McClain Group, LLC, The et al v. Hicks, et al
Plaintiff: McClain Group, LLC, The, MRT Holdings, LLC and FLDES VB PH1, LLC
Defendant: Preston Hicks, Diane Reagle, Rob Thompson, OKTUL BROP, LLC, Insight Psychiatric Hospital & Clinic, LLC, Reagle Consulting, LLC, Mingo 83, LLC, Thompson Construction, Inc and John Doe
Case Number: 4:2023cv00507
Filed: November 22, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Oklahoma
Presiding Judge: Claire V Eagan
Referring Judge: Jodi F Jayne
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Breach of Contract
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 18, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 18, 2024 Filing 42 RESPONSE in Opposition to Motion (Re: #4 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order ) by Mingo 83, LLC, Rob Thompson, Thompson Construction, Inc ; (With attachments) (Rogers, Timothy)
January 18, 2024 Filing 41 MOTION to Dismiss by Mingo 83, LLC, Rob Thompson, Thompson Construction, Inc (Rogers, Timothy)
January 18, 2024 Filing 40 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Diane Reagle (Rogers, Timothy)
January 18, 2024 Filing 39 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Thompson Construction, Inc (Rogers, Timothy)
January 18, 2024 Filing 38 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Insight Psychiatric Hospital & Clinic, LLC (Rogers, Timothy)
January 18, 2024 Filing 37 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Mingo 83, LLC (Rogers, Timothy)
January 18, 2024 Filing 36 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Reagle Consulting, LLC (Rogers, Timothy)
January 18, 2024 Filing 35 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Rob Thompson (Rogers, Timothy)
January 9, 2024 Filing 34 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim , MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by Preston Hicks, OKTUL BROP, LLC (With attachments) (Ross, David)
January 9, 2024 Filing 33 MINUTE ORDER by Court Clerk , directing Diane Reagle, Rob Thompson, Insight Psychiatric Hospital & Clinic, LLC, Reagle Consulting, LLC, Mingo 83, LLC, and Thompson Construction, Inc to file a Disclosure Statement pursuant to FRCvP 7.1 and LCvR 7.1-1, if applicable. The parties shall use the form entitled Disclosure Statement available on the Courts website. (This entry is the Official Order of the Court. No document is attached.) (drw, Dpty Clk)
January 8, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 32 MINUTE ORDER by Judge Claire V Eagan , Parties are to take notice that documents are being filed in this matter which incorrectly cite the case number. The correct case number, 23-CV-0507-CVE-JFJ, should be noted and corrected on all future pleadings. (Re: #30 Disclosure Statement (Rule 7.1), 5 Minute Order,, Assigning Case to District Judge,, Changing Case Number, #31 Disclosure Statement (Rule 7.1) ) (This entry is the Official Order of the Court. No document is attached.) (RGG, Chambers)
January 8, 2024 Filing 31 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by OKTUL BROP, LLC (Ross, David)
January 8, 2024 Filing 30 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Preston Hicks (Ross, David)
January 5, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 29 MINUTE ORDER by Judge Claire V Eagan - AMENDED TO CORRECT DEADLINES FOR MOVING DEFENDANTS - The unopposed motion (Dkt. # 26) is granted. Defendants Diane Reagle, Insight Psychiatric Hospital & Clinic, LLC, and Reagle Consulting, LLC, shall file their answer or other responsive pleading to plaintiffs complaint (Dkt. # 3) no later than 1/22/2024. The unopposed motion (Dkt. # 26) is granted also as to their request for extension of time regarding plaintiffs motion for temporary restraining order (Dkt. # 4). Defendants shall file response to plaintiffs motion for temporary restraining order (Dkt. # 4) no later than 1/22/2024; reply thereto due 2/5/2024. Counsel is advised that future motions shall be filed separately, and not as consolidated motions, regarding relief requested for each motion and/or deadline., setting/resetting deadline(s)/hearing(s): ( Miscellaneous Deadline set for 1/22/2024, Responses due by 1/22/2024, Replies due by 2/5/2024) (Re: #4 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order , #3 Complaint, 28 Minute Order,,,,,, Setting/Resetting Deadline(s)/Hearing(s),,,,,,,,,,,, Ruling on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer,,,,, #26 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer ) (This entry is the Official Order of the Court. No document is attached.) (RGG, Chambers)
January 5, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 28 MINUTE ORDER by Judge Claire V Eagan - The unopposed motion (Dkt. # 26) is granted. Defendants Diane Reagle, Insight Psychiatric Hospital & Clinic, LLC, and Reagle Consulting, LLC, shall file their answer or other responsive pleading to plaintiff's complaint (Dkt. # 3) no later than 1/18/2024. The unopposed motion (Dkt. # 26) is granted also as to their request for extension of time regarding plaintiff's motion for temporary restraining order (Dkt. # 4). Defendants shall file response to plaintiff's motion for temporary restraining order (Dkt. # 4) no later than 1/18/2024; reply thereto due 2/1/2024. Counsel is advised that future motions shall be filed separately, and not as consolidated motions, regarding relief requested for each motion and/or deadline. ; setting/resetting deadline(s)/hearing(s): ( Miscellaneous Deadline set for 1/18/2024, Responses due by 1/18/2024, Replies due by 2/1/2024); granting #26 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer (Re: #4 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order , #3 Complaint, #26 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer ) (This entry is the Official Order of the Court. No document is attached.) (RGG, Chambers)
January 5, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 27 MINUTE ORDER by Judge Claire V Eagan - The unopposed motion (Dkt. # 25) is granted. Defendants Rob Thompson, Mingo 83, LLC, and Thompson Construction, Inc. shall file their answer or other responsive pleading to plaintiff's complaint (Dkt. # 3) no later than 1/18/2024. The unopposed motion (Dkt. # 25) is granted also as to their request for extension of time regarding plaintiff's motion for temporary restraining order (Dkt. # 4). Defendants shall file response to plaintiff's motion for temporary restraining order (Dkt. # 4) no later than 1/18/2024; reply thereto due 2/1/2024. Counsel is advised that future motions shall be filed separately, and not as consolidated motions, regarding relief requested for each motion and/or deadline. ; setting/resetting deadline(s)/hearing(s): ( Miscellaneous Deadline set for 1/18/2024, Responses due by 1/18/2024, Replies due by 2/1/2024); granting #25 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer (Re: #4 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order , #3 Complaint, #25 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer ) (This entry is the Official Order of the Court. No document is attached.) (RGG, Chambers)
January 5, 2024 Filing 26 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer (Re: #3 Complaint, ) by Insight Psychiatric Hospital & Clinic, LLC, Diane Reagle, Reagle Consulting, LLC (Rogers, Timothy)
January 5, 2024 Filing 25 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer (Re: #3 Complaint, ) by Mingo 83, LLC, Rob Thompson, Thompson Construction, Inc (Rogers, Timothy)
January 5, 2024 Filing 24 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Timothy Lee Rogers on behalf of Insight Psychiatric Hospital & Clinic, LLC, Mingo 83, LLC, Diane Reagle, Reagle Consulting, LLC, Rob Thompson, Thompson Construction, Inc [Note: Attorney Timothy Lee Rogers added to party Insight Psychiatric Hospital & Clinic, LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Timothy Lee Rogers added to party Mingo 83, LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Timothy Lee Rogers added to party Diane Reagle(pty:dft), Attorney Timothy Lee Rogers added to party Reagle Consulting, LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Timothy Lee Rogers added to party Rob Thompson(pty:dft), Attorney Timothy Lee Rogers added to party Thompson Construction, Inc(pty:dft).] (Rogers, Timothy)
January 5, 2024 Filing 23 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Emily Brooks Kosmider on behalf of Insight Psychiatric Hospital & Clinic, LLC, Mingo 83, LLC, Diane Reagle, Reagle Consulting, LLC, Rob Thompson, Thompson Construction, Inc [Note: Attorney Emily Brooks Kosmider added to party Insight Psychiatric Hospital & Clinic, LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Emily Brooks Kosmider added to party Mingo 83, LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Emily Brooks Kosmider added to party Diane Reagle(pty:dft), Attorney Emily Brooks Kosmider added to party Reagle Consulting, LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Emily Brooks Kosmider added to party Rob Thompson(pty:dft), Attorney Emily Brooks Kosmider added to party Thompson Construction, Inc(pty:dft).] (Kosmider, Emily)
January 5, 2024 Filing 22 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by John Edward Harper, Jr on behalf of Insight Psychiatric Hospital & Clinic, LLC, Mingo 83, LLC, Diane Reagle, Reagle Consulting, LLC, Rob Thompson, Thompson Construction, Inc [Note: Attorney John Edward Harper, Jr added to party Insight Psychiatric Hospital & Clinic, LLC(pty:dft), Attorney John Edward Harper, Jr added to party Mingo 83, LLC(pty:dft), Attorney John Edward Harper, Jr added to party Diane Reagle(pty:dft), Attorney John Edward Harper, Jr added to party Reagle Consulting, LLC(pty:dft), Attorney John Edward Harper, Jr added to party Rob Thompson(pty:dft), Attorney John Edward Harper, Jr added to party Thompson Construction, Inc(pty:dft).] (Harper, John)
December 28, 2023 Filing 21 MINUTE ORDER by Court Clerk , directing Preston Hicks and OKTUL BROP, LLC to file a Disclosure Statement pursuant to FRCvP 7.1 and LCvR 7.1-1, if applicable. The parties shall use the form entitled Disclosure Statement available on the Courts website. (This entry is the Official Order of the Court. No document is attached.) (lmt, Dpty Clk)
December 27, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 20 MINUTE ORDER by Judge Claire V Eagan - The motion #19 is granted. Defendants Preston Hicks and OKTUL BROP, LLC (only) are granted an extension and may file their answer or other responsive pleading no later than 1/9/2024 as requested. ; setting/resetting deadline(s)/hearing(s): ( Miscellaneous Deadline set for 1/9/2024); granting #19 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer (Re: #3 Complaint, #19 MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer ) (This entry is the Official Order of the Court. No document is attached.) (RGG, Chambers)
December 26, 2023 Filing 19 MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer (Re: #3 Complaint, ) by Preston Hicks, OKTUL BROP, LLC (Ross, David)
December 26, 2023 Filing 18 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by David Robert Ross on behalf of Preston Hicks, OKTUL BROP, LLC [Note: Attorney David Robert Ross added to party Preston Hicks(pty:dft), Attorney David Robert Ross added to party OKTUL BROP, LLC(pty:dft).] (Ross, David)
December 22, 2023 Filing 17 SUMMONS Returned Executed re: Thompson Construction, Inc (Re: #3 Complaint, ) by MRT Holdings, LLC, McClain Group, LLC, The, FLDES VB PH1, LLC (Fox, Carter)
December 22, 2023 Filing 16 SUMMONS Returned Executed re: Rob Thompson (Re: #3 Complaint, ) by MRT Holdings, LLC, McClain Group, LLC, The, FLDES VB PH1, LLC (Fox, Carter)
December 22, 2023 Filing 15 SUMMONS Returned Executed re: Reagle Consulting, LLC (Re: #3 Complaint, ) by MRT Holdings, LLC, McClain Group, LLC, The, FLDES VB PH1, LLC (Fox, Carter)
December 22, 2023 Filing 14 SUMMONS Returned Executed re: Preston Hicks (Re: #3 Complaint, ) by MRT Holdings, LLC, McClain Group, LLC, The, FLDES VB PH1, LLC (Fox, Carter)
December 22, 2023 Filing 13 SUMMONS Returned Executed re: OKTUL BROP, LLC (Re: #3 Complaint, ) by MRT Holdings, LLC, McClain Group, LLC, The, FLDES VB PH1, LLC (Fox, Carter)
December 22, 2023 Filing 12 SUMMONS Returned Executed re: Mingo 83, LLC (Re: #3 Complaint, ) by MRT Holdings, LLC, McClain Group, LLC, The, FLDES VB PH1, LLC (Fox, Carter)
December 22, 2023 Filing 11 SUMMONS Returned Executed re: Insight Psychiatric Hospital & Clinic, LLC (Re: #3 Complaint, ) by MRT Holdings, LLC, McClain Group, LLC, The, FLDES VB PH1, LLC (Fox, Carter)
December 22, 2023 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed re: Diane Reagle (Re: #3 Complaint, ) by MRT Holdings, LLC, McClain Group, LLC, The, FLDES VB PH1, LLC (Fox, Carter)
December 8, 2023 Filing 9 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by FLDES VB PH1, LLC, MRT Holdings, LLC, McClain Group, LLC, The (Fox, Carter)
December 7, 2023 Filing 8 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Kelly Christian Comarda on behalf of All Plaintiffs [Note: Attorney Kelly Christian Comarda added to party FLDES VB PH1, LLC(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly Christian Comarda added to party MRT Holdings, LLC(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly Christian Comarda added to party McClain Group, LLC, The(pty:pla).] (Comarda, Kelly)
November 22, 2023 Filing 7 SUMMONS Issued by Court Clerk as to Preston Hicks, Insight Psychiatric Hospital & Clinic, LLC, Mingo 83, LLC, OKTUL BROP, LLC, Diane Reagle, Reagle Consulting, LLC, Rob Thompson, Thompson Construction, Inc (dla, Dpty Clk)
November 22, 2023 Filing 6 MINUTE ORDER by Court Clerk , directing McClain Group, LLC, The, MRT Holdings, LLC and FLDES VB PH1, LLC to file a Disclosure Statement pursuant to FRCvP 7.1 and LCvR 7.1-1, if applicable. The parties shall use the form entitled Disclosure Statement available on the Courts website. (This entry is the Official Order of the Court. No document is attached.) (dla, Dpty Clk)
November 22, 2023 Filing 5 MINUTE ORDER by Court Clerk , assigning this case to a district judge. Assigning case to District Judge Claire V Eagan and Magistrate Judge Jodi F Jayne, changing case number to 23-cv-00507-CVE-JFJ (This entry is the Official Order of the Court. No document is attached.) (lmt, Dpty Clk)
November 22, 2023 Filing 4 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order by FLDES VB PH1, LLC, MRT Holdings, LLC, McClain Group, LLC, The (Fox, Carter)
November 22, 2023 Filing 3 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against John Doe, Preston Hicks, Insight Psychiatric Hospital & Clinic, LLC, Mingo 83, LLC, OKTUL BROP, LLC, Diane Reagle, Reagle Consulting, LLC, Rob Thompson, Thompson Construction, Inc (paid $402 filing fee; receipt number AOKNDC-2910824) by MRT Holdings, LLC, McClain Group, LLC, The, FLDES VB PH1, LLC (Fox, Carter)
November 22, 2023 Filing 2 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Carter Allen Fox on behalf of FLDES VB PH1, LLC, MRT Holdings, LLC, McClain Group, LLC, The (Fox, Carter)
November 22, 2023 Filing 1 CIVIL COVER SHEET by FLDES VB PH1, LLC, MRT Holdings, LLC, McClain Group, LLC, The (Fox, Carter)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oklahoma Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: McClain Group, LLC, The et al v. Hicks, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: McClain Group, LLC, The
Represented By: Carter Allen Fox
Represented By: Kelly Christian Comarda
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MRT Holdings, LLC
Represented By: Carter Allen Fox
Represented By: Kelly Christian Comarda
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: FLDES VB PH1, LLC
Represented By: Carter Allen Fox
Represented By: Kelly Christian Comarda
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Preston Hicks
Represented By: David Robert Ross
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Diane Reagle
Represented By: Emily Brooks Kosmider
Represented By: John Edward Harper, Jr
Represented By: Timothy Lee Rogers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rob Thompson
Represented By: Emily Brooks Kosmider
Represented By: John Edward Harper, Jr
Represented By: Timothy Lee Rogers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: OKTUL BROP, LLC
Represented By: David Robert Ross
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Insight Psychiatric Hospital & Clinic, LLC
Represented By: Timothy Lee Rogers
Represented By: Emily Brooks Kosmider
Represented By: John Edward Harper, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Reagle Consulting, LLC
Represented By: Emily Brooks Kosmider
Represented By: John Edward Harper, Jr
Represented By: Timothy Lee Rogers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mingo 83, LLC
Represented By: Emily Brooks Kosmider
Represented By: Timothy Lee Rogers
Represented By: John Edward Harper, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thompson Construction, Inc
Represented By: Emily Brooks Kosmider
Represented By: John Edward Harper, Jr
Represented By: Timothy Lee Rogers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?