Slinkard et al v. Independent School District No. 1 of Tulsa County et al
Plaintiff: Megan Slinkard and Jon Slinkard
Defendant: Independent School District No. 1 of Tulsa County, Tulsa Public Schools, Alpha Benson and Deborah Gist
Case Number: 4:2023cv00354
Filed: August 15, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Oklahoma
Presiding Judge: Gregory K Frizzell
Referring Judge: Jodi F Jayne
Nature of Suit: Constitutional - State Statute
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 10, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 10, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER by Judge Gregory K Frizzell , directing Plaintiffs to show cause( Response to Order to Show Cause due by 10/24/2023) (kjp, Dpty Clk)
October 10, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 14 MINUTE ORDER by Judge Gregory K Frizzell Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 16(b)(2), the Court finds good cause for delay in issuing a Scheduling Order in this case, as defendant Alpha Benson has filed a Motion to Dismiss [Doc. 11] which should first be resolved. (Re: #11 MOTION to Dismiss and Brief in Support ) (This entry is the Official Order of the Court. No document is attached.) (GKF1, Chambers)
October 9, 2023 Filing 13 RESPONSE in Opposition to Motion (Re: #11 MOTION to Dismiss and Brief in Support ) by Jon Slinkard, Megan Slinkard ; (Seidler, Maria)
September 25, 2023 Filing 12 ANSWER (Re: #1 Complaint ) by Independent School District No. 1 of Tulsa County (Rainey, Kent)
September 18, 2023 Filing 11 MOTION to Dismiss and Brief in Support by Alpha Benson (Rainey, Kent)
September 18, 2023 Filing 10 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Alison A Parker on behalf of Alpha Benson, Independent School District No. 1 of Tulsa County [Note: Attorney Alison A Parker added to party Alpha Benson(pty:dft), Attorney Alison A Parker added to party Independent School District No. 1 of Tulsa County(pty:dft).] (Parker, Alison)
September 18, 2023 Filing 9 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Kent Bolling Rainey on behalf of Alpha Benson, Independent School District No. 1 of Tulsa County [Note: Attorney Kent Bolling Rainey added to party Alpha Benson(pty:dft), Attorney Kent Bolling Rainey added to party Independent School District No. 1 of Tulsa County(pty:dft).] (Rainey, Kent)
August 23, 2023 Filing 8 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Jon Slinkard, Megan Slinkard (Seidler, Maria)
August 22, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER by Judge Gregory K Frizzell (Certification by the Court) certifying to the Oklahoma Attorney General, directing court clerk to take action (Re: #5 Notice (Other) ) (kjp, Dpty Clk)
August 22, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER by Judge Gregory K Frizzell (Re: #5 Notice (Other) ) (kjp, Dpty Clk)
August 17, 2023 Filing 5 NOTICE NOTICE OF STATE CONSTITUTIONALITY QUESTION by Jon Slinkard, Megan Slinkard (Seidler, Maria)
August 17, 2023 Filing 4 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Maria Mercedes Seidler on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Seidler, Maria)
August 16, 2023 Filing 3 SUMMONS Issued by Court Clerk as to All Defendants (dla, Dpty Clk)
August 16, 2023 Filing 2 MINUTE ORDER by Court Clerk , directing Megan Slinkard and Jon Slinkard to file a Disclosure Statement pursuant to FRCvP 7.1 and LCvR 7.1-1, if applicable. The parties shall use the form entitled Disclosure Statement available on the Courts website. (This entry is the Official Order of the Court. No document is attached.) (dla, Dpty Clk)
August 15, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against All Defendants (paid $402 filing fee; receipt number AOKNDC-2859348) by Jon Slinkard (With attachments) (Seidler, Maria)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oklahoma Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Slinkard et al v. Independent School District No. 1 of Tulsa County et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Independent School District No. 1 of Tulsa County
Represented By: Alison A Parker
Represented By: Kent Bolling Rainey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tulsa Public Schools
Represented By: Alison A Parker
Represented By: Kent Bolling Rainey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alpha Benson
Represented By: Alison A Parker
Represented By: Kent Bolling Rainey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Deborah Gist
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Megan Slinkard
Represented By: Maria Mercedes Seidler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jon Slinkard
Represented By: Maria Mercedes Seidler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?