Lemmons v. Melody et al
Plaintiff: Tobin Don Lemmons
Defendant: Nurse Melody, Gentner Drummond, Administrative Head of State Agency, Turn Key Medical Providers, Jerry Skidgel, Kevin Stitt, Pawnee County Board of Commissioners, Attorney General of Oklahoma, Dr Mordecai, Office of Risk Management and Enterprise Service, State of Oklahoma, Darrin Varnell, Pawnee County Sheriff Office, Janet Morrow and Johnny Wagoner
Case Number: 4:2023cv00503
Filed: November 21, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Oklahoma
Presiding Judge: Terence Kern
Referring Judge: Mark T Steele
Nature of Suit: Prisoner Petitions (Prison Condition)
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 19, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 19, 2024 Filing 21 MOTION to Dismiss by Attorney General of Oklahoma, Gentner Drummond (Ray, Lauren)
January 19, 2024 Filing 20 MOTION to Dismiss by Administrative Head of State Agency, Kevin Stitt (Ray, Lauren)
January 19, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER by Judge Terence Kern ; setting/resetting deadline(s)/hearing(s): ( Miscellaneous Deadline set for 1/25/2024); granting #18 Motion for Leave to File Document(s) (Re: State Court Petition/Complaint, #18 MOTION for Leave to File Responsive Pleading ) (lmc, Chambers)
January 9, 2024 Filing 18 MOTION for Leave to File Responsive Pleading by Administrative Head of State Agency, Attorney General of Oklahoma, Gentner Drummond, Kevin Stitt (Ray, Lauren)
January 9, 2024 Filing 17 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Lauren J Ray on behalf of Administrative Head of State Agency, Attorney General of Oklahoma, Gentner Drummond, Kevin Stitt [Note: Attorney Lauren J Ray added to party Administrative Head of State Agency(pty:dft), Attorney Lauren J Ray added to party Attorney General of Oklahoma(pty:dft), Attorney Lauren J Ray added to party Gentner Drummond(pty:dft), Attorney Lauren J Ray added to party Kevin Stitt(pty:dft).] (Ray, Lauren)
January 8, 2024 Filing 16 NOTICE of Consent to Removal by Pawnee County Board of Commissioners (Williford, Jon)
January 8, 2024 Filing 15 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by Pawnee County Board of Commissioners, Pawnee County Sheriff Office, Jerry Skidgel, Darrin Varnell (With attachments) (Williford, Jon)
January 8, 2024 Filing 14 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Jon M Williford on behalf of Pawnee County Board of Commissioners [Note: Attorney Jon M Williford added to party Pawnee County Board of Commissioners (pty:dft).] (Williford, Jon)
January 8, 2024 Filing 13 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Stephen Leon Geries on behalf of Pawnee County Board of Commissioners [Note: Attorney Stephen Leon Geries added to party Pawnee County Board of Commissioners (pty:dft).] (Geries, Stephen)
January 8, 2024 Filing 12 NOTICE of Consent to Removal by Pawnee County Sheriff Office, Jerry Skidgel, Darrin Varnell (Williford, Jon)
January 8, 2024 Filing 11 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Jon M Williford on behalf of Pawnee County Sheriff Office, Jerry Skidgel, Darrin Varnell [Note: Attorney Jon M Williford added to party Pawnee County Sheriff Office(pty:dft), Attorney Jon M Williford added to party Jerry Skidgel(pty:dft), Attorney Jon M Williford added to party Darrin Varnell(pty:dft).] (Williford, Jon)
January 8, 2024 Filing 10 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Stephen Leon Geries on behalf of Pawnee County Sheriff Office, Jerry Skidgel, Darrin Varnell [Note: Attorney Stephen Leon Geries added to party Pawnee County Sheriff Office(pty:dft), Attorney Stephen Leon Geries added to party Jerry Skidgel(pty:dft), Attorney Stephen Leon Geries added to party Darrin Varnell(pty:dft).] (Geries, Stephen)
December 22, 2023 Filing 9 SUPPLEMENT (Re: State Court Petition/Complaint ) by Tobin Don Lemmons (sna, Dpty Clk)
November 28, 2023 Filing 8 MOTION to Quash Service by Dr Mordecai (Ah Loy, Alexandra)
November 28, 2023 Filing 7 MOTION to Dismiss by Turn Key Medical Providers (Ah Loy, Alexandra)
November 21, 2023 Filing 6 MINUTE ORDER by Court Clerk , directing Tobin Don Lemmons, Nurse Melody, Turn Key Medical Providers and Dr Mordecai to file a Disclosure Statement pursuant to FRCvP 7.1 and LCvR 7.1-1, if applicable. The parties shall use the form entitled Disclosure Statement available on the Courts website. (This entry is the Official Order of the Court. No document is attached.) (dla, Dpty Clk)
November 21, 2023 Filing 5 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT (identifying: Corporate Parent TK Health Holdings, LLC, Corporate Parent TCSCFI TK, LLC for Turn Key Medical Providers) by Turn Key Medical Providers (Ah Loy, Alexandra)
November 21, 2023 Filing 4 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Zachary E Williams on behalf of Nurse Melody, Dr Mordecai, Turn Key Medical Providers [Note: Attorney Zachary E Williams added to party Nurse Melody(pty:dft), Attorney Zachary E Williams added to party Dr Mordecai(pty:dft), Attorney Zachary E Williams added to party Turn Key Medical Providers(pty:dft).] (Williams, Zachary)
November 21, 2023 Filing 3 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Alexandra Gabrielle Ah Loy on behalf of Nurse Melody, Dr Mordecai, Turn Key Medical Providers (Ah Loy, Alexandra)
November 21, 2023 Filing 2 NOTICE of Removal with Jury Demand from Pawnee County District Court, case number CJ-2023-57 (paid $402 filing fee; receipt number AOKNDC-2910105) by Nurse Melody, Dr Mordecai, Turn Key Medical Providers (With attachments) (Ah Loy, Alexandra)
November 21, 2023 Filing 1 CIVIL COVER SHEET by Nurse Melody, Dr Mordecai, Turn Key Medical Providers [Note: Attorney Alexandra Gabrielle Ah Loy added to party Dr Mordecai(pty:dft).] (Ah Loy, Alexandra)
August 31, 2023 PETITION/COMPLAINT filed in State Court against All Defendants by Tobin Don Lemmons (dla, Dpty Clk)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oklahoma Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lemmons v. Melody et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tobin Don Lemmons
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nurse Melody
Represented By: Alexandra Gabrielle Ah Loy
Represented By: Zachary E Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gentner Drummond
Represented By: Lauren J Ray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Administrative Head of State Agency
Represented By: Lauren J Ray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Turn Key Medical Providers
Represented By: Alexandra Gabrielle Ah Loy
Represented By: Zachary E Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jerry Skidgel
Represented By: Jon M Williford
Represented By: Stephen Leon Geries
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kevin Stitt
Represented By: Lauren J Ray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pawnee County Board of Commissioners
Represented By: Jon M Williford
Represented By: Stephen Leon Geries
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Attorney General of Oklahoma
Represented By: Lauren J Ray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dr Mordecai
Represented By: Alexandra Gabrielle Ah Loy
Represented By: Zachary E Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Office of Risk Management and Enterprise Service
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State of Oklahoma
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Darrin Varnell
Represented By: Jon M Williford
Represented By: Stephen Leon Geries
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pawnee County Sheriff Office
Represented By: Jon M Williford
Represented By: Stephen Leon Geries
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Janet Morrow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Johnny Wagoner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?