Baker v. Dolgencorp, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Barbara Baker
Defendant: Dolgencorp, LLC, Dollar General Stores of Oklahoma, Inc. and Dollar General Corporation
Case Number: 4:2024cv00034
Filed: January 30, 2024
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Oklahoma
Presiding Judge: Gregory K Frizzell
Referring Judge: Jodi F Jayne
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Personal Injury
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 27, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 27, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 22 MINUTE ORDER by Judge Gregory K Frizzell setting a Telephone Conference on April 4, 2024 at 1:30 p.m. Conference call in number is 1-918-800-1393, Conference ID 564 490 37#, setting/resetting deadline(s)/hearing(s): ( Status Hearing set for 4/4/2024 at 01:30 PM before Judge Gregory K Frizzell) (Re: #19 Amended Notice of Removal ) (This entry is the Official Order of the Court. No document is attached.) (kjp, Dpty Clk)
March 20, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 21 Amended DISCLOSURE STATEMENT (identifying: Corporate Parent Dollar General Corporation for Dolgencorp, LLC) by Dolgencorp, LLC (Farabough, Gary)
March 20, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 20 Amended DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Dollar General Corporation (Farabough, Gary)
March 20, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 19 AMENDED NOTICE of Removal with Jury Demand by Dolgencorp, LLC, Dollar General Corporation (With attachments) (Farabough, Gary)
March 15, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER by Judge Gregory K Frizzell , directing parties to file joint status report ( Status Report due by 4/12/2024) (GKF2, Chambers)
March 14, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 17 OPINION AND ORDER by Judge Gregory K Frizzell , setting/resetting deadline(s)/hearing(s): For Amended Notice of Removal and Amended Disclosure Statement(s) - ( Miscellaneous Deadline set for 3/28/2024) (Re: #4 Disclosure Statement (Rule 7.1), #2 Notice of Removal ) (kjp, Dpty Clk)
March 11, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Esther Marie Sanders on behalf of Barbara Baker (Sanders, Esther)
March 11, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 15 RESPONSE to Order to Show Cause (Re: #13 Order, Directing Party to Show Cause ) by Barbara Baker (With attachments) (Sanders, Esther)
March 11, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 14 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Barbara Baker (Sanders, Esther)
February 26, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER by Judge Gregory K Frizzell , directing Plaintiff, Barbara Baker to show cause( Response to Order to Show Cause due by 3/11/2024) (kjp, Dpty Clk)
February 20, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 12 RESPONSE to Order to Show Cause (Re: #11 Order, Directing Party to Show Cause ) by Dolgencorp, LLC (With attachments) (Farabough, Gary)
February 7, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER by Judge Gregory K Frizzell , directing Defendant, Dolgencorp, LLC to show cause( Response to Order to Show Cause due by 2/21/2024) (kjp, Dpty Clk)
February 1, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 10 MINUTE ORDER by Court Clerk , assigning this case to a district judge. Assigning case to District Judge Gregory K Frizzell and Magistrate Judge Jodi F Jayne, changing case number to 24-cv-00034-GKF-JFJ (This entry is the Official Order of the Court. No document is attached.) (dla, Dpty Clk)
February 1, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ANSWER with Jury Demand (Re: State Court Petition/Complaint ) by Dolgencorp, LLC, Dollar General Corporation (Farabough, Gary)
January 31, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 8 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT OF CASE TO A UNITED STATES MAGISTRATE JUDGE AND DECLINATION OF CONSENT FORM. ACTION REQUIRED: This case has been randomly assigned to a United States magistrate judge for all purposes, including trial, final entry of judgment, and direct review by the Tenth Circuit Court of Appeals. Each party will be deemed to have knowingly and voluntarily consented to proceed before the assigned Magistrate Judge, if the attached form is not signed and returned within the applicable deadline. The plaintiff or removing party must serve a copy of this notice upon all other parties to this action. (atn, Dpty Clk)
January 31, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 7 MINUTE ORDER by Court Clerk , directing Barbara Baker; Dolgencorp, LLC; Dollar General Stores of Oklahoma, Inc.; and Dollar General Corporation to file a Disclosure Statement pursuant to FRCvP 7.1 and LCvR 7.1-1, if applicable. The parties shall use the form entitled Disclosure Statement available on the Courts website. (This entry is the Official Order of the Court. No document is attached.) (atn, Dpty Clk)
January 31, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 6 STATUS REPORT on Removed Action by Dolgencorp, LLC (Farabough, Gary)
January 31, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Warren Edward Mouledoux, III on behalf of All Defendants [Note: Attorney Warren Edward Mouledoux, III added to party Dolgencorp, LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Warren Edward Mouledoux, III added to party Dollar General Corporation(pty:dft), Attorney Warren Edward Mouledoux, III added to party Dollar General Stores of Oklahoma, Inc.(pty:dft).] (Mouledoux, Warren)
January 31, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 4 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT (identifying: Corporate Parent Dollar General Corporation for Dolgencorp, LLC) by Dolgencorp, LLC (Farabough, Gary)
January 31, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Gary W Farabough on behalf of All Defendants (Farabough, Gary)
January 30, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 2 NOTICE of Removal with Jury Demand from District Court of Tulsa County, case number CJ-2024-00065 (paid $405 filing fee; receipt number AOKNDC-2944677) by Dolgencorp, LLC (With attachments) (Farabough, Gary)
January 30, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 1 CIVIL COVER SHEET by Dolgencorp, LLC (Farabough, Gary)
January 8, 2024 Opinion or Order PETITION/COMPLAINT with Jury Demand filed in State Court against Dolgencorp, LLC, Dollar General Corporation, Dollar General Stores of Oklahoma, Inc. by Barbara Baker (atn, Dpty Clk)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oklahoma Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Baker v. Dolgencorp, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Barbara Baker
Represented By: Esther Marie Sanders
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dolgencorp, LLC
Represented By: Gary W Farabough
Represented By: Warren Edward Mouledoux, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dollar General Stores of Oklahoma, Inc.
Represented By: Gary W Farabough
Represented By: Warren Edward Mouledoux, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dollar General Corporation
Represented By: Gary W Farabough
Represented By: Warren Edward Mouledoux, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?