Thorngren v. Weatherford U.S., L.P.
Plaintiff: Chris Thorngen and Chris Thorngren
Defendant: Weatherford International, LLC and Weatherford U.S., L.P.
Case Number: 4:2023cv00530
Filed: December 6, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Oklahoma
Presiding Judge: Mark T Steele
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Personal Injury
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 1, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 1, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 17 SCHEDULING ORDER by Magistrate Judge Mark T Steele , setting/resetting scheduling order date(s): ( Discovery due by 9/2/2024, Dispositive Motions due by 9/16/2024, Proposed Pretrial Order due by 1/30/2025, Pretrial Conference set for 2/6/2025 at 09:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Mark T Steele, Jury Trial set for 3/3/2025 at 09:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Mark T Steele) (ll, Dpty Clk)
January 29, 2024 Filing 16 MINUTE ORDER by Court Clerk , directing the party name for Weatherford International, LLC be corrected as indicated in the Notice of Party Name Correction. If any other party to this case objects to this Party Name Correction, they shall file a Motion to Reconsider Party Name Correction within seven (7) days of this order. (Re: #15 Notice of Party Name Correction ) (This entry is the Official Order of the Court. No document is attached.) (dla, Dpty Clk)
January 29, 2024 Filing 15 NOTICE of Party Name Correction by Weatherford International, LLC (Davis, Jeffrey)
January 24, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 14 MINUTE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Mark T Steele : Based upon previous pleadings, the Court was advised that the correct name of the defendant is Weatherford U.S., L.P. Accordingly, the parties are directed to file a Notice of Party Name Correction on or before Monday, January 29, 2024., setting/resetting deadline(s)/hearing(s): ( Miscellaneous Deadline set for 1/29/2024) (This entry is the Official Order of the Court. No document is attached.) (MTS1, Chambers)
January 18, 2024 Filing 13 ANSWER (Re: #12 Amended Complaint ) by Weatherford International, LLC (Davis, Jeffrey)
January 12, 2024 Filing 12 AMENDED COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against Chris Thorngren (Re: State Court Petition/Complaint ) by Chris Thorngren (Wicker, Brad)
January 4, 2024 Filing 11 JOINT STATUS REPORT by Weatherford International, LLC (Davis, Jeffrey)
December 27, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 10 MINUTE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Mark T Steele ; granting #9 Motion to Waive (Re: #9 MOTION to Waive For NON-RESIDENT COUNSEL ) (This entry is the Official Order of the Court. No document is attached.) (MTS1, Chambers)
December 27, 2023 Filing 9 MOTION to Waive For NON-RESIDENT COUNSEL by Weatherford International, LLC (Davis, Jeffrey)
December 14, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Mark T Steele , directing parties to file joint status report ( Status Report due by 1/4/2024) (ll, Dpty Clk)
December 14, 2023 Filing 7 LETTER re: Local Counsel Requirement sent to Jeffrey Stewart Davis (sna, Dpty Clk)
December 12, 2023 Filing 6 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Chris Thorngren (Wicker, Brad)
December 12, 2023 Filing 5 First DISCLOSURE STATEMENT (identifying: Other Affiliate Weatherford Worldwide Holdings GmbH, Other Affiliate Weatherford International, PLC, Other Affiliate Weatherford Irish Holdings Ltd for Weatherford International, LLC) by Weatherford International, LLC (Davis, Jeffrey)
December 7, 2023 Filing 4 MINUTE ORDER by Court Clerk , directing Chris Thorngren and Weatherford International, LLC to file a Disclosure Statement pursuant to FRCvP 7.1 and LCvR 7.1-1, if applicable. The parties shall use the form entitled Disclosure Statement available on the Courts website. (This entry is the Official Order of the Court. No document is attached.) (sna, Dpty Clk)
December 7, 2023 Filing 3 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT OF CASE TO A UNITED STATES MAGISTRATE JUDGE AND DECLINATION OF CONSENT FORM. ACTION REQUIRED: This case has been randomly assigned to a United States magistrate judge for all purposes, including trial, final entry of judgment, and direct review by the Tenth Circuit Court of Appeals. Each party will be deemed to have knowingly and voluntarily consented to proceed before the assigned Magistrate Judge, if the attached form is not signed and returned within the applicable deadline. The plaintiff or removing party must serve a copy of this notice upon all other parties to this action. (sna, Dpty Clk)
December 7, 2023 Filing 2 NOTICE of Removal from District Court of Osage County, OK, case number CJ-23-86 (paid $405 filing fee; receipt number AOKNDC-2917965) by Weatherford International, LLC (Davis, Jeffrey)
December 7, 2023 Filing 1 CIVIL COVER SHEET by Weatherford International, LLC (Davis, Jeffrey)
May 18, 2023 PETITION/COMPLAINT filed in State Court against Weatherford International, LLC by Chris Thorngen (sna, Dpty Clk)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oklahoma Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Thorngren v. Weatherford U.S., L.P.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Chris Thorngen
Represented By: Brad Wayne Wicker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Chris Thorngren
Represented By: Brad Wayne Wicker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Weatherford International, LLC
Represented By: Jeffrey Stewart Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Weatherford U.S., L.P.
Represented By: Jeffrey Stewart Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?