Shelton et al v. City of Locust Grove, Oklahoma et al
Plaintiff: Deanna Shelton and Chloe Jennings
Defendant: City of Locust Grove, Oklahoma, Jason Williams, Clay Hall and Brett Russell
Case Number: 4:2023cv00274
Filed: July 3, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Oklahoma
Presiding Judge: John F Heil
Referring Judge: Jodi F Jayne
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 24, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 24, 2023 Filing 11 SUMMONS Returned Executed re: Jason Williams (Re: #2 Complaint ) by Deanna Shelton, Chloe Jennings (Lyons, Mark)
August 24, 2023 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed re: Brett Russell (Re: #2 Complaint ) by Deanna Shelton, Chloe Jennings (Lyons, Mark)
August 22, 2023 Filing 9 MINUTE ORDER by Court Clerk , directing Chloe Jennings to file a Disclosure Statement pursuant to FRCvP 7.1 and LCvR 7.1-1, if applicable. The parties shall use the form entitled Disclosure Statement available on the Courts website. (This entry is the Official Order of the Court. No document is attached.) (dla, Dpty Clk)
August 18, 2023 Filing 8 First AMENDED COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against All Defendants (Re: #2 Complaint ) by Deanna Shelton, Chloe Jennings [Note: Attorney Mark Donaldson Lyons added to party Chloe Jennings(pty:pla).] (Lyons, Mark)
August 17, 2023 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed re: City of Locust Grove, Oklahoma (Re: #2 Complaint ) by Deanna Shelton (Lyons, Mark)
July 21, 2023 Filing 6 SUMMONS Issued by Court Clerk as to All Defendants (dla, Dpty Clk)
July 6, 2023 Filing 5 MINUTE ORDER by Court Clerk , directing Deanna Shelton to file a Disclosure Statement pursuant to FRCvP 7.1 and LCvR 7.1-1, if applicable. The parties shall use the form entitled Disclosure Statement available on the Courts website. (This entry is the Official Order of the Court. No document is attached.) (mlb, Dpty Clk)
July 3, 2023 Filing 4 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Martha L. Blackburn on behalf of Deanna Shelton (Lyons, Mark) Modified on 7/5/2023 to correct attorney. (dla, Dpty Clk).
July 3, 2023 Filing 3 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Mark Donaldson Lyons on behalf of Deanna Shelton (Lyons, Mark)
July 3, 2023 Filing 2 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against City of Locust Grove, Oklahoma, Clay Hall, Brett Russell, Jason Williams (paid $402 filing fee; receipt number AOKNDC-2835513) by Deanna Shelton (Lyons, Mark)
July 3, 2023 Filing 1 CIVIL COVER SHEET by Deanna Shelton (Lyons, Mark)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oklahoma Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Shelton et al v. City of Locust Grove, Oklahoma et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Deanna Shelton
Represented By: Mark Donaldson Lyons
Represented By: Martha Lou Blackburn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Chloe Jennings
Represented By: Mark Donaldson Lyons
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Locust Grove, Oklahoma
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jason Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Clay Hall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brett Russell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?