Crawford et al v. Texas Roadhouse Holdings, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Vicki Kay Crawford and Linda Lea Hammontree
Defendant: Texas Roadhouse Holdings, LLC and Texas Roadhouse Management Corp
Case Number: 4:2023cv00402
Filed: September 15, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Oklahoma
Presiding Judge: Claire V Eagan
Referring Judge: Susan E Huntsman
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Personal Injury
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 7, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 7, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 15 SCHEDULING ORDER by Judge Claire V Eagan (INITIAL), setting/resetting scheduling order date(s): (Motions in Limine due 5/28/2024) ( Discovery due by 2/29/2024, Dispositive Motions due by 4/4/2024, Proposed Pretrial Order due by 7/9/2024, Pretrial Conference set for 7/22/2024 at 09:30 AM before Judge Claire V Eagan, Jury Trial set for 8/19/2024 at 09:15 AM before Judge Claire V Eagan) (RGG, Chambers)
November 6, 2023 Filing 14 JOINT STATUS REPORT by Texas Roadhouse Holdings, LLC, Texas Roadhouse Management Corp (Brewer, Michael)
October 4, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER by Judge Claire V Eagan - As this matter has been assigned to the undersigned District Judge (Dkt. # 12), the previous order for joint status report is vacated, and the October 16, 2023 status conference is stricken (see Dkt. # 10). Pursuant to LCvR16.1, the parties are directed to prepare, and file of record in this matter, a Joint Status Report on or before November 3, 2023. Joint Status Report (District Judge Presiding) forms are available in the Court Clerk's office, or can be obtained from our public web site at www.oknd.uscourts.gov., vacating/setting aside order(s), striking/terminating deadline(s)/Hearing(s), directing parties to file joint status report ( Status Report due by 11/3/2023) (Re: #10 Order,, Directing Parties to File Joint Status Report,, Setting/Resetting Deadline(s)/Hearing(s), 12 Minute Order,, Assigning Case to District Judge, ) (Documents Terminated: #10 Order,, Directing Parties to File Joint Status Report,, Setting/Resetting Deadline(s)/Hearing(s), ) (RGG, Chambers)
October 4, 2023 Filing 12 MINUTE ORDER by Court Clerk , assigning this case to a district judge. Assigning case to District Judge Claire V Eagan and Magistrate Judge Susan E Huntsman (This entry is the Official Order of the Court. No document is attached.) (lmt, Dpty Clk)
September 29, 2023 Filing 11 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Jason Bolitho on behalf of All Plaintiffs [Note: Attorney Jason Bolitho added to party Vicki Kay Crawford(pty:pla), Attorney Jason Bolitho added to party Linda Lea Hammontree(pty:pla).] (Bolitho, Jason)
September 18, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Susan E Huntsman , directing parties to file joint status report ( Status Report due by 10/10/2023), setting/resetting deadline(s)/hearing(s): ( Status Report due by 10/10/2023, Scheduling Conference set for 10/16/2023 at 01:30 PM before Magistrate Judge Susan E Huntsman) (dlg, Dpty Clk) Modified on 10/5/2023 - VACATED per #13 (dla, Dpty Clk).
September 18, 2023 Filing 9 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT OF CASE TO A UNITED STATES MAGISTRATE JUDGE AND DECLINATION OF CONSENT FORM. ACTION REQUIRED: This case has been randomly assigned to a United States magistrate judge for all purposes, including trial, final entry of judgment, and direct review by the Tenth Circuit Court of Appeals. Each party will be deemed to have knowingly and voluntarily consented to proceed before the assigned Magistrate Judge, if the attached form is not signed and returned within the applicable deadline. The plaintiff or removing party must serve a copy of this notice upon all other parties to this action. (blc, Dpty Clk)
September 18, 2023 Filing 8 MINUTE ORDER by Court Clerk , directing Vicki Kay Crawford. Linda Lea Hammontree, Texas Roadhouse Holdings, LLC, Texas Roadhouse Management Corp. to file a Disclosure Statement pursuant to FRCvP 7.1 and LCvR 7.1-1, if applicable. The parties shall use the form entitled Disclosure Statement available on the Courts website. (This entry is the Official Order of the Court. No document is attached.) (blc, Dpty Clk)
September 15, 2023 Filing 7 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Andre V Farinha on behalf of Texas Roadhouse Holdings, LLC, Texas Roadhouse Management Corp [Note: Attorney Andre V Farinha added to party Texas Roadhouse Holdings, LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Andre V Farinha added to party Texas Roadhouse Management Corp(pty:dft).] (Farinha, Andre)
September 15, 2023 Filing 6 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Texas Roadhouse Management Corp (Brewer, Michael)
September 15, 2023 Filing 5 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Texas Roadhouse Holdings, LLC (Brewer, Michael) Modified on 9/15/2023 to correct filer (lmt, Dpty Clk).
September 15, 2023 Filing 4 JURY DEMAND by Texas Roadhouse Holdings, LLC, Texas Roadhouse Management Corp (Brewer, Michael)
September 15, 2023 Filing 3 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Michael Wayne Brewer on behalf of Texas Roadhouse Holdings, LLC, Texas Roadhouse Management Corp (Brewer, Michael)
September 15, 2023 Filing 2 NOTICE of Removal from Tulsa County, case number CJ-2023-2034 (paid $402 filing fee; receipt number AOKNDC-2876421) by Texas Roadhouse Holdings, LLC, Texas Roadhouse Management Corp (With attachments) (Brewer, Michael)
September 15, 2023 Filing 1 CIVIL COVER SHEET by Texas Roadhouse Holdings, LLC, Texas Roadhouse Management Corp (Brewer, Michael)
June 9, 2023 PETITION/COMPLAINT filed in State Court against Texas Roadhouse Holdings, LLC, Texas Roadhouse Management Corp by Vicki Kay Crawford, Linda Lea Hammontree (blc, Dpty Clk)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oklahoma Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Crawford et al v. Texas Roadhouse Holdings, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Vicki Kay Crawford
Represented By: Matthew D Reinstein
Represented By: Matthew Reinstein
Represented By: Jason Bolitho
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Linda Lea Hammontree
Represented By: Matthew D Reinstein
Represented By: Jason Bolitho
Represented By: Matthew Reinstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Texas Roadhouse Holdings, LLC
Represented By: Andre V Farinha
Represented By: Michael Wayne Brewer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Texas Roadhouse Management Corp
Represented By: Andre V Farinha
Represented By: Michael Wayne Brewer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?