CSAA General Insurance Company v. Owings et al
Defendant: LouAnn Owings, Jeremy Owings, Samar Alfarkh and Haitham Karout
Counter Defendant: CSAA General Insurance Company
Case Number: 4:2023cv00450
Filed: October 18, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Oklahoma
Presiding Judge: Christine D Little
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Declaratory Judgement
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 12, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 12, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Christine D Little , directing parties to file joint status report ( Status Report due by 1/12/2024) (tjc, Dpty Clk)
December 12, 2023 Filing 20 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Ryan James Fulda on behalf of Samar Alfarkh [Note: Attorney Ryan James Fulda added to party Samar Alfarkh(pty:cc), Attorney Ryan James Fulda added to party Samar Alfarkh(pty:dft).] (Fulda, Ryan)
December 11, 2023 Filing 19 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Lawrence Richard Murphy, Jr on behalf of Samar Alfarkh [Note: Attorney Lawrence Richard Murphy, Jr added to party Samar Alfarkh(pty:cc), Attorney Lawrence Richard Murphy, Jr added to party Samar Alfarkh(pty:dft).] (Murphy, Lawrence)
December 11, 2023 Filing 18 ANSWER with Jury Demand (Re: #2 Complaint, ) by Samar Alfarkh (Hamilton, Laura)
December 11, 2023 Filing 17 COUNTERCLAIM with Jury Demand against CSAA General Insurance Company by Samar Alfarkh (Hamilton, Laura)
December 11, 2023 Filing 16 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Laura L Hamilton on behalf of Samar Alfarkh [Note: Attorney Laura L Hamilton added to party Samar Alfarkh(pty:dft).] (Hamilton, Laura)
November 13, 2023 Filing 15 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT (identifying: Other Affiliate LouAnn Owings for LouAnn Owings) by LouAnn Owings (Koller, A)
November 9, 2023 Filing 14 SUMMONS Returned Executed re: Samar Alfarkh (Re: #2 Complaint, ) by CSAA General Insurance Company (Mullins, Marcus)
November 9, 2023 Filing 13 SUMMONS Returned Executed re: LouAnn Owings (Re: #2 Complaint, ) by CSAA General Insurance Company (Mullins, Marcus)
November 9, 2023 Filing 12 SUMMONS Returned Executed re: Jeremy Owings (Re: #2 Complaint, ) by CSAA General Insurance Company (Mullins, Marcus)
November 9, 2023 Filing 11 SUMMONS Returned Executed re: Haitham Karout (Re: #2 Complaint, ) by CSAA General Insurance Company (Mullins, Marcus)
November 6, 2023 Filing 10 MINUTE ORDER by Court Clerk , directing LouAnn Owings to file a Disclosure Statement pursuant to FRCvP 7.1 and LCvR 7.1-1, if applicable. The parties shall use the form entitled Disclosure Statement available on the Courts website. (This entry is the Official Order of the Court. No document is attached.) (lmt, Dpty Clk)
November 2, 2023 Filing 9 DISCLAIMER by LouAnn Owings [Note: Attorney A Laurie Koller added to party LouAnn Owings(pty:dft).] (Koller, A)
October 19, 2023 Filing 8 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT (identifying: Corporate Parent CSAA Insurance Exchange for CSAA General Insurance Company) by CSAA General Insurance Company (Loy, Katherine)
October 18, 2023 Filing 7 SUMMONS Issued by Court Clerk as to All Defendants (lmt, Dpty Clk)
October 18, 2023 Filing 6 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Marcus Glen Mullins on behalf of CSAA General Insurance Company [Note: Attorney Marcus Glen Mullins added to party CSAA General Insurance Company(pty:pla).] (Mullins, Marcus)
October 18, 2023 Filing 5 MINUTE ORDER by Court Clerk , directing CSAA General Insurance Company to file a Disclosure Statement pursuant to FRCvP 7.1 and LCvR 7.1-1, if applicable. The parties shall use the form entitled Disclosure Statement available on the Courts website. (This entry is the Official Order of the Court. No document is attached.) (sna, Dpty Clk)
October 18, 2023 Filing 4 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Katherine Ann Taylor Loy on behalf of CSAA General Insurance Company (Loy, Katherine)
October 18, 2023 Filing 3 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT OF CASE TO A UNITED STATES MAGISTRATE JUDGE AND DECLINATION OF CONSENT FORM. ACTION REQUIRED: This case has been randomly assigned to a United States magistrate judge for all purposes, including trial, final entry of judgment, and direct review by the Tenth Circuit Court of Appeals. Each party will be deemed to have knowingly and voluntarily consented to proceed before the assigned Magistrate Judge, if the attached form is not signed and returned within the applicable deadline. The plaintiff or removing party must serve a copy of this notice upon all other parties to this action. (sna, Dpty Clk)
October 18, 2023 Filing 2 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against Samar Alfarkh, Haitham Karout, Jeremy Owings, LouAnn Owings (paid $402 filing fee; receipt number AOKNDC-2891261) by CSAA General Insurance Company (Loy, Katherine) Modified on 10/18/2023 to add filing fee receipt information. (blc, Dpty Clk).
October 18, 2023 Filing 1 CIVIL COVER SHEET by CSAA General Insurance Company (Loy, Katherine)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oklahoma Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: CSAA General Insurance Company v. Owings et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter defendant: CSAA General Insurance Company
Represented By: Katherine Ann Taylor Loy
Represented By: Marcus Glen Mullins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LouAnn Owings
Represented By: A Laurie Koller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeremy Owings
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Samar Alfarkh
Represented By: Laura L Hamilton
Represented By: Lawrence Richard Murphy, Jr
Represented By: Ryan James Fulda
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Haitham Karout
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?