Jolliff v. Rogers County Sheriff's Department, The et al
Plaintiff: Kathy Jolliff
Defendant: Rogers County Sheriff's Department, The, John Doe and Jane Doe
Case Number: 4:2024cv00065
Filed: February 16, 2024
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Oklahoma
Presiding Judge: Susan E Huntsman
Referring Judge: John D Russell
Nature of Suit: Prisoner Petitions (Prison Condition)
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 29, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 29, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 17 MINUTE ORDER by Judge John D Russell ; setting/resetting deadline(s)/hearing(s): ( Responses due by 4/22/2024); granting #13 Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Motion (Re: #9 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim , #13 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Motion ) (This entry is the Official Order of the Court. No document is attached.) (clb, Dpty Clk)
March 29, 2024 Filing 16 MINUTE ORDER by Court Clerk, reassigning case to Judge John D Russell, Judge Claire V Eagan no longer assigned to case, changing case number to 24-cv-65-JDR-SH (This entry is the Official Order of the Court. No document is attached.) (crp, Dpty Clk)
March 28, 2024 Filing 15 MINUTE ORDER by Court Clerk, due to Court conflict, reassigning case to Judge Claire V Eagan, Chief Judge John F Heil, III no longer assigned to case, changing case number to 24-CV-065-CVE-SH (This entry is the Official Order of the Court. No document is attached.) (pll, Dpty Clk)
March 28, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 14 MINUTE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Susan E Huntsman In light of this case being reassigned to a District Judge, the Order for partial joint status report is vacated, vacating/setting aside order(s), striking/terminating deadline(s)/Hearing(s) (Re: #11 Order, Directing Parties to File Joint Status Report ) (Documents Terminated: #11 Order, Directing Parties to File Joint Status Report ) (This entry is the Official Order of the Court. No document is attached.) (kah, Chambers)
March 27, 2024 Filing 13 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Motion (Re: #9 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim ) by Kathy Jolliff (McGill, Joshua)
March 27, 2024 Filing 12 MINUTE ORDER by Court Clerk , assigning this case to a district judge. Assigning case to District Judge John F Heil and Magistrate Judge Susan E Huntsman, changing case number to 24-cv-00065-JFH-SH (This entry is the Official Order of the Court. No document is attached.) (lmt, Dpty Clk)
March 26, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Susan E Huntsman , directing parties to file joint status report ( Status Report due by 4/2/2024) (kah, Chambers) Modified on 3/28/2024 - VACATED per 14 (dla, Dpty Clk).
March 26, 2024 Filing 10 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Jake Denne on behalf of Rogers County Sheriff's Department, The [Note: Attorney Jake Denne added to party Rogers County Sheriff's Department, The(pty:dft).] (Denne, Jake)
March 25, 2024 Filing 9 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by Rogers County Sheriff's Department, The (Wood, Randall)
March 14, 2024 Filing 8 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Rogers County Sheriff's Department, The (Wood, Randall)
March 12, 2024 Filing 7 MINUTE ORDER by Court Clerk , directing The Rogers County Sheriff's Department to file a Disclosure Statement pursuant to FRCvP 7.1 and LCvR 7.1-1, if applicable. The parties shall use the form entitled Disclosure Statement available on the Courts website. (This entry is the Official Order of the Court. No document is attached.) (atn, Dpty Clk)
March 8, 2024 Filing 6 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Randall J Wood on behalf of Rogers County Sheriff's Department, The [Note: Attorney Randall J Wood added to party Rogers County Sheriff's Department, The(pty:dft).] (Wood, Randall)
March 1, 2024 Filing 5 First AMENDED COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against All Defendants (Re: #2 Complaint ) by Kathy Jolliff (McGill, Joshua)
February 20, 2024 Filing 4 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT OF CASE TO A UNITED STATES MAGISTRATE JUDGE AND DECLINATION OF CONSENT FORM. ACTION REQUIRED: This case has been randomly assigned to a United States magistrate judge for all purposes, including trial, final entry of judgment, and direct review by the Tenth Circuit Court of Appeals. Each party will be deemed to have knowingly and voluntarily consented to proceed before the assigned Magistrate Judge, if the attached form is not signed and returned within the applicable deadline. The plaintiff or removing party must serve a copy of this notice upon all other parties to this action. (drw, Dpty Clk)
February 20, 2024 Filing 3 MINUTE ORDER by Court Clerk , directing Kathy Jolliff to file a Disclosure Statement pursuant to FRCvP 7.1 and LCvR 7.1-1, if applicable. The parties shall use the form entitled Disclosure Statement available on the Courts website. (This entry is the Official Order of the Court. No document is attached.) (drw, Dpty Clk)
February 19, 2024 Filing 2 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against All Defendants (paid $405 filing fee; receipt number AOKNDC-2956465) by Kathy Jolliff (McGill, Joshua)
February 19, 2024 Filing 1 CIVIL COVER SHEET by Kathy Jolliff (McGill, Joshua)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oklahoma Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jolliff v. Rogers County Sheriff's Department, The et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kathy Jolliff
Represented By: Joshua Kirk McGill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rogers County Sheriff's Department, The
Represented By: Jake Denne
Represented By: Randall J Wood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jane Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?