Wilson v. Wal-Mart Stores East, LP et al
Plaintiff: Eve Wilson
Defendant: Wal-Mart Stores East, LP, Wal-Mart Stores East, Inc., Walmart Inc., WalMart Claims Services, Inc., Wal-Mart Associates, Inc., Wal-Mart of Oklahoma, Inc. and Oklahoma Wal-Mart Associates, L.P.
Case Number: 4:2023cv00531
Filed: December 6, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Oklahoma
Presiding Judge: Gregory K Frizzell
Referring Judge: Susan E Huntsman
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Personal Injury
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 19, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 19, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER by Judge Gregory K Frizzell , directing parties to file joint status report ( Status Report due by 2/16/2024) (kjp, Dpty Clk)
January 12, 2024 Filing 20 STIPULATION of Dismissal, dismissing Wal-Mart of Oklahoma, Inc., dismissing Petition/Complaint - all claims, (Re: #2 Notice of Removal ) by Wal-Mart Stores East, LP (Huber, Hailey)
January 9, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER by Judge Gregory K Frizzell ; terminating attorney Cyrus Nathaniel Lawyer ; granting #17 Motion to Substitute Attorney (Re: #17 MOTION to Substitute Attorney ) (kjp, Dpty Clk)
January 8, 2024 Filing 18 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Hailey Huber on behalf of Wal-Mart Stores East, LP [Note: Attorney Hailey Huber added to party Wal-Mart Stores East, LP(pty:dft).] (Huber, Hailey)
January 8, 2024 Filing 17 MOTION to Substitute Attorney by Wal-Mart Stores East, LP (Clarke, Margaret)
December 29, 2023 Filing 16 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Eve Wilson (Schwartz, Andrew)
December 15, 2023 Filing 15 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Andrew David Schwartz on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Schwartz, Andrew)
December 14, 2023 Filing 14 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Wal-Mart of Oklahoma, Inc. (Lawyer, Cyrus)
December 14, 2023 Filing 13 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT (identifying: Corporate Parent Walmart Inc. for Wal-Mart Stores East, LP) by Wal-Mart Stores East, LP (Lawyer, Cyrus)
December 14, 2023 Filing 12 CERTIFICATE of State Court Clerk by Wal-Mart Stores East, LP (Lawyer, Cyrus)
December 14, 2023 Filing 11 ANSWER with Jury Demand (Re: State Court Petition/Complaint ) by Wal-Mart Stores East, LP (Lawyer, Cyrus)
December 11, 2023 Filing 10 MINUTE ORDER by Court Clerk , directing Eve Wilson, Wal-Mart Stores East, LP and Wal-Mart of Oklahoma, Inc. to file a Disclosure Statement pursuant to FRCvP 7.1 and LCvR 7.1-1, if applicable. The parties shall use the form entitled Disclosure Statement available on the Courts website. (This entry is the Official Order of the Court. No document is attached.) (dla, Dpty Clk)
December 7, 2023 Filing 9 MINUTE ORDER by Court Clerk , assigning this case to a district judge. Assigning case to District Judge Gregory K Frizzell and Magistrate Judge Susan E Huntsman, changing case number to 23-cv-00531-GKF-SH (This entry is the Official Order of the Court. No document is attached.) (dla, Dpty Clk)
December 7, 2023 Filing 8 MINUTE ORDER by Court Clerk , directing the party name for Wal-Mart Stores East, Inc., Wal-Mart Associates, Inc. and WalMart Claims Services, Inc., Walmart Inc. and Oklahoma Wal-Mart Associates, L.P. be corrected as indicated in the Notice of Party Name Correction. If any other party to this case objects to this Party Name Correction, they shall file a Motion to Reconsider Party Name Correction within seven (7) days of this order. (Re: #4 Notice of Party Name Correction ) (This entry is the Official Order of the Court. No document is attached.) (dla, Dpty Clk)
December 7, 2023 Filing 7 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT OF CASE TO A UNITED STATES MAGISTRATE JUDGE AND DECLINATION OF CONSENT FORM. ACTION REQUIRED: This case has been randomly assigned to a United States magistrate judge for all purposes, including trial, final entry of judgment, and direct review by the Tenth Circuit Court of Appeals. Each party will be deemed to have knowingly and voluntarily consented to proceed before the assigned Magistrate Judge, if the attached form is not signed and returned within the applicable deadline. The plaintiff or removing party must serve a copy of this notice upon all other parties to this action. (sna, Dpty Clk)
December 7, 2023 Filing 6 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Margaret M. Clarke on behalf of Wal-Mart Stores East, LP [Note: Attorney Margaret M. Clarke added to party Wal-Mart Stores East, LP(pty:dft).] (Clarke, Margaret)
December 7, 2023 Filing 5 JURY DEMAND by Wal-Mart Stores East, LP (Lawyer, Cyrus)
December 7, 2023 Filing 4 NOTICE of Party Name Correction by Oklahoma Wal-Mart Associates, L.P., Wal-Mart Associates, Inc., Wal-Mart Stores East, Inc., Wal-Mart of Oklahoma, Inc., WalMart Claims Services, Inc., Walmart Inc. (Lawyer, Cyrus)
December 7, 2023 Filing 3 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Cyrus Nathaniel Lawyer on behalf of Wal-Mart Stores East, LP (Lawyer, Cyrus)
December 7, 2023 Filing 2 NOTICE of Removal with Jury Demand from Tulsa County, case number cj-2023-03763 (paid $405 filing fee; receipt number AOKNDC-2917921) by Wal-Mart Stores East, LP (With attachments) (Lawyer, Cyrus)
December 7, 2023 Filing 1 CIVIL COVER SHEET by Wal-Mart Stores East, LP (Lawyer, Cyrus)
October 27, 2023 PETITION/COMPLAINT filed in State Court against All Defendants by Eve Wilson (sna, Dpty Clk)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oklahoma Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wilson v. Wal-Mart Stores East, LP et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eve Wilson
Represented By: Andrew David Schwartz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wal-Mart Stores East, LP
Represented By: Cyrus Nathaniel Lawyer
Represented By: Margaret M. Clarke
Represented By: Hailey Huber
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wal-Mart Stores East, Inc.
Represented By: Cyrus Nathaniel Lawyer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Walmart Inc.
Represented By: Cyrus Nathaniel Lawyer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WalMart Claims Services, Inc.
Represented By: Cyrus Nathaniel Lawyer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wal-Mart Associates, Inc.
Represented By: Cyrus Nathaniel Lawyer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wal-Mart of Oklahoma, Inc.
Represented By: Cyrus Nathaniel Lawyer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Oklahoma Wal-Mart Associates, L.P.
Represented By: Cyrus Nathaniel Lawyer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?