Barnett v. Regalado et al
Plaintiff: Christopher J Barnett, Christopher J Magnum and Chris Mangum
Defendant: Vic Regalado, Chaplin Bell, Chaplin Smiley, Ian Napier and DO Lynch
Case Number: 4:2023cv00445
Filed: October 13, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Oklahoma
Presiding Judge: Claire V Eagan
Referring Judge: Susan E Huntsman
Nature of Suit: Prisoner Petitions (Prison Condition)
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 11, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 11, 2023 Filing 20 NOTICE of Change of Address by Christopher J Barnett (dla, Dpty Clk)
December 11, 2023 Filing 19 MOTION for Hearing by Christopher J Barnett (dla, Dpty Clk)
December 11, 2023 ***Remark: Copy of the docket sheet to mailed to Christopher Barnett at the updated address (dla, Dpty Clk)
December 4, 2023 Filing 18 NOTICE of temporary transfer to Okmulgee County Jail (address confirmed as Tulsa County Jail) (lmt, Dpty Clk)
December 4, 2023 Filing 17 LETTER re: case (2254 forms sent) (lmt, Dpty Clk)
November 20, 2023 Filing 16 LETTER from plaintiff re: denial of access to courts (sna, Dpty Clk)
November 13, 2023 Filing 15 MOTION for Hearing , MOTION for Appointment of Counsel by Christopher J Barnett (sna, Dpty Clk)
November 3, 2023 Filing 14 MOTION to Waive Initial Partial Filing Fee by Christopher J Barnett (dla, Dpty Clk)
November 1, 2023 Filing 13 LETTER re: filing fees by Christopher J Barnett (dla, Dpty Clk)
October 27, 2023 Filing 12 LETTER to Christopher J Barnett (dla, Dpty Clk)
October 27, 2023 Filing 11 LETTER re copies by Christopher J Barnett (dla, Dpty Clk)
October 27, 2023 Filing 10 MOTION for Hearing by Christopher J Barnett (dla, Dpty Clk)
October 26, 2023 Filing 9 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by Christopher J Barnett (dla, Dpty Clk)
October 23, 2023 Filing 8 LETTER re: current address by Christopher J Barnett (dla, Dpty Clk)
October 20, 2023 Filing 7 LETTER to plaintiff (lmt, Dpty Clk)
October 20, 2023 Filing 6 MOTION to Amend (Re: #4 Amended Complaint ) by Christopher J Barnett (lmt, Dpty Clk)
October 18, 2023 Filing 5 ***Remark: 2 summons and 2 USM-285s in hold tray. (lmt, Dpty Clk)
October 18, 2023 Filing 4 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Re: #1 Complaint ) by Christopher J Barnett (lmt, Dpty Clk)
October 13, 2023 Filing 3 ***Remark: received 3 summons and 3 USM285s (in hold tray) (lmt, Dpty Clk)
October 13, 2023 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in Forma Pauperis by Christopher J Barnett (lmt, Dpty Clk)
October 13, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants by Christopher J Barnett (lmt, Dpty Clk)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oklahoma Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Barnett v. Regalado et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christopher J Barnett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christopher J Magnum
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Chris Mangum
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Vic Regalado
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chaplin Bell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chaplin Smiley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ian Napier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DO Lynch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?