Culbertson v. Sam's East, Inc.
Plaintiff: Pamela J Culbertson
Defendant: Walmart, Inc. doing business as Sam's Club and Sam's East, Inc. doing business as Sam's Club previously named as Walmart, Inc.
Case Number: 4:2023cv00415
Filed: September 26, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Oklahoma
Presiding Judge: John F Heil
Referring Judge: Susan E Huntsman
2 Judge: Mark T Steele
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Personal Injury
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 1, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 1, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 24 SCHEDULING ORDER by Magistrate Judge Susan E Huntsman , setting/resetting scheduling order date(s): ( Discovery due by 4/24/2024, Dispositive Motions due by 5/8/2024, Proposed Pretrial Order due by 8/8/2024) (dlg, Dpty Clk)
November 1, 2023 Filing 23 MINUTES of Proceedings - held before Magistrate Judge Susan E Huntsman: Scheduling Conference held on 11/1/2023 , striking/terminating deadline(s)/Hearing(s) (Court Reporter: c1) (dlg, Dpty Clk)
October 24, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 22 MINUTE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Susan E Huntsman The Scheduling Conference remains scheduled for 11/01/2023 at 10:30 a.m. in Magistrate Courtroom #1 (3rd Floor) (Re: #20 Order,, Directing Parties to File Joint Status Report,, Setting/Resetting Deadline(s)/Hearing(s), ) (This entry is the Official Order of the Court. No document is attached.) (dlg, Dpty Clk)
October 23, 2023 Filing 21 JOINT STATUS REPORT by Sam's East, Inc. (Lawyer, Cyrus)
October 2, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Susan E Huntsman , directing parties to file joint status report ( Status Report due by 10/23/2023), setting/resetting deadline(s)/hearing(s): ( Status Report due by 10/23/2023, Scheduling Conference set for 11/1/2023 at 10:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Susan E Huntsman) (dlg, Dpty Clk)
October 2, 2023 Filing 19 Amended DISCLOSURE STATEMENT (identifying: Corporate Parent Walmart Inc. for Sam's East, Inc.) by Sam's East, Inc. (Lawyer, Cyrus)
October 2, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Susan E Huntsman , setting/resetting deadline(s)/hearing(s): ( Miscellaneous Deadline set for 10/10/2023) (Re: #10 Disclosure Statement (Rule 7.1) ) (kah, Chambers)
September 29, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 17 MINUTE ORDER by District Judge John F. Heil, III, referring case to Magistrate Judge Susan E Huntsman for all further proceedings in accordance with their jurisdiction pursuant to 28 USC 636 . (This entry is the Official Order of the Court. No document is attached.) (JFH1, Chambers)
September 28, 2023 Filing 16 JURY DEMAND by Pamela J Culbertson (Beeler, Blake)
September 28, 2023 Filing 15 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Pamela J Culbertson (Beeler, Blake)
September 28, 2023 Filing 14 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Blake Dean Beeler on behalf of Pamela J Culbertson (Beeler, Blake)
September 27, 2023 Filing 13 CERTIFICATE of State Court Clerk by Sam's East, Inc. (Lawyer, Cyrus)
September 27, 2023 Filing 12 MINUTE ORDER , recusing Magistrate Judge Mark T Steele. Magistrate Judge Susan E Huntsman reassigned to case., changing case number to 23-cv-00415-JFH-SH (This entry is the Official Order of the Court. No document is attached.) (ll, Dpty Clk)
September 27, 2023 Filing 11 MINUTE ORDER by Court Clerk , assigning this case to a district judge. Assigning case to District Judge John F Heil and Magistrate Judge Mark T Steele, changing case number to 23-cv-00415-JFH-MTS (This entry is the Official Order of the Court. No document is attached.) (blc, Dpty Clk)
September 27, 2023 Filing 10 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT (identifying: Corporate Parent Walmart Inc. for Sam's East, Inc.) by Sam's East, Inc. (Lawyer, Cyrus)
September 27, 2023 Filing 9 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Margaret M. Clarke on behalf of Sam's East, Inc. [Note: Attorney Margaret M. Clarke added to party Sam's East, Inc.(pty:dft).] (Clarke, Margaret)
September 27, 2023 Filing 8 MINUTE ORDER by Court Clerk , directing the party name for Walmart, Inc. be corrected as indicated in the Notice of Party Name Correction. If any other party to this case objects to this Party Name Correction, they shall file a Motion to Reconsider Party Name Correction within seven (7) days of this order. (Re: #4 Notice of Party Name Correction ) (This entry is the Official Order of the Court. No document is attached.) (blc, Dpty Clk)
September 27, 2023 Filing 7 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT OF CASE TO A UNITED STATES MAGISTRATE JUDGE AND DECLINATION OF CONSENT FORM. ACTION REQUIRED: This case has been randomly assigned to a United States magistrate judge for all purposes, including trial, final entry of judgment, and direct review by the Tenth Circuit Court of Appeals. Each party will be deemed to have knowingly and voluntarily consented to proceed before the assigned Magistrate Judge, if the attached form is not signed and returned within the applicable deadline. The plaintiff or removing party must serve a copy of this notice upon all other parties to this action. (blc, Dpty Clk)
September 27, 2023 Filing 6 MINUTE ORDER by Court Clerk , directing Pamela J. Culbertson, Walmart, Inc. to file a Disclosure Statement pursuant to FRCvP 7.1 and LCvR 7.1-1, if applicable. The parties shall use the form entitled Disclosure Statement available on the Courts website. (This entry is the Official Order of the Court. No document is attached.) (blc, Dpty Clk)
September 26, 2023 Filing 5 JURY DEMAND by Walmart, Inc. (Lawyer, Cyrus)
September 26, 2023 Filing 4 NOTICE of Party Name Correction by Walmart, Inc. (Lawyer, Cyrus)
September 26, 2023 Filing 3 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Cyrus Nathaniel Lawyer on behalf of Walmart, Inc. (Lawyer, Cyrus)
September 26, 2023 Filing 2 NOTICE of Removal with Jury Demand from Tulsa Co, case number 23cv415 (paid $402 filing fee; receipt number AOKNDC-2881101) by Walmart, Inc. (With attachments) (Lawyer, Cyrus)
September 26, 2023 Filing 1 CIVIL COVER SHEET by Walmart, Inc. (Lawyer, Cyrus)
June 26, 2023 PETITION/COMPLAINT filed in State Court against Walmart, Inc. by Pamela J Culbertson (blc, Dpty Clk)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oklahoma Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Culbertson v. Sam's East, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Pamela J Culbertson
Represented By: Blake Dean Beeler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Walmart, Inc. doing business as Sam's Club
Represented By: Cyrus Nathaniel Lawyer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sam's East, Inc. doing business as Sam's Club previously named as Walmart, Inc.
Represented By: Cyrus Nathaniel Lawyer
Represented By: Margaret M. Clarke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?