Saint Francis Hospital, Inc. et al v. Oklahoma Health Care Authority
Plaintiff: Saint Francis Hospital, Inc. and Tahlequah Hospital Authority doing business as Northeastern Health System
Defendant: Oklahoma Health Care Authority
Case Number: 4:2023cv00389
Filed: September 8, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Oklahoma
Presiding Judge: Terence Kern
Referring Judge: Christine D Little
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1396 - Tort Negligence
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 3, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 3, 2023 Filing 23 MINUTE ORDER by Court Clerk , assigning this case to a district judge. Assigning case to District Judge Terence C Kern and Magistrate Judge Christine D Little, changing case number to 23-cv-00389-TCK-CDL (This entry is the Official Order of the Court. No document is attached.) (dla, Dpty Clk)
November 3, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 22 MINUTE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Christine D Little Defendant's Unopposed Motion for Extension to file Joint Status Report (Doc. 21) is granted. The parties are directed to file the joint status report by December 1, 2023. Defendant's Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Answer (Doc. 20) is granted. Defendant may file an amended answer by December 1, 2023. ; setting/resetting deadline(s)/hearing(s): ( Status Report due by 12/1/2023); granting #20 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer; granting #21 Motion to Accelerate/Extend/Reset Hearing(s)/Deadline(s) (Re: #20 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer (Amended) Without Leave of Court, #21 Unopposed MOTION to Accelerate/Extend/Reset Hearing(s)/Deadline(s) Regarding Joint Status Report ) (This entry is the Official Order of the Court. No document is attached.) (CDL1, Chambers)
November 3, 2023 Filing 21 Unopposed MOTION to Accelerate/Extend/Reset Hearing(s)/Deadline(s) Regarding Joint Status Report by Oklahoma Health Care Authority (Geister, Charles)
November 3, 2023 Filing 20 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer (Amended) Without Leave of Court (Re: #2 Complaint ) by Oklahoma Health Care Authority (Geister, Charles)
November 3, 2023 Filing 19 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Charles E Geister, III on behalf of Oklahoma Health Care Authority [Note: Attorney Charles E Geister, III added to party Oklahoma Health Care Authority(pty:dft).] (Geister, Charles)
October 16, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Christine D Little , directing parties to file joint status report ( Status Report due by 11/6/2023) (tjc, Dpty Clk)
October 16, 2023 Filing 17 MINUTE ORDER by Court Clerk , directing Oklahoma Health Care Authority to file a Disclosure Statement pursuant to FRCvP 7.1 and LCvR 7.1-1, if applicable. The parties shall use the form entitled Disclosure Statement available on the Courts website. (This entry is the Official Order of the Court. No document is attached.) (lmt, Dpty Clk)
October 13, 2023 Filing 16 ANSWER (Re: #2 Complaint ) by Oklahoma Health Care Authority (lmt, Dpty Clk)
October 13, 2023 Filing 15 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by David William Bryan on behalf of Oklahoma Health Care Authority [Note: Attorney David William Bryan added to party Oklahoma Health Care Authority(pty:dft).] (lmt, Dpty Clk)
September 20, 2023 Filing 14 SUMMONS Issued by Court Clerk as to Oklahoma Health Care Authority (dla, Dpty Clk)
September 19, 2023 Filing 13 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Steven William Soule' on behalf of Saint Francis Hospital, Inc., Tahlequah Hospital Authority (Soule', Steven)
September 13, 2023 Filing 12 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Kasey Ashford on behalf of Saint Francis Hospital, Inc., Tahlequah Hospital Authority (Ashford, Kasey)
September 12, 2023 Filing 11 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Daniel J Hettich on behalf of Saint Francis Hospital, Inc., Tahlequah Hospital Authority (Hettich, Daniel)
September 12, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 10 MINUTE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Christine D Little The motions for admission pro hac vice (# 8, 9) are granted. Kassandra L. Ashford and Daniel J. Hettich are admitted pro hac vice for purposes of this action. They shall each enter an entry of appearance forthwith. ; granting #8 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice; granting #9 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice (Re: #8 MOTION for Attorney(s) Kassandra L. Ashford to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $100 PHV fee; receipt number AOKNDC-2873617), #9 MOTION for Attorney(s) Daniel J. Hettich to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice ) (This entry is the Official Order of the Court. No document is attached.) (CDL1, Chambers)
September 11, 2023 Filing 9 MOTION for Attorney(s) Daniel J. Hettich to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $100 PHV fee; receipt number AOKNDC-2873478) by Saint Francis Hospital, Inc., Tahlequah Hospital Authority (With attachments) (Lamle, Carson) Modified on 9/11/2023 to include payment receipt information (lmt, Dpty Clk).
September 11, 2023 Filing 8 MOTION for Attorney(s) Kassandra L. Ashford to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $100 PHV fee; receipt number AOKNDC-2873617) by Saint Francis Hospital, Inc., Tahlequah Hospital Authority (With attachments) (Lamle, Carson)
September 8, 2023 Filing 7 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT OF CASE TO A UNITED STATES MAGISTRATE JUDGE AND DECLINATION OF CONSENT FORM. ACTION REQUIRED: This case has been randomly assigned to a United States magistrate judge for all purposes, including trial, final entry of judgment, and direct review by the Tenth Circuit Court of Appeals. Each party will be deemed to have knowingly and voluntarily consented to proceed before the assigned Magistrate Judge, if the attached form is not signed and returned within the applicable deadline. The plaintiff or removing party must serve a copy of this notice upon all other parties to this action. (dla, Dpty Clk)
September 8, 2023 Filing 6 MINUTE ORDER by Court Clerk , directing Saint Francis Hospital, Inc. and Tahlequah Hospital Authority to file a Disclosure Statement pursuant to FRCvP 7.1 and LCvR 7.1-1, if applicable. The parties shall use the form entitled Disclosure Statement available on the Courts website. (This entry is the Official Order of the Court. No document is attached.) (dla, Dpty Clk)
September 8, 2023 Filing 5 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Saint Francis Hospital, Inc. (Lamle, Carson)
September 8, 2023 Filing 4 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Tahlequah Hospital Authority (Lamle, Carson)
September 8, 2023 Filing 3 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Carson Glass Lamle on behalf of Saint Francis Hospital, Inc., Tahlequah Hospital Authority (Lamle, Carson)
September 8, 2023 Filing 2 COMPLAINT against Oklahoma Health Care Authority (paid $402 filing fee; receipt number AOKNDC-2873445) by Tahlequah Hospital Authority, Saint Francis Hospital, Inc. (Lamle, Carson)
September 8, 2023 Filing 1 CIVIL COVER SHEET by Saint Francis Hospital, Inc., Tahlequah Hospital Authority (Lamle, Carson)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oklahoma Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Saint Francis Hospital, Inc. et al v. Oklahoma Health Care Authority
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Saint Francis Hospital, Inc.
Represented By: Carson Glass Lamle
Represented By: Steven William Soule'
Represented By: Daniel J Hettich
Represented By: Kasey Ashford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tahlequah Hospital Authority doing business as Northeastern Health System
Represented By: Daniel J Hettich
Represented By: Steven William Soule'
Represented By: Carson Glass Lamle
Represented By: Kasey Ashford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Oklahoma Health Care Authority
Represented By: Charles E Geister, III
Represented By: David William Bryan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?