novo Nordisk A/S (Richter, John)
June 27, 2023 Filing 2 COMPLAINT against Ross Medical Care, P.C. (paid $402 filing fee; receipt number AOKNDC-2832635) by Novo Nordisk A/S, Novo Nordisk Inc. (With attachments) (Richter, John)
June 27, 2023 Filing 1 CIVIL COVER SHEET by Novo Nordisk A/S, Novo Nordisk Inc. (Richter, John)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oklahoma Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Novo Nordisk A/S et al v. Ross Medical Care, P.C.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Novo Nordisk A/S
Represented By: John C. Richter
Represented By: Bruce W. Baber
Represented By: Joseph N Akrotirianakis
Represented By: Timothy J Sullivan, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Novo Nordisk Inc.
Represented By: John C. Richter
Represented By: Bruce W. Baber
Represented By: Aaron Samuel Bennett Craig
Represented By: Joseph N Akrotirianakis
Represented By: Timothy J Sullivan, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ross Medical Care, P.C.
Represented By: Michael James King
Represented By: Spencer Conrad Pittman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?