Woodstock v. Public Service Company of Oklahoma et al
Plaintiff: John C Woodstock
Defendant: Public Service Company of Oklahoma, Homeserve USA Repair Management Corp., North American Warranty Inc. and American Electric Power Company, Inc.
Case Number: 4:2023cv00283
Filed: July 7, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Oklahoma
Presiding Judge: Gregory K Frizzell
Referring Judge: Christine D Little
2 Judge: Mark T Steele
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Personal Injury
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 31, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 31, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 45 MINUTE ORDER by Judge Gregory K Frizzell Upon the agreed-to filing of Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint, defendant Public Service Company of Oklahoma's Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Class Action Petition is moot ; finding as moot #29 Motion to Dismiss (Re: #29 MOTION to Dismiss and Brief in Support ) (This entry is the Official Order of the Court. No document is attached.) (GKFJ, Judge)
August 31, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 44 MINUTE ORDER by Judge Gregory K Frizzell Upon the agreed-to filing of Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint, defendant HomeServe USA Repair Management Corp's Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Class Action Petition is moot ; finding as moot #28 Motion to Dismiss (Re: #28 MOTION to Dismiss ) (This entry is the Official Order of the Court. No document is attached.) (GKFJ, Judge)
August 31, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 43 MINUTE ORDER by Judge Gregory K Frizzell Upon the agreed-to filing of the First Amended Complaint, defendant North American Warranty's Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Class Action Petition is moot ; finding as moot #14 Motion to Dismiss (Re: #14 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Class Action Petition and Supporting Brief ) (This entry is the Official Order of the Court. No document is attached.) (GKFJ, Judge)
August 31, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 42 MINUTE ORDER by Judge Gregory K Frizzell Upon the agreement of the parties to the filing of plaintiff's Amended Complaint, Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to File Amended Complaint is moot ; finding as moot #37 Motion for Leave to File Document(s) (Re: #37 MOTION for Leave to File Amended Complaint ) (This entry is the Official Order of the Court. No document is attached.) (GKFJ, Judge)
August 31, 2023 Filing 41 First AMENDED COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against All Defendants (Re: State Court Petition/Complaint ) by John C Woodstock (Alison, Matthew)
August 31, 2023 Filing 40 NOTICE Notice regarding Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to File Amended Complaint (Re: #37 MOTION for Leave to File Amended Complaint ) by John C Woodstock (Alison, Matthew)
August 29, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ORDER by Judge Gregory K Frizzell : the deadline for Plaintiff to Respond to North American Warranty Inc.'s Motion to Dismiss is extended until October 16, 2023 ; setting/resetting deadline(s)/hearing(s): ( Responses due by 10/16/2023); granting #38 Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Motion (Re: #14 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Class Action Petition and Supporting Brief, #38 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Motion ) (clb, Dpty Clk)
August 29, 2023 Filing 38 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Motion (Re: #14 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Class Action Petition and Supporting Brief ) by John C Woodstock (Alison, Matthew)
August 22, 2023 Filing 37 MOTION for Leave to File Amended Complaint (Re: 36 Minute Order,,, Striking/Withdrawing Document(s),, ) by John C Woodstock (Alison, Matthew)
August 21, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 36 MINUTE ORDER by Judge Gregory K Frizzell More than 21 days having passed since the first 12(b) motion was filed by defendant North American Warranty, Inc. [Doc. 14], plaintiff may not file an amended pleading without the opposing parties' written consent or the court's leave. Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint [Doc. 34] is therefore stricken. See Fed. R. Civ. P. 15(a)(1)(B) and (2)., striking/withdrawing document(s) (Re: #34 Amended Complaint ) (Documents Terminated: #34 Amended Complaint ) (This entry is the Official Order of the Court. No document is attached.) (kjp, Dpty Clk)
August 17, 2023 Filing 35 SUMMONS Issued by Court Clerk as to American Electric Power Company, Inc. (lmt, Dpty Clk)
August 17, 2023 Filing 34 First AMENDED COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against All Defendants (Re: State Court Petition/Complaint ) by John C Woodstock (Alison, Matthew) Modified on 8/22/2023 - STRICKEN per 36 (lmt, Dpty Clk).
August 15, 2023 Filing 33 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Frank G. Burt on behalf of North American Warranty Inc. [Note: Attorney Frank G. Burt added to party North American Warranty Inc.(pty:dft).] (Burt, Frank)
August 10, 2023 Filing 32 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Brian P. Perryman on behalf of North American Warranty Inc. [Note: Attorney Brian P. Perryman added to party North American Warranty Inc.(pty:dft).] (Perryman, Brian)
August 8, 2023 Filing 31 NOTICE of Change of Address by Matthew D Alison by on behalf of John C Woodstock (Alison, Matthew)
August 8, 2023 Filing 30 NOTICE of Change of Address by Jason Bjorn Aamodt by on behalf of John C Woodstock (Aamodt, Jason)
July 28, 2023 Filing 29 MOTION to Dismiss and Brief in Support by Public Service Company of Oklahoma (Bryan, Norman)
July 28, 2023 Filing 28 MOTION to Dismiss by Homeserve USA Repair Management Corp. (McMahon, Cathleen)
July 26, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER by Judge Gregory K Frizzell ; granting #26 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice (Re: #26 MOTION for Attorney(s) Frank G. Burt and Brian P. Perryman to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $200 PHV fee; receipt number AOKNDC-2848707) ) (kjp, Dpty Clk)
July 26, 2023 Filing 26 MOTION for Attorney(s) Frank G. Burt and Brian P. Perryman to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $200 PHV fee; receipt number AOKNDC-2848707) by North American Warranty Inc. (With attachments) (Richards, Philip)
July 21, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 25 MINUTE ORDER by Judge Gregory K Frizzell Plaintiff's Response to defendant North American Warranty, Inc.'s Motion to Dismiss [Doc. 14] is due August 31, 2023; Reply brief is due September 14, 2023 ; setting/resetting deadline(s)/hearing(s): ( Responses due by 8/31/2023, Replies due by 9/14/2023); granting #24 Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Motion (Re: #14 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Class Action Petition and Supporting Brief, #24 MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Motion ) (This entry is the Official Order of the Court. No document is attached.) (GKF2, Chambers)
July 18, 2023 Filing 24 MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Motion (Re: #14 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Class Action Petition and Supporting Brief ) by John C Woodstock (Alison, Matthew)
July 14, 2023 Filing 23 MINUTE ORDER by Court Clerk, recusing Magistrate Judge Christine D Little. Magistrate Judge Mark T Steele reassigned to case., changing case number to 23-cv-283-GKF-MTS (This entry is the Official Order of the Court. No document is attached.) (tjc, Dpty Clk)
July 14, 2023 Filing 22 MINUTE ORDER by Court Clerk , directing North American Warranty Inc. to file a Disclosure Statement pursuant to FRCvP 7.1 and LCvR 7.1-1, if applicable. The parties shall use the form entitled Disclosure Statement available on the Courts website. (This entry is the Official Order of the Court. No document is attached.) (dla, Dpty Clk)
July 13, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER by Judge Gregory K Frizzell ; setting/resetting deadline(s)/hearing(s): ( Miscellaneous Deadline set for 7/28/2023); granting #12 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer (Re: #12 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Plead ) (alg, Dpty Clk)
July 13, 2023 Filing 20 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by John C Woodstock (Alison, Matthew)
July 13, 2023 Filing 19 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Jason Bjorn Aamodt on behalf of All Plaintiffs [Note: Attorney Jason Bjorn Aamodt added to party John C Woodstock(pty:pla).] (Aamodt, Jason)
July 13, 2023 Filing 18 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Matthew D Alison on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Alison, Matthew)
July 12, 2023 Filing 17 STATUS REPORT on Removed Action by Homeserve USA Repair Management Corp. (Bragalone, Robert)
July 12, 2023 Filing 16 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Michael Lee Carr on behalf of North American Warranty Inc. [Note: Attorney Michael Lee Carr added to party North American Warranty Inc.(pty:dft).] (Carr, Michael)
July 11, 2023 Filing 15 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT (identifying: Corporate Parent Assurant, Inc., Corporate Parent TWG Warranty Group, Inc., Corporate Parent TWG Holdings, Inc., Corporate Parent The Warranty Group, Inc., Corporate Parent Wolverine Acquisitions, Inc., Corporate Parent Wolverine InterCo, Inc., Corporate Parent First Extended Service Corporation, Other Affiliate John Alden Life Insurance Company, Other Affiliate Interfinancial, Inc., Other Affiliate American Bankers Insurance Group, Other Affiliate United Service Protection Corp., Other Affiliate IQ Data International, Inc., Other Affiliate TS Holdings, Inc., Other Affiliate Assurant Service Protection, Inc., Other Affiliate American Bankers General Agency, Inc, Other Affiliate American Bankers Insurance Co of Florida, Other Affiliate American Bankers Life Assurance Co of Florida, Other Affiliate American Bankers Management Co., Inc, Other Affiliate American Financial & Automotive Services, Inc, Other Affiliate American Financial Warranty Corporation, Other Affiliate American Lease Insurance Agency Corporation, Other Affiliate American Security Insurance Co., Other Affiliate Assurant Captive Insurance Company, Inc., Other Affiliate Assurant IA Holding Corp, Other Affiliate Assurant Insurance Agency, Inc, Other Affiliate Assurant Payment Services, Inc., Other Affiliate Assurant Reinsurance of Turks & Caicos, Ltd., Other Affiliate Assurant BARC Reinsurance Ltd, Other Affiliate Assurant Device Services, Inc., Other Affiliate Automotive Warranty Services, Inc., Other Affiliate Automotive Warranty Services of Florida, Inc., Other Affiliate Coast to Coast Dealer Services, Inc., Other Affiliate Consumer Assist Network Association, Inc., Other Affiliate Consumer Program Administrators, Inc., Other Affiliate Dealer Performance, Inc., Other Affiliate Eck & Glass, Inc., Other Affiliate Federal Warranty Service Corp., Other Affiliate FFG Corporation, Other Affiliate First Extended, Inc., Other Affiliate First Extended Service Corporation of Florida, Other Affiliate Florida Office Corp., Other Affiliate GP Legacy Place, Inc., Other Affiliate Hyla Mobile, Inc., Other Affiliate Recellular Acquisitions, Inc., Other Affiliate Hyla International Inc., Other Affiliate Assurant New Ventures, Incoporated, Other Affiliate Service Optimization Solutions, Inc, Other Affiliate Insureco Agency and Services, Inc. (CA), Other Affiliate Insureco, Inc., Other Affiliate Mobile Defense, Inc, Other Affiliate MS Diversified Corp, Other Affiliate National Insurance Agency, Inc, Other Affiliate National Product Care Company, Other Affiliate Product Care, Inc, Other Affiliate Privowny, Inc, Other Affiliate Reliable Lloyds Insurance Co, Other Affiliate Resource Acquisition Corporation, Other Affiliate Assurant Automotive, Other Affiliate Assurant Dealer Services, Inc., Other Affiliate Resource Training, Inc., Other Affiliate ServicePlan, Inc., Other Affiliate ServicePlan of Florida, Inc., Other Affiliate Service Protection, Inc., Other Affiliate Service Saver, Inc., Other Affiliate Shipsurance Insurance Services, Inc., Other Affiliate Standard Guaranty Insurance Co, Other Affiliate SOSI-Fixt, Inc., Other Affiliate Sureway, Inc., Other Affiliate Telecom Re, Inc., Other Affiliate TrackSure Insurance Agency, Inc., Other Affiliate TWG Home Warranty Services, Inc., Other Affiliate TWG Innovative Solutions, Inc., Other Affiliate TWG Securities, Inc., Other Affiliate TWG Warranty Services Inc, Other Affiliate Union Security Life Insurance Co. of NY, Other Affiliate United Service Protection Inc., Other Affiliate Virginia Surety Company, Inc., Other Affiliate Voyager Group Inc., Other Affiliate Voyager Indemnity Insurance Co., Other Affiliate Voyager Service Warranties, Inc. for North American Warranty Inc.) by North American Warranty Inc. (Richards, Philip)
July 11, 2023 Filing 14 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Class Action Petition and Supporting Brief by North American Warranty Inc. (Richards, Philip)
July 11, 2023 Filing 13 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Philip Raymond Richards on behalf of North American Warranty Inc. [Note: Attorney Philip Raymond Richards added to party North American Warranty Inc.(pty:dft).] (Richards, Philip)
July 11, 2023 Filing 12 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Plead (Re: State Court Petition/Complaint ) by Homeserve USA Repair Management Corp., Public Service Company of Oklahoma (Bryan, Norman)
July 10, 2023 Filing 11 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT (identifying: Corporate Parent HomeServe USA Corp., Other Affiliate Homeserve USA Repair Management Corp., Other Affiliate HomeServe USA Holding Corp., Other Affiliate Hestia AcquireCo Ltd., Other Affiliate Hestia US Holdco, LLC, Other Affiliate Hestia US Midco III, LLC, Other Affiliate Hestia US Midco II, LLC, Other Affiliate Hestia US Midco I, LLC, Other Affiliate Hestia US Topco, LLC, Other Affiliate Hestia US AcquireCo., LLC, Other Affiliate BIF III Hestia Aggregator LP, Other Affiliate Brookfield Corporation, Other Affiliate American Home Guardian, Inc., Other Affiliate Nations Preferred Home Warranty, Inc. for Homeserve USA Repair Management Corp.) by Homeserve USA Repair Management Corp. (McMahon, Cathleen)
July 10, 2023 Filing 10 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT (identifying: Corporate Parent American Electric Power Company, Inc. for Public Service Company of Oklahoma) by Public Service Company of Oklahoma (Bryan, Norman)
July 10, 2023 Filing 9 STATUS REPORT on Removed Action by Public Service Company of Oklahoma (Bryan, Norman)
July 10, 2023 Filing 8 MINUTE ORDER by Court Clerk , directing John C Woodstock, Public Service Company of Oklahoma, Homeserve USA Repair Management Corp., North American Warranty Inc. to file a Disclosure Statement pursuant to FRCvP 7.1 and LCvR 7.1-1, if applicable. The parties shall use the form entitled Disclosure Statement available on the Courts website. (This entry is the Official Order of the Court. No document is attached.) (mlb, Dpty Clk)
July 10, 2023 Filing 7 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Tom Quintin Ferguson on behalf of Public Service Company of Oklahoma (Ferguson, Tom)
July 7, 2023 Filing 6 NOTICE of Removal from TULSA DISTRICT CT., STATE OF OKLAHOMA, case number CJ-2023-01977 by Homeserve USA Repair Management Corp. (With attachments) (Bragalone, Robert)
July 7, 2023 Filing 5 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Cathleen Whitaker McMahon on behalf of Homeserve USA Repair Management Corp. [Note: Attorney Cathleen Whitaker McMahon added to party Homeserve USA Repair Management Corp.(pty:dft).] (McMahon, Cathleen)
July 7, 2023 Filing 4 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Robert Alan Bragalone on behalf of Homeserve USA Repair Management Corp. [Note: Attorney Robert Alan Bragalone added to party Homeserve USA Repair Management Corp.(pty:dft).] (Bragalone, Robert)
July 7, 2023 Filing 3 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Norman Lance Bryan on behalf of Public Service Company of Oklahoma (Bryan, Norman)
July 7, 2023 Filing 2 NOTICE of Removal from Tulsa County District Court, case number CJ-2023-1977 (paid $402 filing fee; receipt number AOKNDC-2838524) by Public Service Company of Oklahoma (With attachments) (Bryan, Norman)
July 7, 2023 Filing 1 CIVIL COVER SHEET by Public Service Company of Oklahoma (Bryan, Norman)
June 5, 2023 PETITION/COMPLAINT with Jury Demand filed in State Court against All Defendants by John C Woodstock (mlb, Dpty Clk)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oklahoma Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Woodstock v. Public Service Company of Oklahoma et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John C Woodstock
Represented By: Matthew D Alison
Represented By: Jason Bjorn Aamodt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Public Service Company of Oklahoma
Represented By: Tom Quintin Ferguson
Represented By: Norman Lance Bryan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Homeserve USA Repair Management Corp.
Represented By: Cathleen Whitaker McMahon
Represented By: Robert Alan Bragalone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: North American Warranty Inc.
Represented By: Michael Lee Carr
Represented By: Philip Raymond Richards
Represented By: Brian P. Perryman
Represented By: Frank G. Burt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: American Electric Power Company, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?