Leonard v. Walton et al
Plaintiff: David Wayne Leonard
Defendant: Scott Walton, K. Jones, Turn Key Health Clinics, Inc. and K Jones
Case Number: 4:2023cv00451
Filed: October 18, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Oklahoma
Presiding Judge: John F Heil
Referring Judge: Christine D Little
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 14, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 14, 2023 Filing 21 Supplemental DISCLOSURE STATEMENT (identifying: Corporate Parent TK Health Holdings, LLC, Corporate Parent TCSCFI TK LLC for Turn Key Health Clinics, Inc.) by Turn Key Health Clinics, Inc. (Campbell, Timothy)
December 7, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 20 MINUTE ORDER by Chief Judge John F Heil, III , directing Defendant Turn Key Health, LLC to file a supplemental corporate disclosure statement pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1 within seven (7) days of this Order. Its initial disclosure #16 states that TK Health Holdings, LLC is the only member of Turn Key Health Holdings, LLC. The supplemental disclosure statement shall identify each of TK Health Holdings, LLCs members and sub-members down to the level of the individual or corporation. (This entry is the Official Order of the Court. No document is attached.) (JFH1, Chambers)
December 6, 2023 Filing 19 MINUTE ORDER by Court Clerk , assigning this case to a district judge. Assigning case to District Judge John F Heil, III and Magistrate Judge Christine D Little, changing case number to 23-cv-00451-JFH-CDL (This entry is the Official Order of the Court. No document is attached.) (dla, Dpty Clk)
December 6, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Christine D Little , directing parties to file joint status report ( Status Report due by 12/27/2023) (tjc, Dpty Clk)
December 5, 2023 Filing 17 MOTION to Dismiss and Brief in Support by Turn Key Health Clinics, Inc. (Campbell, Timothy)
December 5, 2023 Filing 16 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT (identifying: Corporate Parent TK Health Holdings, LLC, Corporate Parent TCSCFI TK, LLC for Turn Key Health Clinics, Inc.) by Turn Key Health Clinics, Inc. (Campbell, Timothy)
December 5, 2023 Filing 15 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Timothy F. Campbell on behalf of Turn Key Health Clinics, Inc. [Note: Attorney Timothy F. Campbell added to party Turn Key Health Clinics, Inc.(pty:dft).] (Campbell, Timothy)
December 5, 2023 Filing 14 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Alexandra Gabrielle Ah Loy on behalf of Turn Key Health Clinics, Inc. [Note: Attorney Alexandra Gabrielle Ah Loy added to party Turn Key Health Clinics, Inc.(pty:dft).] (Ah Loy, Alexandra)
November 15, 2023 Filing 13 JURY DEMAND by Scott Walton (Fagin, Kasey)
November 14, 2023 Filing 12 MINUTE ORDER by Court Clerk , directing Scott Walton to file a Disclosure Statement pursuant to FRCvP 7.1 and LCvR 7.1-1, if applicable. The parties shall use the form entitled Disclosure Statement available on the Courts website. (This entry is the Official Order of the Court. No document is attached.) (sna, Dpty Clk)
November 10, 2023 Filing 11 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Bryon Davis Helm on behalf of David Wayne Leonard [Note: Attorney Bryon Davis Helm added to party David Wayne Leonard(pty:pla).] (Helm, Bryon)
November 10, 2023 Filing 10 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Robert Murray Blakemore on behalf of David Wayne Leonard [Note: Attorney Robert Murray Blakemore added to party David Wayne Leonard(pty:pla).] (Blakemore, Robert)
November 10, 2023 Filing 9 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Thomas Adrian LeBlanc on behalf of Scott Walton [Note: Attorney Thomas Adrian LeBlanc added to party Scott Walton(pty:dft).] (LeBlanc, Thomas)
November 10, 2023 Filing 8 ANSWER (Re: #2 Complaint ) by Scott Walton (Fagin, Kasey) Modified on 11/12/2023 to correct docket text (lmt, Dpty Clk).
November 10, 2023 Filing 7 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Kasey Kyle Fagin on behalf of Scott Walton [Note: Attorney Kasey Kyle Fagin added to party Scott Walton(pty:dft).] (Fagin, Kasey)
October 26, 2023 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed re: Scott Walton (Re: #2 Complaint ) by David Wayne Leonard (Smolen, Daniel)
October 18, 2023 Filing 5 MINUTE ORDER by Court Clerk , directing David Wayne Leonard to file a Disclosure Statement pursuant to FRCvP 7.1 and LCvR 7.1-1, if applicable. The parties shall use the form entitled Disclosure Statement available on the Courts website. (This entry is the Official Order of the Court. No document is attached.) (sna, Dpty Clk)
October 18, 2023 Filing 4 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT OF CASE TO A UNITED STATES MAGISTRATE JUDGE AND DECLINATION OF CONSENT FORM. ACTION REQUIRED: This case has been randomly assigned to a United States magistrate judge for all purposes, including trial, final entry of judgment, and direct review by the Tenth Circuit Court of Appeals. Each party will be deemed to have knowingly and voluntarily consented to proceed before the assigned Magistrate Judge, if the attached form is not signed and returned within the applicable deadline. The plaintiff or removing party must serve a copy of this notice upon all other parties to this action. (sna, Dpty Clk)
October 18, 2023 Filing 3 SUMMONS Issued by Court Clerk as to All Defendants (lmt, Dpty Clk)
October 18, 2023 Filing 2 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against All Defendants (paid $402 filing fee; receipt number AOKNDC-2891629) by David Wayne Leonard (Smolen, Daniel) Modified on 10/20/2023 to correct "against" language (blc, Dpty Clk).
October 18, 2023 Filing 1 CIVIL COVER SHEET by David Wayne Leonard (Smolen, Daniel)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oklahoma Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Leonard v. Walton et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Wayne Leonard
Represented By: Daniel E Smolen
Represented By: Bryon Davis Helm
Represented By: Robert Murray Blakemore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Scott Walton
Represented By: Kasey Kyle Fagin
Represented By: Thomas Adrian LeBlanc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: K. Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Turn Key Health Clinics, Inc.
Represented By: Alexandra Gabrielle Ah Loy
Represented By: Timothy F. Campbell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: K Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?