Fields et al v. Farmers Insurance Company, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Kevin Fields and Tami Fields
Defendant: Farmers Insurance Company, Inc. doing business as Farmers Insurance Group of Companies, The, BOK Financial Advisors, BOK Financial Corporation, BOK Financial Securities, Inc. doing business as Bank of Oklahoma, N/A, Federal Home Loan Mortgage Corporation doing business as Freddie Mac and Travis Hargrove
Case Number: 4:2023cv00386
Filed: September 5, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Oklahoma
Presiding Judge: Gregory K Frizzell
Referring Judge: Mark T Steele
Nature of Suit: Truth in Lending
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 1601 Truth in Lending
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 23, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 23, 2023 Filing 45 Amended MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by Federal Home Loan Mortgage Corporation (Digmon, James)
October 18, 2023 Filing 44 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Gregg J Lytle on behalf of Federal Home Loan Mortgage Corporation [Note: Attorney Gregg J Lytle added to party Federal Home Loan Mortgage Corporation(pty:dft).] (Lytle, Gregg)
October 17, 2023 Filing 43 REPLY to Response to Motion (Re: #28 MOTION to Dismiss Party Farmers Insurance Company, Inc. ) by Farmers Insurance Company, Inc. ; (Cain, Emillie)
October 13, 2023 Filing 42 REPLY to Response to Motion (Re: #19 MOTION to Dismiss Party Travis Hargrove ) by Travis Hargrove ; (Irby, Jerrick)
October 4, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 41 ORDER by Judge Gregory K Frizzell granting motion for leave to amend motion to dismiss (doc. 36) ; setting/resetting deadline(s)/hearing(s): ( Miscellaneous Deadline set for 10/25/2023); granting #36 Motion to Amend (Re: #36 MOTION to Amend Motion to Dismiss ) (alg, Dpty Clk)
October 4, 2023 Filing 40 RESPONSE by Kevin Fields, Tami Fields (Bowlby, Bradley)
October 3, 2023 Filing 39 RESPONSE in Opposition to Motion (Re: #28 MOTION to Dismiss Party Farmers Insurance Company, Inc. ) by Kevin Fields, Tami Fields ; (With attachments) (Bowlby, Bradley)
October 3, 2023 Filing 38 RESPONSE in Opposition to Motion (Re: #19 MOTION to Dismiss Party Travis Hargrove ) by Kevin Fields, Tami Fields ; (With attachments) (Bowlby, Bradley)
October 2, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 37 MINUTE ORDER by Judge Gregory K Frizzell Plaintiff Kevin and Tami Fields shall file a response to defendant Freddie Mac's Motion for Leave to Amend [Doc. 36] on or before October 6, 2023. Defendant Freddie Mac may file a reply of no more than five pages on or before October 11, 2023, but no reply is required, setting/resetting deadline(s)/hearing(s): ( Responses due by 10/6/2023, Replies due by 10/11/2023) (Re: #36 MOTION to Amend Motion to Dismiss ) (This entry is the Official Order of the Court. No document is attached.) (GKF2, Chambers)
October 2, 2023 Filing 36 MOTION to Amend Motion to Dismiss by Federal Home Loan Mortgage Corporation (Digmon, James)
September 19, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 35 MINUTE ORDER by Judge Gregory K Frizzell Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 16(b)(2), the Court finds good cause to delay issuing a Scheduling Order in this case pending resolution of Defendant Travis Hargrove and Defendant Farmers Insurance Company, Inc.'s Motions to Dismiss [Doc. 19; Doc. 28] (Re: #28 MOTION to Dismiss Party Farmers Insurance Company, Inc. , #19 MOTION to Dismiss Party Travis Hargrove ) (This entry is the Official Order of the Court. No document is attached.) (GKF2, Chambers)
September 19, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 34 MINUTE ORDER by Judge Gregory K Frizzell Vacating the Order for Joint Status Report [Doc. 12] and striking the joint status report deadline on 10/2/2023 included therein., vacating/setting aside order(s) (Re: #12 Order, Directing Parties to File Joint Status Report ) (Documents Terminated: #12 Order, Directing Parties to File Joint Status Report ) (This entry is the Official Order of the Court. No document is attached.) (kjp, Dpty Clk)
September 19, 2023 Filing 33 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by James Marshall Digmon on behalf of Federal Home Loan Mortgage Corporation [Note: Attorney James Marshall Digmon added to party Federal Home Loan Mortgage Corporation(pty:dft).] (Digmon, James)
September 15, 2023 Filing 32 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by BOK Financial Corporation (Burden, Jared)
September 15, 2023 Filing 31 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT (identifying: Corporate Parent BOK Financial Corporation for BOK Financial Securities, Inc.) by BOK Financial Securities, Inc. (Burden, Jared)
September 14, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 30 MINUTE ORDER by Judge Gregory K Frizzell granting defendant's motion to admit James Marshall Digmon pro hac vice (doc. 29). James Marshall Digmon is admitted pro hac vice and is further directed to file a separate entry of appearance forthwith ; granting #29 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice (Re: #29 MOTION for Attorney(s) James Marshall Digmon to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $100 PHV fee; receipt number AOKNDC-2876041) ) (This entry is the Official Order of the Court. No document is attached.) (alg, Dpty Clk)
September 14, 2023 Filing 29 MOTION for Attorney(s) James Marshall Digmon to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $100 PHV fee; receipt number AOKNDC-2876041) by Federal Home Loan Mortgage Corporation (Fryer, Mitzy)
September 13, 2023 Filing 28 MOTION to Dismiss Party Farmers Insurance Company, Inc. by Farmers Insurance Company, Inc. (Cain, Emillie)
September 13, 2023 Filing 27 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Travis Hargrove (Irby, Jerrick)
September 13, 2023 Filing 26 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Jerrick Lee Irby on behalf of Travis Hargrove (Irby, Jerrick)
September 13, 2023 Filing 25 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Jonathan Alan Epstein on behalf of Travis Hargrove [Note: Attorney Jonathan Alan Epstein added to party Travis Hargrove(pty:dft).] (Epstein, Jonathan)
September 13, 2023 Filing 24 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Bradley E Bowlby on behalf of All Plaintiffs [Note: Attorney Bradley E Bowlby added to party Kevin Fields(pty:pla), Attorney Bradley E Bowlby added to party Tami Fields(pty:pla).] (Bowlby, Bradley)
September 13, 2023 Filing 23 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Tami Fields (Begin, Eric)
September 13, 2023 Filing 22 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Kevin Fields (Begin, Eric)
September 13, 2023 Filing 21 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Eric James Begin on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Begin, Eric)
September 13, 2023 Filing 20 MINUTE ORDER by Court Clerk , assigning this case to a district judge. Assigning case to District Judge Gregory K Frizzell and Magistrate Judge Mark T Steele, changing case number to 23-cv-00386-GKF-MTS (This entry is the Official Order of the Court. No document is attached.) (lmt, Dpty Clk)
September 12, 2023 Filing 19 MOTION to Dismiss Party Travis Hargrove by Travis Hargrove (Irby, Jerrick)
September 12, 2023 Filing 18 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Emillie Louise Cain on behalf of Farmers Insurance Company, Inc. (Cain, Emillie)
September 12, 2023 Filing 17 NOTICE of Pending Motion to Dismiss by Farmers Insurance Company, Inc. (With attachments) (Sullivan, Kelsie)
September 12, 2023 Filing 16 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT (identifying: Corporate Parent Farmers Insurance Exchange, Corporate Parent Fire Insurance Exchange, Corporate Parent Farmers Group, Inc., Corporate Parent Zurich Insurance Group Ltd., f/k/a Zurich Financial Services Ltd., Corporate Parent Swiss Stock Exchange for Farmers Insurance Company, Inc.) by Farmers Insurance Company, Inc. (Sullivan, Kelsie)
September 12, 2023 Filing 15 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Kelsie M Sullivan on behalf of Farmers Insurance Company, Inc. (Sullivan, Kelsie)
September 12, 2023 Filing 14 ANSWER with Jury Demand (Re: State Court Petition/Complaint ) by Federal Home Loan Mortgage Corporation (Fryer, Mitzy)
September 12, 2023 Filing 13 MINUTE ORDER by Court Clerk , directing BOK Financial Advisors, BOK Financial Corporation and BOK Financial Securities, Inc. to file a Disclosure Statement pursuant to FRCvP 7.1 and LCvR 7.1-1, if applicable. The parties shall use the form entitled Disclosure Statement available on the Courts website. (This entry is the Official Order of the Court. No document is attached.) (dla, Dpty Clk)
September 11, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Mark T Steele for Joint Status Report, directing parties to file joint status report ( Status Report due by 10/2/2023) (MTS1, Chambers) Modified on 9/19/2023 - VACATED per 34 (lmt, Dpty Clk).
September 11, 2023 Filing 11 ANSWER (Re: State Court Petition/Complaint ) by BOK Financial Advisors, BOK Financial Corporation, BOK Financial Securities, Inc. (Burden, Jared)
September 11, 2023 Filing 10 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Sara C. Royster on behalf of BOK Financial Advisors, BOK Financial Corporation, BOK Financial Securities, Inc. [Note: Attorney Sara C. Royster added to party BOK Financial Advisors(pty:dft), Attorney Sara C. Royster added to party BOK Financial Corporation(pty:dft), Attorney Sara C. Royster added to party BOK Financial Securities, Inc.(pty:dft).] (Royster, Sara)
September 8, 2023 Filing 9 NOTICE Notice of Consent to Removal by Federal Home Loan Mortgage Corporation (Fryer, Mitzy)
September 8, 2023 Filing 8 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Jared Michael Burden on behalf of BOK Financial Advisors, BOK Financial Corporation, BOK Financial Securities, Inc. [Note: Attorney Jared Michael Burden added to party BOK Financial Advisors(pty:dft), Attorney Jared Michael Burden added to party BOK Financial Corporation(pty:dft), Attorney Jared Michael Burden added to party BOK Financial Securities, Inc.(pty:dft).] (Burden, Jared)
September 7, 2023 Filing 7 MINUTE ORDER by Court Clerk , directing Farmers Insurance Company, Inc. and Travis Hargrove to file a Disclosure Statement pursuant to FRCvP 7.1 and LCvR 7.1-1, if applicable. The parties shall use the form entitled Disclosure Statement available on the Courts website. (This entry is the Official Order of the Court. No document is attached.) (dla, Dpty Clk)
September 6, 2023 Filing 6 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT OF CASE TO A UNITED STATES MAGISTRATE JUDGE AND DECLINATION OF CONSENT FORM. ACTION REQUIRED: This case has been randomly assigned to a United States magistrate judge for all purposes, including trial, final entry of judgment, and direct review by the Tenth Circuit Court of Appeals. Each party will be deemed to have knowingly and voluntarily consented to proceed before the assigned Magistrate Judge, if the attached form is not signed and returned within the applicable deadline. The plaintiff or removing party must serve a copy of this notice upon all other parties to this action. (dla, Dpty Clk)
September 6, 2023 Filing 5 MINUTE ORDER by Court Clerk , directing Kevin Fields, Tami Fields and Federal Home Loan Mortgage Corporation to file a Disclosure Statement pursuant to FRCvP 7.1 and LCvR 7.1-1, if applicable. The parties shall use the form entitled Disclosure Statement available on the Courts website. (This entry is the Official Order of the Court. No document is attached.) (dla, Dpty Clk)
September 6, 2023 NOTICE of Docket Entry Modification; Error: dkt #3 was filed in error using the wrong event (NOTICE (Other)); Correction: edited docket text to reflect correct event (ATTORNEY APPEARANCE) (Re: #3 Notice (Other) ) (lmt, Dpty Clk)
September 5, 2023 Filing 4 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Federal Home Loan Mortgage Corporation (Fryer, Mitzy)
September 5, 2023 Filing 3 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Mitzy G Fryer on behalf of Federal Home Loan Mortgage Corporation (Fryer, Mitzy) Modified on 9/6/2023 to correct event type (lmt, Dpty Clk).
September 5, 2023 Filing 2 NOTICE of Removal with Jury Demand from District Court for Tulsa County, Oklahoma, case number CJ-2023-00604 (paid $402 filing fee; receipt number AOKNDC-2870926) by Federal Home Loan Mortgage Corporation (With attachments) (Fryer, Mitzy)
September 5, 2023 Filing 1 CIVIL COVER SHEET by Federal Home Loan Mortgage Corporation (Fryer, Mitzy)
February 17, 2023 PETITION/COMPLAINT with Jury Demand filed in State Court against All Defendants by Tami Fields, Kevin Fields (dla, Dpty Clk)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oklahoma Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Fields et al v. Farmers Insurance Company, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kevin Fields
Represented By: Eric James Begin
Represented By: Bradley E Bowlby
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tami Fields
Represented By: Eric James Begin
Represented By: Bradley E Bowlby
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Farmers Insurance Company, Inc. doing business as Farmers Insurance Group of Companies, The
Represented By: Kelsie M Sullivan
Represented By: Emillie Louise Cain
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BOK Financial Advisors
Represented By: Jared Michael Burden
Represented By: Sara C. Royster
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BOK Financial Corporation
Represented By: Jared Michael Burden
Represented By: Sara C. Royster
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BOK Financial Securities, Inc. doing business as Bank of Oklahoma, N/A
Represented By: Jared Michael Burden
Represented By: Sara C. Royster
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Federal Home Loan Mortgage Corporation doing business as Freddie Mac
Represented By: Mitzy G Fryer
Represented By: Gregg J Lytle
Represented By: James Marshall Digmon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Travis Hargrove
Represented By: Jerrick Lee Irby
Represented By: Jonathan Alan Epstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?