Ponder et al v. United States of America, The et al
Plaintiff: Deborah Ponder and Micheal Ponder
Defendant: The United States of America, Creek Nation Community Hospital, Regional Brain Institute, PLLC, James Vernon Brooks, PA-C Peter Eckhardt, M.D. Kimberly Gage, United States of America, The, James Vernon Rooks, Peter Eckhardt and Kimberly Gage
Case Number: 4:2023cv00326
Filed: July 31, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Oklahoma
Presiding Judge: Gregory K Frizzell
Referring Judge: Christine D Little
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Med. Malpractice
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Personal Injury
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 5, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 5, 2023 Filing 18 AFFIDAVIT/CERTIFICATE/PROOF/RETURN of Service Peter Eckhardt, PA-C by Deborah Ponder (With attachments) (Gusman, Rachel)
September 5, 2023 Filing 17 AFFIDAVIT/CERTIFICATE/PROOF/RETURN of Service Creek Nation Community Hospital by Deborah Ponder (With attachments) (Gusman, Rachel)
September 5, 2023 Filing 16 AFFIDAVIT/CERTIFICATE/PROOF/RETURN of Service The United States of America by Deborah Ponder (With attachments) (Gusman, Rachel)
August 29, 2023 Filing 15 First DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Regional Brain Institute, PLLC (Whitworth, Brandon)
August 28, 2023 Filing 14 MINUTE ORDER by Court Clerk , directing Regional Brain Institute, PLLC, James Vernon Rooks to file a Disclosure Statement pursuant to FRCvP 7.1 and LCvR 7.1-1, if applicable. The parties shall use the form entitled Disclosure Statement available on the Courts website. (This entry is the Official Order of the Court. No document is attached.) (blc, Dpty Clk)
August 24, 2023 Filing 13 ANSWER (Re: #2 Complaint ) by Regional Brain Institute, PLLC (Whitworth, Brandon)
August 24, 2023 Filing 12 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Brandon Charles Whitworth on behalf of Regional Brain Institute, PLLC [Note: Attorney Brandon Charles Whitworth added to party Regional Brain Institute, PLLC(pty:dft).] (Whitworth, Brandon)
August 24, 2023 Filing 11 ANSWER (Re: #2 Complaint ) by James Vernon Rooks (Whitworth, Brandon)
August 24, 2023 Filing 10 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Brandon Charles Whitworth on behalf of James Vernon Rooks [Note: Attorney Brandon Charles Whitworth added to party James Vernon Rooks(pty:dft).] (Whitworth, Brandon)
August 18, 2023 Filing 9 First DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Kimberly Gage (Connor, Alison)
August 18, 2023 Filing 8 MINUTE ORDER by Court Clerk , directing Kimberly Gage to file a Disclosure Statement pursuant to FRCvP 7.1 and LCvR 7.1-1, if applicable. The parties shall use the form entitled Disclosure Statement available on the Courts website. (This entry is the Official Order of the Court. No document is attached.) (lmt, Dpty Clk)
August 16, 2023 Filing 7 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Alison Connor on behalf of Kimberly Gage (Connor, Alison)
August 16, 2023 Filing 6 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Sidney Davis Smith, Jr. on behalf of Kimberly Gage (Connor, Alison) Modified on 8/17/2023 to edit docket text to reflect correct attorney and add attorney to case (blc, Dpty Clk).
August 16, 2023 Filing 5 ANSWER with Jury Demand (Re: #2 Complaint ) by Kimberly Gage [Note: Attorney Alison Connor added to party Kimberly Gage(pty:dft).] (Connor, Alison)
August 1, 2023 Filing 4 SUMMONS Issued by Court Clerk as to All Defendants (mlb, Dpty Clk) (Main Document 4 replaced on 8/1/2023 to add notation) (mlb, Dpty Clk).
August 1, 2023 Filing 3 MINUTE ORDER by Court Clerk , directing Deborah Ponder, Micheal Ponder to file a Disclosure Statement pursuant to FRCvP 7.1 and LCvR 7.1-1, if applicable. The parties shall use the form entitled Disclosure Statement available on the Courts website. (This entry is the Official Order of the Court. No document is attached.) (mlb, Dpty Clk)
August 1, 2023 Filing 2 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against All Defendants (paid $402 filing fee; receipt number BOKNDC-2851610) by Deborah Ponder (Gusman, Rachel)
August 1, 2023 Filing 1 CIVIL COVER SHEET by Deborah Ponder (Gusman, Rachel)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oklahoma Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ponder et al v. United States of America, The et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Deborah Ponder
Represented By: Rachel Elizabeth Gusman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Micheal Ponder
Represented By: Rachel Elizabeth Gusman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Creek Nation Community Hospital
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Regional Brain Institute, PLLC
Represented By: Brandon Charles Whitworth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James Vernon Brooks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PA-C Peter Eckhardt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: M.D. Kimberly Gage
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States of America, The
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James Vernon Rooks
Represented By: Brandon Charles Whitworth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Peter Eckhardt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kimberly Gage
Represented By: Alison Connor
Represented By: Sidney Davis Smith, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?