Jordanoff et al v. Lester et al
Plaintiff: |
James Jordanoff, Rayford Bonner, II, Sean A McClendon and Marcelino Martinez |
Defendant: |
Joseph K Lester, Captain Miller, Cindy S Rosenthall, Ron Cleveland, Shari Kinney and John Doe |
Case Number: |
5:2009cv00791 |
Filed: |
July 27, 2009 |
Court: |
US District Court for the Western District of Oklahoma |
Office: |
Oklahoma City Office |
County: |
Cleveland |
Presiding Judge: |
Gary M. Purcell |
Presiding Judge: |
David L. Russell |
Nature of Suit: |
None |
Cause of Action: |
42 U.S.C. § 1983 Prisoner Civil Rights |
Jury Demanded By: |
None |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
June 18, 2010 |
Filing
56
ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION. Signed by Honorable David L. Russell on 6/18/10. (ns, )
|
November 16, 2009 |
Filing
38
ORDER adopting Report and Recommendations re 31 Report and Recommendation; striking document 20 as a frauduent filing; granting 26 Jordanoff's Motion seeking reinstatement as a plaintiff; Plaintiffs Bonner, McClendon and Martinez are DISMI SSED from this action without prejudice to their filing individual actions; denying 12 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis; denying 14 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis; denying 15 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma paup eris; denying 30 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis; denying 5 Motion for Order for Injunction jointly filed by Plaintiffs Martinez, Jordanoff and Bonner without prejudice to itsrenewal by Plaintiff Jordanoff, proceeding individually, in this action, and to its renewal in other actions filed separately by Plaintiffs Martinez and Bonner; denying 28 Motion to Amend/Correct; denying 29 Motion to Amend/Correct;denying 32 Motion for Permanent Injunction; denying 33 Motion to Ap point Counsel. Plaintiff Jordanoff is ORDERED to file an Amended Complaint pursuant to 42 U.S.C. § 1983 asserting only claims specific to him and to pay the full filing fee or file a new application to proceed in forma pauperis within twenty (20) days of the date of this Order. Failure to comply with this Order may result in dismissal of this action. Signed by Honorable David L. Russell on 11/16/09. (kw, )
|
October 26, 2009 |
Filing
31
REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION: It is recommended that (1) Mtn 20 be STRICKEN; (2) Petition 26 be GRANTED; (3) Plfs Bonner, McClendon, Martinez be DISMISSED fm action w/o prej; (4)appls to proceed IFP by Plfs Bonner 15 , McClendon 12 30 , & Martin ez 14 be DENIED w/o prej; (5) Mtn for Ord 5 be DENIED w/o prej Objections to R&R due by 11/16/2009; Mtns by Plf Martinez 28 & McClendon 29 be DENIED w/o prej. Plfs adv of rt to file an obj to R&R due by 11/16/09 This R&R partially disp of issues ref to the undersigned Judge in the captioned matter. Signed by Magistrate Judge Gary M. Purcell on 10/26/09. (dab)
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the Oklahoma Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?