Privilege Underwriters Reciprocal Exchange v. Uponor North America, Inc.
Plaintiff: Privilege Underwriters Reciprocal Exchange
Defendant: Uponor North America, Inc. and Uponor, Inc.
Case Number: 4:2023cv00546
Filed: December 18, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Oklahoma
Presiding Judge: Gregory K Frizzell
Referring Judge: Mark T Steele
Nature of Suit: Prop. Damage Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Property Damage
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 6, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 6, 2024 ***Civil Case Terminated (see document number #20 ) (sna, Dpty Clk)
February 5, 2024 Filing 21 MINUTE ORDER by Court Clerk re: Remand (sna, Dpty Clk)
February 5, 2024 Filing 20 JUDGMENT by Judge Gregory K Frizzell of Remand (Re: #19 Order, Remanding Case, Ruling on Motion to Remand ) (kjp, Dpty Clk)
February 5, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER by Judge Gregory K Frizzell ; remanding case (terminates case) ; granting #15 Motion to Remand (Re: #15 MOTION to Remand ) (kjp, Dpty Clk)
February 5, 2024 Filing 18 RESPONSE in Opposition to Motion (Re: #15 MOTION to Remand ) by Uponor, Inc. ; (McAlester, J)
January 19, 2024 Filing 17 MINUTE ORDER by Court Clerk , directing Uponor, Inc. to file a Disclosure Statement pursuant to FRCvP 7.1 and LCvR 7.1-1, if applicable. The parties shall use the form entitled Disclosure Statement available on the Courts website. (This entry is the Official Order of the Court. No document is attached.) (drw, Dpty Clk)
January 17, 2024 Filing 16 ANSWER (Re: #9 Amended Complaint ) by Uponor, Inc. [Note: Attorney J Mark McAlester added to party Uponor, Inc.(pty:dft).] (McAlester, J)
January 15, 2024 Filing 15 MOTION to Remand by Privilege Underwriters Reciprocal Exchange (With attachments) (Klein, Bruce)
January 8, 2024 Filing 14 MINUTE ORDER by Court Clerk , assigning this case to a district judge. Assigning case to District Judge Gregory K Frizzell and Magistrate Judge Mark T Steele, changing case number to 23-cv-00546-GKF-MTS (This entry is the Official Order of the Court. No document is attached.) (dla, Dpty Clk)
December 27, 2023 Filing 13 NOTICE of Dismissal, dismissing Uponor North America, Inc., dismissing All claims, (Re: #9 Amended Complaint, State Court Petition/Complaint ) by Privilege Underwriters Reciprocal Exchange (Klein, Bruce)
December 27, 2023 Filing 12 SUMMONS Issued by Court Clerk as to Uponor, Inc. (sna, Dpty Clk) Modified on 12/28/2023 to correct as to party (lmt, Dpty Clk).
December 27, 2023 Filing 11 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT (identifying: Corporate Parent Pure Insurance, Corporate Parent PURE Risk Management LLC, Corporate Parent Privilege Underwriters Inc, Corporate Parent Tokio Marine Group of Companies for Privilege Underwriters Reciprocal Exchange) by Privilege Underwriters Reciprocal Exchange (Klein, Bruce)
December 27, 2023 Filing 10 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Bruce F Klein on behalf of Privilege Underwriters Reciprocal Exchange (Klein, Bruce)
December 27, 2023 Filing 9 AMENDED COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against Uponor North America, Inc. (Re: State Court Petition/Complaint ) by Privilege Underwriters Reciprocal Exchange (Klein, Bruce)
December 21, 2023 Filing 8 FILING FEES Paid in Full by Uponor North America, Inc. (sna, Dpty Clk)
December 19, 2023 Filing 7 CERTIFICATE OF FILING NOTICE OF REMOVAL (Re: #6 Notice (Other), 4 Minute Order,, Directing Party(ies) to File Disclosure Statement, ) by Uponor North America, Inc. (McAlester, J)
December 19, 2023 Filing 6 NOTICE Notice of Filing Notice of Removal (Re: #3 Notice (Other) ) by Uponor North America, Inc. (McAlester, J)
December 19, 2023 Filing 5 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT OF CASE TO A UNITED STATES MAGISTRATE JUDGE AND DECLINATION OF CONSENT FORM. ACTION REQUIRED: This case has been randomly assigned to a United States magistrate judge for all purposes, including trial, final entry of judgment, and direct review by the Tenth Circuit Court of Appeals. Each party will be deemed to have knowingly and voluntarily consented to proceed before the assigned Magistrate Judge, if the attached form is not signed and returned within the applicable deadline. The plaintiff or removing party must serve a copy of this notice upon all other parties to this action. (lmt, Dpty Clk)
December 19, 2023 Filing 4 MINUTE ORDER by Court Clerk , directing Privilege Underwriters Reciprocal Exchange and Uponor North America, Inc. to file a Disclosure Statement pursuant to FRCvP 7.1 and LCvR 7.1-1, if applicable. The parties shall use the form entitled Disclosure Statement available on the Courts website. (This entry is the Official Order of the Court. No document is attached.) (lmt, Dpty Clk)
December 19, 2023 NOTICE of Docket Entry Modification; Error: dkt #3 was filed in error using the wrong event (NOTICE (Other)); Correction: edited docket text to reflect correct event (NOTICE of Removal) (Re: #3 Notice (Other) ) (lmt, Dpty Clk)
December 18, 2023 Filing 3 NOTICE of Removal from Tulsa County, case number CJ-2023-03975 by Uponor North America, Inc. (With attachments) (McAlester, J) Modified on 12/19/2023 to correct event type (lmt, Dpty Clk).
December 18, 2023 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET by Uponor North America, Inc. (McAlester, J)
December 18, 2023 Filing 1 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by J Mark McAlester on behalf of Uponor North America, Inc. (McAlester, J)
November 14, 2023 PETITION/COMPLAINT with Jury Demand filed in State Court against Uponor North America, Inc. by Privilege Underwriters Reciprocal Exchange (lmt, Dpty Clk)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oklahoma Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Privilege Underwriters Reciprocal Exchange v. Uponor North America, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Privilege Underwriters Reciprocal Exchange
Represented By: Bruce F Klein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Uponor North America, Inc.
Represented By: J Mark McAlester
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Uponor, Inc.
Represented By: J Mark McAlester
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?