Doe v. Saint Francis Hospital, Inc.
Plaintiff: John Doe
Defendant: Saint Francis Hospital, Inc. doing business as Saint Francis Health System and Saint Francis Hospital, Inc.
Case Number: 4:2023cv00351
Filed: August 14, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Oklahoma
Presiding Judge: Terence Kern
Referring Judge: Mark T Steele
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1442 Petition for Removal- Breach of Contract
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 12, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 12, 2023 Filing 22 NOTICE Supplemental Authority (Re: #20 MOTION to Remand , #21 Brief in Support of Motion ) by John Doe (With attachments) (Alison, Matthew)
September 13, 2023 Filing 21 BRIEF in Support of Motion (Re: #20 MOTION to Remand ) by John Doe ; (Alison, Matthew)
September 13, 2023 Filing 20 MOTION to Remand by John Doe (Alison, Matthew)
September 11, 2023 Filing 19 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by John Doe (Alison, Matthew)
September 6, 2023 Filing 18 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Daniel Colby Orton on behalf of Saint Francis Hospital, Inc. [Note: Attorney Daniel Colby Orton added to party Saint Francis Hospital, Inc.(pty:dft).] (Orton, Daniel)
September 6, 2023 Filing 17 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Lisa Houssiere on behalf of Saint Francis Hospital, Inc. [Note: Attorney Lisa Houssiere added to party Saint Francis Hospital, Inc.(pty:dft).] (Houssiere, Lisa)
September 6, 2023 Filing 16 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Jonathan Maddalone on behalf of Saint Francis Hospital, Inc. [Note: Attorney Jonathan Maddalone added to party Saint Francis Hospital, Inc.(pty:dft).] (Maddalone, Jonathan)
September 6, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER by Judge Terence Kern ; staying case; setting/resetting deadline(s)/hearing(s): ( Miscellaneous Deadline set for 9/13/2023); granting #14 Motion to Stay (Re: #14 Joint MOTION to Stay and for Order Setting Briefing Schedule ) (lmc, Chambers)
September 6, 2023 Filing 14 Joint MOTION to Stay and for Order Setting Briefing Schedule by Saint Francis Hospital, Inc. (Ludiker, Emily)
September 5, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 13 MINUTE ORDER by Judge Terence Kern - The Court is in receipt of the notice of removal (Doc. 2), in which a pending motion by plaintiff to plead under pseudonym was included (see Doc. 2-3). Pursuant to LCvR 81-2 (b), [i]f any motion remains pending in state court at the time of removal, and if the movant wishes the District Court to rule on the motion, the party that initially filed the motion must refile the motion in the District Court case, and attach any responses and replies. Accordingly, if plaintiff wishes this Court to rule on the motion, counsel is directed to refile the motion, and counsel may file plaintiffs disclosure statement (Doc. 12) under seal. (Re: 12 Minute Order,, Directing Party(ies) to File Disclosure Statement, #2 Notice of Removal, #3 Disclosure Statement (Rule 7.1) ) (This entry is the Official Order of the Court. No document is attached.) (lmc, Chambers)
September 5, 2023 Filing 12 MINUTE ORDER by Court Clerk , directing John Doe and Saint Francis Hospital, Inc. to file a Disclosure Statement pursuant to FRCvP 7.1 and LCvR 7.1-1, if applicable. The parties shall use the form entitled Disclosure Statement available on the Courts website. (This entry is the Official Order of the Court. No document is attached.) (dla, Dpty Clk)
August 23, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER by Judge Terence Kern ; granting #7 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice; granting #8 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice; denying #9 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice; granting #10 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice (Re: #7 MOTION for Attorney(s) Colby Orton to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $100 PHV fee; receipt number AOKNDC-2864474), #8 MOTION for Attorney(s) Lisa Houssiere to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $100 PHV fee; receipt number AOKNDC-2864487), #9 MOTION for Attorney(s) Jonathan Maddalone to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $100 PHV fee; receipt number AOKNDC-2864491), #10 Amended MOTION for Attorney(s) Jonathan S. Maddalone to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (includes a request to waive the fee) ) (lmc, Chambers)
August 23, 2023 Filing 10 Amended MOTION for Attorney(s) Jonathan S. Maddalone to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (includes a request to waive the fee) by Saint Francis Hospital, Inc. (Moody, Charles)
August 23, 2023 Filing 9 MOTION for Attorney(s) Jonathan Maddalone to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $100 PHV fee; receipt number AOKNDC-2864491) by Saint Francis Hospital, Inc. (Moody, Charles)
August 23, 2023 Filing 8 MOTION for Attorney(s) Lisa Houssiere to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $100 PHV fee; receipt number AOKNDC-2864487) by Saint Francis Hospital, Inc. (Moody, Charles)
August 23, 2023 Filing 7 MOTION for Attorney(s) Colby Orton to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $100 PHV fee; receipt number AOKNDC-2864474) by Saint Francis Hospital, Inc. (Moody, Charles)
August 18, 2023 Filing 6 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Emily Jones Ludiker on behalf of Saint Francis Hospital, Inc. [Note: Attorney Emily Jones Ludiker added to party Saint Francis Hospital, Inc.(pty:dft).] (Ludiker, Emily)
August 18, 2023 Filing 5 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Jason Bjorn Aamodt on behalf of All Plaintiffs [Note: Attorney Jason Bjorn Aamodt added to party John Doe(pty:pla).] (Aamodt, Jason)
August 18, 2023 Filing 4 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Matthew D Alison on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Alison, Matthew)
August 18, 2023 Filing 3 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT (identifying: Corporate Parent Saint Francis Health System for Saint Francis Hospital, Inc.) by Saint Francis Hospital, Inc. (Moody, Charles)
August 14, 2023 Filing 2 NOTICE of Removal with Jury Demand from Tulsa County District Court, case number CJ-2023-2373 (paid $402 filing fee; receipt number AOKNDC-2858904) by Saint Francis Hospital, Inc. (With attachments) (Moody, Charles)
August 14, 2023 Filing 1 CIVIL COVER SHEET by Saint Francis Hospital, Inc. (Moody, Charles)
July 11, 2023 PETITION/COMPLAINT with Jury Demand filed in State Court against Saint Francis Hospital, Inc. by John Doe (dla, Dpty Clk)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oklahoma Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Doe v. Saint Francis Hospital, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Doe
Represented By: Matthew D Alison
Represented By: Jason Bjorn Aamodt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Saint Francis Hospital, Inc. doing business as Saint Francis Health System
Represented By: Charles H Moody
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Saint Francis Hospital, Inc.
Represented By: Charles H Moody
Represented By: Emily Jones Ludiker
Represented By: Daniel Colby Orton
Represented By: Jonathan Maddalone
Represented By: Lisa Houssiere
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?