Search King Inc v. Google Inc, et al Featured Case

Plaintiff Search King, Inc. sued defendant Google Technology, Inc. for reducing the PageRank to plaintiff\'s website.

Plaintiff: Search King Inc
Defendant: Google Technology Inc
Case Number: 5:2002cv01457
Filed: October 17, 2002
Court: Oklahoma Western District Court
Office: Oklahoma City Office
County: Oklahoma
Nature of Suit: Fraud or Truth-In-Lending
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Fraud
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
January 13, 2003 13 Opinion or Order of the Court
ORDER by Honorable Vicki Miles-LaGrange DENIES SearchKing's motion for preliminary injunction [3-1] denying memorandum [4-1] (more fully set out) (cc: all counsel) [EOD Date 1/13/03] (fp)
January 31, 2003 18 Opinion or Order of the Court
ORDER by Honorable Vicki Miles-LaGrange GRANTS motion for leave to file reply to search King's opposition to Google's mtn to dism [17-1] (cc: all counsel) [EOD Date 1/31/03] (fp) Modified on 01/31/2003
February 11, 2003 22 Opinion or Order of the Court
ORDER by Honorable Vicki Miles-LaGrange GRANTS plf's motion for leave to file reply to dft's response to plf's mtn to amend/alter judgment [21-1] within (48) hours of this Order (cc: all counsel) [EOD Date 2/11/03] (fp)
May 27, 2003 24 Opinion or Order of the Court
ORDER by Honorable Vicki Miles-LaGrange DENIES the motion to alter and/or amend jgm [14-1] as moot., granting motion to dismiss [12-1] DENIES the memorandum [16-1] as moot., dismissing case (cc: all counsel) [EOD Date 5/27/03] (fp)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oklahoma Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Search King Inc v. Google Inc, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Search King Inc
Represented By: Brett D Sanger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Google Technology Inc
Represented By: Joseph J Ferretti
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.