Drake v. City of Grove, Oklahoma et al
Plaintiff: Jerry Drake
Defendant: City of Grove, Oklahoma, Daniel Amendolara and Terry Graham
Case Number: 4:2023cv00521
Filed: November 30, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Oklahoma
Presiding Judge: John F Heil
Referring Judge: Mark T Steele
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 17, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 17, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 19 SCHEDULING ORDER by Chief Judge John F Heil, III (initial), setting/resetting scheduling order date(s): ( Dispositive Motions due by 7/29/2024, Discovery due by 8/13/2024, Proposed Pretrial Order due by 12/13/2024, Pretrial Conference set for 12/20/2024 at 01:30 PM before Chief Judge John F Heil III) (pll, Dpty Clk)
January 16, 2024 Filing 18 JOINT STATUS REPORT by Jerry Drake (Smolen, Daniel)
January 2, 2024 Filing 17 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by City of Grove, Oklahoma (Berkhouse, Jordan)
December 28, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER by Chief Judge John F Heil, III , directing parties to file joint status report ( Status Report due by 1/16/2024) (JFH1, Chambers)
December 27, 2023 Filing 15 MINUTE ORDER by Court Clerk , directing Daniel Amendolara and Terry Graham to file a Disclosure Statement pursuant to FRCvP 7.1 and LCvR 7.1-1, if applicable. The parties shall use the form entitled Disclosure Statement available on the Courts website. (This entry is the Official Order of the Court. No document is attached.) (lmt, Dpty Clk)
December 23, 2023 Filing 14 ANSWER with Jury Demand (Re: #2 Complaint ) by Daniel Amendolara [Note: Attorney Scott Boudinot Wood added to party Daniel Amendolara(pty:dft).] (Wood, Scott)
December 22, 2023 Filing 13 MINUTE ORDER by Court Clerk , directing City of Grove, Oklahoma to file a Disclosure Statement pursuant to FRCvP 7.1 and LCvR 7.1-1, if applicable. The parties shall use the form entitled Disclosure Statement available on the Courts website. (This entry is the Official Order of the Court. No document is attached.) (sna, Dpty Clk)
December 22, 2023 Filing 12 ANSWER with Jury Demand (Re: #2 Complaint ) by Terry Graham [Note: Attorney Scott Boudinot Wood added to party Terry Graham(pty:dft).] (Wood, Scott)
December 21, 2023 Filing 11 MINUTE ORDER by Court Clerk , assigning this case to a district judge. Assigning case to District Judge John F Heil, III and Magistrate Judge Mark T Steele, changing case number to 23-cv-00521-JFH-MTS (This entry is the Official Order of the Court. No document is attached.) (dla, Dpty Clk)
December 20, 2023 Filing 10 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Jordan L. Berkhouse on behalf of City of Grove, Oklahoma (Berkhouse, Jordan)
December 20, 2023 Filing 9 ANSWER with Jury Demand (Re: #2 Complaint ) by City of Grove, Oklahoma (Berkhouse, Jordan)
December 20, 2023 Filing 8 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Jordan L. Berkhouse on behalf of City of Grove, Oklahoma [Note: Attorney Jordan L. Berkhouse added to party City of Grove, Oklahoma(pty:dft).] (Berkhouse, Jordan) Modified on 12/20/2023 - ENTERED IN ERROR - wrong PDF attached - attorney directed to refile document (dla, Dpty Clk).
December 20, 2023 Filing 7 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Thomas Adrian LeBlanc on behalf of City of Grove, Oklahoma [Note: Attorney Thomas Adrian LeBlanc added to party City of Grove, Oklahoma(pty:dft).] (LeBlanc, Thomas)
December 12, 2023 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed re: City of Grove, Oklahoma (Re: #2 Complaint ) by Jerry Drake (Smolen, Daniel)
November 30, 2023 Filing 5 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT OF CASE TO A UNITED STATES MAGISTRATE JUDGE AND DECLINATION OF CONSENT FORM. ACTION REQUIRED: This case has been randomly assigned to a United States magistrate judge for all purposes, including trial, final entry of judgment, and direct review by the Tenth Circuit Court of Appeals. Each party will be deemed to have knowingly and voluntarily consented to proceed before the assigned Magistrate Judge, if the attached form is not signed and returned within the applicable deadline. The plaintiff or removing party must serve a copy of this notice upon all other parties to this action. (lmt, Dpty Clk)
November 30, 2023 Filing 4 MINUTE ORDER by Court Clerk , directing Jerry Drake to file a Disclosure Statement pursuant to FRCvP 7.1 and LCvR 7.1-1, if applicable. The parties shall use the form entitled Disclosure Statement available on the Courts website. (This entry is the Official Order of the Court. No document is attached.) (lmt, Dpty Clk)
November 30, 2023 Filing 3 SUMMONS Issued by Court Clerk as to Daniel Amendolara, City of Grove, Oklahoma, Terry Graham (dla, Dpty Clk)
November 30, 2023 Filing 2 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against All Defendants (paid $402 filing fee; receipt number AOKNDC-2914203) by Jerry Drake (Smolen, Daniel)
November 30, 2023 Filing 1 CIVIL COVER SHEET by Jerry Drake (Smolen, Daniel)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oklahoma Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Drake v. City of Grove, Oklahoma et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jerry Drake
Represented By: Daniel E Smolen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Grove, Oklahoma
Represented By: Jordan L. Berkhouse
Represented By: Thomas Adrian LeBlanc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Daniel Amendolara
Represented By: Scott Boudinot Wood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Terry Graham
Represented By: Scott Boudinot Wood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?