Hill Company, Inc. v. AAON, Inc.
Plaintiff: Hill Company, Inc.
Defendant: AAON, Inc.
Case Number: 4:2024cv00019
Filed: January 12, 2024
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Oklahoma
Presiding Judge: Sara E Hill
Referring Judge: Susan E Huntsman
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Other Contract
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 6, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 6, 2024 Filing 33 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by AAON, Inc. (With attachments) (Callaway, Jason)
March 5, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 32 MINUTE ORDER by Judge Sara E Hill - Defendant's Motion for Leave to File Oversize Brief (Dkt. #31) is granted. Defendant's Motion to Dismiss and brief in support not to exceed thirty-seven pages (excluding the title page, table of contents, table of authorities, and certificate of service pages). ; granting #31 Motion for Leave to Exceed Page Limitation (Re: #31 MOTION for Leave to Exceed Page Limitation ) (This entry is the Official Order of the Court. No document is attached.) (lmc, Chambers)
March 5, 2024 Filing 31 MOTION for Leave to Exceed Page Limitation by AAON, Inc. (Callaway, Jason)
February 23, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 30 MINUTE ORDER by Judge Sara E Hill - In light of filing the Amended Complaint (Dkt. #29), the Motion to Dismiss (Dkt. #24) is moot. ; finding as moot #24 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim (Re: #29 Amended Complaint, #24 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim ) (This entry is the Official Order of the Court. No document is attached.) (lmc, Chambers)
February 23, 2024 Filing 29 First AMENDED COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against AAON, Inc. (Re: #2 Complaint ) by Hill Company, Inc. (With attachments) (Bogan, Tadd)
February 7, 2024 Filing 28 MINUTE ORDER by Court Clerk pursuant to General Order 24-3, reassigning case to Judge Sara E Hill, Judge Claire V Eagan no longer assigned to case, changing case number to 24-cv-19-SEH-SH (This entry is the Official Order of the Court. No document is attached.) (atn, Dpty Clk)
February 7, 2024 Filing 27 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Samuel Thomas Mallick on behalf of AAON, Inc. [Note: Attorney Samuel Thomas Mallick added to party AAON, Inc.(pty:dft).] (Mallick, Samuel)
February 7, 2024 Filing 26 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Deborah S Coldwell on behalf of AAON, Inc. [Note: Attorney Deborah S Coldwell added to party AAON, Inc.(pty:dft).] (Coldwell, Deborah)
February 6, 2024 Filing 25 NOTICE Notice of Constitutional Questions (Re: #24 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim ) by AAON, Inc. (Callaway, Jason)
February 6, 2024 Filing 24 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by AAON, Inc. (With attachments) (Callaway, Jason)
February 6, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER by Judge Claire V Eagan - Before the Court are the motions for admission pro hac vice (Dkt. # 21, 22). For good cause shown, the Court finds that the motions should be and are hereby granted. Deborah S. Coldwell and Samuel Mallick are admitted pro hac vice for the limited purpose of representing defendant AAON, Inc. in this matter. Counsel are directed to file separate entries of appearance forthwith. ; granting #21 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice; granting #22 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice (Re: #21 MOTION for Attorney(s) Deborah S. Coldwell to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $125 PHV fee; receipt number AOKNDC-2948121), #22 MOTION for Attorney(s) Samuel Mallick to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $125 PHV fee; receipt number AOKNDC-2948176) ) (RGG, Chambers)
February 6, 2024 Filing 22 MOTION for Attorney(s) Samuel Mallick to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $125 PHV fee; receipt number AOKNDC-2948176) by AAON, Inc. (With attachments) (Eschenheimer, Whitney)
February 6, 2024 Filing 21 MOTION for Attorney(s) Deborah S. Coldwell to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $125 PHV fee; receipt number AOKNDC-2948121) by AAON, Inc. (With attachments) (Eschenheimer, Whitney)
February 6, 2024 Filing 20 MINUTE ORDER by Court Clerk , directing AAON, Inc. to file a Disclosure Statement pursuant to FRCvP 7.1 and LCvR 7.1-1, if applicable. The parties shall use the form entitled Disclosure Statement available on the Courts website. (This entry is the Official Order of the Court. No document is attached.) (drw, Dpty Clk)
February 2, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 19 MINUTE ORDER by Judge Claire V Eagan - Before the Court is defendant AAON, Inc.'s unopposed motion for leave to file oversized brief (Dkt. # 17). For good cause shown, the motion (Dkt. # 17) is granted. Defendant may file a motion to dismiss and brief in support not to exceed thirty-five pages (excluding the title page, table of contents, table of authorities, and certificate of service pages). ; granting #17 Motion for Leave to Exceed Page Limitation (Re: #17 MOTION for Leave to Exceed Page Limitation ) (This entry is the Official Order of the Court. No document is attached.) (RGG, Chambers)
February 2, 2024 Filing 18 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Whitney Mackey Eschenheimer on behalf of AAON, Inc. [Note: Attorney Whitney Mackey Eschenheimer added to party AAON, Inc.(pty:dft).] (Eschenheimer, Whitney)
February 2, 2024 Filing 17 MOTION for Leave to Exceed Page Limitation by AAON, Inc. (Callaway, Jason)
February 2, 2024 Filing 16 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT (identifying: Corporate Parent AAON, Inc. a Nevada corporation for AAON, Inc.) by AAON, Inc. (Callaway, Jason)
February 2, 2024 Filing 15 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Jason Lee Callaway on behalf of AAON, Inc. [Note: Attorney Jason Lee Callaway added to party AAON, Inc.(pty:dft).] (Callaway, Jason)
January 19, 2024 Filing 14 SUMMONS Returned Executed re: AAON, Inc. c/o Luke A. Bomer, Registered Agent (Re: #2 Complaint ) by Hill Company, Inc. (Bogan, Tadd)
January 19, 2024 Filing 13 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Matthew Johnson on behalf of Hill Company, Inc. [Note: Attorney Matthew Johnson added to party Hill Company, Inc.(pty:pla).] (Johnson, Matthew)
January 19, 2024 Filing 12 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Graham E. McDonald on behalf of Hill Company, Inc. [Note: Attorney Graham E. McDonald added to party Hill Company, Inc.(pty:pla).] (McDonald, Graham)
January 16, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER by Judge Claire V Eagan - The motions for admission pro hac vice (Dkt. # 9, 10) are granted. Graham Elliott McDonald and Matthew Robert Johnson are admitted pro hac vice for the limited purpose of representing plaintiff Hill Company, Inc. in this matter. Counsel are directed to file separate entries of appearance forthwith. ; granting #9 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice; granting #10 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice (Re: #9 MOTION for Attorney(s) Graham Elliott McDonald to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $125 PHV fee; receipt number AOKNDC-2936367), #10 MOTION for Attorney(s) Matthew Robert Johnson to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $125 PHV fee; receipt number AOKNDC-2936383) ) (RGG, Chambers)
January 16, 2024 Filing 10 MOTION for Attorney(s) Matthew Robert Johnson to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $125 PHV fee; receipt number AOKNDC-2936383) by Hill Company, Inc. (With attachments) (Bogan, Tadd)
January 16, 2024 Filing 9 MOTION for Attorney(s) Graham Elliott McDonald to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $125 PHV fee; receipt number AOKNDC-2936367) by Hill Company, Inc. (With attachments) (Bogan, Tadd)
January 16, 2024 Filing 8 MINUTE ORDER by Court Clerk , assigning this case to a district judge. Assigning case to District Judge Claire V Eagan and Magistrate Judge Susan Huntsman, changing case number to 24-cv-00019-CVE-SH (This entry is the Official Order of the Court. No document is attached.) (sna, Dpty Clk) Modified on 1/16/2024 to add docket number (sna, Dpty Clk).
January 12, 2024 Filing 7 SUMMONS Issued by Court Clerk as to AAON, Inc. by Hill Company, Inc. (drw, Dpty Clk)
January 12, 2024 Filing 6 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT OF CASE TO A UNITED STATES MAGISTRATE JUDGE AND DECLINATION OF CONSENT FORM. ACTION REQUIRED: This case has been randomly assigned to a United States magistrate judge for all purposes, including trial, final entry of judgment, and direct review by the Tenth Circuit Court of Appeals. Each party will be deemed to have knowingly and voluntarily consented to proceed before the assigned Magistrate Judge, if the attached form is not signed and returned within the applicable deadline. The plaintiff or removing party must serve a copy of this notice upon all other parties to this action. (drw, Dpty Clk)
January 12, 2024 Filing 5 MINUTE ORDER by Court Clerk , directing Hill Company, Inc. to file a Disclosure Statement pursuant to FRCvP 7.1 and LCvR 7.1-1, if applicable. The parties shall use the form entitled Disclosure Statement available on the Courts website. (This entry is the Official Order of the Court. No document is attached.) (drw, Dpty Clk)
January 12, 2024 Filing 4 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Hill Company, Inc. (Bogan, Tadd)
January 12, 2024 Filing 3 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Tadd Justin Pace Bogan on behalf of Hill Company, Inc. (Bogan, Tadd)
January 12, 2024 Filing 2 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against AAON, Inc. (paid $405 filing fee; receipt number AOKNDC-2935418) by Hill Company, Inc. (With attachments) (Bogan, Tadd)
January 12, 2024 Filing 1 CIVIL COVER SHEET by Hill Company, Inc. (Bogan, Tadd)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oklahoma Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hill Company, Inc. v. AAON, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hill Company, Inc.
Represented By: Tadd Justin Pace Bogan
Represented By: Graham E. McDonald
Represented By: Matthew Johnson
Represented By: Patrick George Colvin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AAON, Inc.
Represented By: Samuel Thomas Mallick
Represented By: Whitney Mackey Eschenheimer
Represented By: Deborah S Coldwell
Represented By: Jason Lee Callaway
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?