Bessinger v. Cimarex Energy Co. et al
Plaintiff: Jay Bessinger
Defendant: Cimarex Energy Co. and Coterra Energy, Inc.
Case Number: 4:2023cv00452
Filed: October 19, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Oklahoma
Presiding Judge: Susan E Huntsman
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 1001 E.R.I.S.A.: Employee Retirement
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 14, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 14, 2023 Filing 18 REPLY to Response to Motion (Re: #10 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim ) by Cimarex Energy Co., Coterra Energy, Inc. ; (Stewart, Leasa)
November 30, 2023 Filing 17 RESPONSE in Opposition to Motion (Re: #10 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim ) by Jay Bessinger ; (With attachments) (Smith, Mark)
November 21, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 16 MINUTE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Susan E Huntsman Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 16(b)(2), the Court finds good cause to delay entry of a Scheduling Order in this case as Defendants have filed a motion to dismiss (ECF No. 10). A Scheduling Order will be entered after the resolution of any motions to dismiss the complaint. The Scheduling Conference, set for 12/4/23 is hereby stricken., striking/terminating deadline(s)/Hearing(s) (Re: #10 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim ) (This entry is the Official Order of the Court. No document is attached.) (SHJ, Judge)
November 20, 2023 Filing 15 JOINT STATUS REPORT by Jay Bessinger (Smith, Mark)
November 9, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 14 MINUTE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Susan E Huntsman due to a clerical error, the reply deadline for the motion to dismiss (ECF No. 10) is corrected to 12/14/2023, setting/resetting deadline(s)/hearing(s): ( Replies due by 12/14/2023) (Re: 13 Minute Order,,, Setting/Resetting Deadline(s)/Hearing(s),,, Ruling on Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Motion,, #10 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim ) (This entry is the Official Order of the Court. No document is attached.) (kah, Chambers)
November 8, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 13 MINUTE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Susan E Huntsman ; setting/resetting deadline(s)/hearing(s): ( Responses due by 11/30/2023, Replies due by 12/7/2023); granting #12 Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Motion (Re: #10 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim , #12 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Motion ) (This entry is the Official Order of the Court. No document is attached.) (kah, Chambers)
November 7, 2023 Filing 12 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Motion (Re: #10 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim ) by Jay Bessinger (Smith, Mark)
October 30, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Susan E Huntsman , setting/resetting deadline(s)/hearing(s): ( Status Report due by 11/20/2023, Scheduling Conference set for 12/4/2023 at 09:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Susan E Huntsman) (dlg, Dpty Clk)
October 26, 2023 Filing 10 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by Cimarex Energy Co., Coterra Energy, Inc. (With attachments) (Stewart, Leasa)
October 25, 2023 Filing 9 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT (identifying: Other Affiliate Cimarex Energy Co., Other Affiliate Prize Energy Resources, Inc., Other Affiliate Magnum Hunter Production, Inc., Other Affiliate Big Sandy Gas Company, Other Affiliate Cody Energy, LLC, Other Affiliate COG Finance Corporation, Other Affiliate GasSearch Drilling Services Corporation, Other Affiliate Susquehanna Real Estate I Corporation, Other Affiliate Cabot Pipeline Holdings, LLC, Other Affiliate COG Holdings LLC, Other Affiliate Bruin Exploration LLC, Other Affiliate Blue Devil Exploration, LLC, Other Affiliate BEC Texas LLC, Other Affiliate Blue Steel Operating LLC, Other Affiliate Key Production Company, Other Affiliate Cimarex Energy of Colorado, Other Affiliate Cimarex Gas Gathering, Inc., Other Affiliate Cimarex Resolute LLC, Other Affiliate Hunter Resources, Inc., Other Affiliate Oklahoma Gas Processing, Inc., Other Affiliate Conmag Energy Corporation, Other Affiliate Doblique Energy Corporation, Other Affiliate Resolute Natural Resources Company, LLC, Other Affiliate Resolute Northern Rockies, LLC, Other Affiliate Resolute Natural Resources Southwest, Other Affiliate WYNR, LLC, Other Affiliate BWNR, LLC, Other Affiliate Resolute Wyoming, Inc., Other Affiliate Hicks Acquisition Company I, Inc., Other Affiliate Falcon Hunter LLC for Coterra Energy, Inc.) by Coterra Energy, Inc. (With attachments) (Stewart, Leasa)
October 25, 2023 Filing 8 STATUS REPORT on Removed Action by Cimarex Energy Co., Coterra Energy, Inc. (Stewart, Leasa)
October 25, 2023 Filing 7 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT (identifying: Corporate Parent Coterra Energy Inc. for Cimarex Energy Co.) by Cimarex Energy Co. (Stewart, Leasa)
October 19, 2023 Filing 6 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Christopher S Thrutchley on behalf of Cimarex Energy Co., Coterra Energy, Inc. [Note: Attorney Christopher S Thrutchley added to party Cimarex Energy Co.(pty:dft), Attorney Christopher S Thrutchley added to party Coterra Energy, Inc.(pty:dft).] (Thrutchley, Christopher)
October 19, 2023 Filing 5 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Leasa M Stewart on behalf of Cimarex Energy Co., Coterra Energy, Inc. (Stewart, Leasa)
October 19, 2023 Filing 4 MINUTE ORDER by Court Clerk , directing Jay Bessinger, Cimarex Energy Co., and Coterra Energy, Inc. to file a Disclosure Statement pursuant to FRCvP 7.1 and LCvR 7.1-1, if applicable. The parties shall use the form entitled Disclosure Statement available on the Courts website. (This entry is the Official Order of the Court. No document is attached.) (sna, Dpty Clk)
October 19, 2023 Filing 3 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT OF CASE TO A UNITED STATES MAGISTRATE JUDGE AND DECLINATION OF CONSENT FORM. ACTION REQUIRED: This case has been randomly assigned to a United States magistrate judge for all purposes, including trial, final entry of judgment, and direct review by the Tenth Circuit Court of Appeals. Each party will be deemed to have knowingly and voluntarily consented to proceed before the assigned Magistrate Judge, if the attached form is not signed and returned within the applicable deadline. The plaintiff or removing party must serve a copy of this notice upon all other parties to this action. (sna, Dpty Clk)
October 19, 2023 Filing 2 NOTICE of Removal from District Court of Tulsa County, case number CJ-2023-03308 (paid $402 filing fee; receipt number AOKNDC-2892337) by Cimarex Energy Co., Coterra Energy, Inc. (With attachments) (Stewart, Leasa)
October 19, 2023 Filing 1 CIVIL COVER SHEET by Cimarex Energy Co., Coterra Energy, Inc. (Stewart, Leasa)
October 3, 2023 Amended PETITION/COMPLAINT filed in State Court against All Defendants by Jay Bessinger (sna, Dpty Clk)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oklahoma Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bessinger v. Cimarex Energy Co. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jay Bessinger
Represented By: Mark Allen Smith
Represented By: Daniel E Smolen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cimarex Energy Co.
Represented By: Christopher S Thrutchley
Represented By: Leasa M Stewart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Coterra Energy, Inc.
Represented By: Leasa M Stewart
Represented By: Christopher S Thrutchley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?