Awad v. Ziriax et al Featured Case

Plaintiff: Muneer Awad
Defendant: Paul Ziriax, Thomas Prince, Ramon Watkins and Susan Turpen
Case Number: 5:2010cv01186
Filed: November 4, 2010
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Office: Oklahoma City Office
County: Oklahoma
Presiding Judge: Vicki Miles-LaGrange
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 25, 2014. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 25, 2011 Filing 34 LETTER from John K. Mooney. (njr)
February 15, 2011 Filing 33 TRANSCRIPT LETTER advising transcripts have been electronically filed re 21 Notice of Appeal filed by Thomas Prince, Ramon Watkins, Susan Turpen, Paul Ziriax. The record is ready for appeal purposes. (njr)
February 14, 2011 Filing 32 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of proceedings of November 22, 2010, Hearing on Motion for Preliminary Injunction, before Judge Vicki Miles-LaGrange, re 21 Notice of Appeal Court Reporter Lynn L. Lee, Telephone number 405-609-5403. Transcript of: Hearing on Preliminary Injunction Volume: 1 of 1. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 3/7/2011. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 3/17/2011. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 5/16/2011. (lhl, )
February 4, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER denying 30 John K. Mooney's "Motion for Request to File: Amiable Brief, Friend of the Court" (as more fully set out in Order). Signed by Honorable Vicki Miles-LaGrange on 2/4/2011. (ks)
January 31, 2011 Filing 30 MOTION for Leave to File Amicus Brief by John K Mooney. (Attachments: # 1 Attachment 1 - Proposed Order) (njr)
December 9, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER granting 26 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice requesting the admission of Gadeir Ibrahim Abbas pro hac vice for the limited purpose of participating in this case on behalf of plaintiff, provided he submits an ECF registration form and files an entry of appearance, consistent with LCvR 83.4. Signed by Honorable Vicki Miles-LaGrange on 12/9/2010. (ks)
December 7, 2010 Filing 28 Receipt for Money Received from Muneer Awad in the amount of $50.00, receipt number OKW500013722 regarding 26 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Gadeir Abbas. (njr)
December 7, 2010 Filing 27 TRANSCRIPT Order Form filed by Lynn L Lee indicating that transcript of proceedings of 11/22/10 is necessary. See order form for dates and proceedings. Estimated completion date February 6, 2011. (lhl, )
December 7, 2010 Filing 26 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Gadeir Abbas by Muneer Awad. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Application for Pro Hoc Vice)(Salem, Micheal)
December 7, 2010 Filing 25 TRANSCRIPT Order Form by Thomas Prince, Susan Turpen, Ramon Watkins, Paul Ziriax that transcripts are necessary. See order form for dates and proceedings. (Boughton, Scott)
December 2, 2010 Filing 24 USCA Appeal Fee received in the amount of $ 455, receipt number OKW500013609, re 21 Notice of Appeal filed by Thomas Prince, Ramon Watkins, Susan Turpen, Paul Ziriax. (njr)
December 2, 2010 Filing 23 Tenth Circuit USCA Case Number 10-6273 for 21 Notice of Appeal filed by Thomas Prince, Ramon Watkins, Susan Turpen, Paul Ziriax. (njr)
December 2, 2010 Filing 22 PRELIMINARY RECORD LETTER - Electronic Transmission of Notice of Appeal with Preliminary Record sent to Tenth Circuit Court of Appeals re 21 Notice of Appeal. (njr)
December 1, 2010 Filing 21 NOTICE OF APPEAL as to 20 Order, by Thomas Prince, Susan Turpen, Ramon Watkins, Paul Ziriax. Filing fee $ 455. (Boughton, Scott)
November 29, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER granting plaintiff's request for a preliminary injunction and enjoining defendants from certifying the election results for State Question 755 until this Court rules on the merits of plaintiff's claims (as more fully set out in Order). Signed by Honorable Vicki Miles-LaGrange on 11/29/2010. (ks)
November 24, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER granting 18 Motion to Seal Exhibit. The Court Clerk is directed to seal plaintiff's Exhibit 8 [docket no. 17-7], the Last Will of Muneer Awad, introduced at the hearing on plaintiff's motion for preliminary injunction. Signed by Honorable Vicki Miles-LaGrange on 11/24/2010. (njr)
November 23, 2010 Filing 18 UNOPPOSED MOTION to Seal Document Plaintiff's Exhibit 8 [Doc. 017-08] by Muneer Awad. (Salem, Micheal)
November 22, 2010 Filing 17 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Honorable Vicki Miles-LaGrange: Preliminary Injunction Hearing held on 11/22/2010. The Court takes the matter under advisement and orders that the expiration of the Temporary Restraining Order be extended to no later than Monday, November 29, 2010. (Court Reporter Lynn Lee) (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 4, # 4 Exhibit 5, # 5 Exhibit 6, # 6 Exhibit 7, # 7 Exhibit 8, # 8 Exhibit 9, # 9 Exhibit 10, # 10 Exhibit 11, # 11 Exhibit 12, # 12 Exhibit 13, # 13 Exhibit 14) (ks)
November 22, 2010 Filing 16 ENTRY of Appearance by Micheal C Salem on behalf of Muneer Awad (Salem, Micheal)
November 19, 2010 Filing 15 ENTRY of Appearance by Janis W Preslar on behalf of Thomas Prince, Susan Turpen, Ramon Watkins, Paul Ziriax (Preslar, Janis)
November 18, 2010 Filing 14 REPLY by Plaintiff Muneer Awad re 9 Response to Plaintiff's Motion for Preliminary Injunction filed by Muneer Awad. (njr)
November 16, 2010 Filing 13 BRIEF IN SUPPORT of Amicus Curiae Opposition to Preliminary Injunction by U.S. Border Control, U.S. Border Control Foundation, The Lincoln Institute for Research and Education, and Conservative Legal Defense and Education Fund. (Attachments: # 1 Attachment Certificate of Service)(Calvey, Kevin)
November 16, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER granting 11 the motion for leave to file Amicus Curiae brief in support of defendants. The U.S. Border Control, U.S. Border Control Foundation, The Lincoln Institute for Research and Education, and Conservative Legal Defense and Education Fund shall file said amicus curiae brief by Wednesday, November 17, 2010 at 8:00 a.m. Signed by Honorable Vicki Miles-LaGrange on 11/16/2010. (ks)
November 16, 2010 Filing 11 SECOND MOTION to File Amicus Brief for Hearing on Preliminary Injunction by U.S. Border Control, U.S. Border Control Foundation, The Lincoln Institute for Research and Education, and Conservative Legal Defense and Education Fund. (Attachments: # 1 Attachment, # 2 Attachment, # 3 Attachment)(Calvey, Kevin)
November 16, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER striking 8 MOTION to File Amicus Brief for Hearing on Preliminary Injunction filed by U.S. Border Control, U.S. Border Control Foundation, The Lincoln Institute for Research and Education, and Conservative Legal Defense and Education Fund (document not signed); Motions terminated: 8 MOTION to File Amicus Brief for Hearing on Preliminary Injunction. Signed by Honorable Vicki Miles-LaGrange on 11/16/2010. (ks)
November 16, 2010 Filing 9 RESPONSE re 1 Complaint to Plaintiff's Motion for Preliminary Injunction filed by Thomas Prince, Susan Turpen, Ramon Watkins, Paul Ziriax. (Boughton, Scott)
November 16, 2010 Filing 8 MOTION to File Amicus Brief for Hearing on Preliminary Injunction by U.S. Border Control, U.S. Border Control Foundation, The Lincoln Institute for Research and Education, and Conservative Legal Defense and Education Fund. (Attachments: # 1 Attachment, # 2 Attachment, # 3 Attachment)(Calvey, Kevin)
November 9, 2010 Filing 7 TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER granting plaintiff's request for a temporary restraining order. The Court, therefore, enjoins defendants from certifying the election results for State Question 755. This Temporary Restraining Order shall be in effect through the conclusion of the hearing on plaintiff's request for a preliminary injunction set for Monday, November 22, 2010 at 10:00 a.m. (as more fully set out in Order). Signed by Honorable Vicki Miles-LaGrange on 11/9/2010. (ks)
November 8, 2010 Filing 6 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Honorable Vicki Miles-LaGrange: Hearing on motion for temporary restraining order held on 11/8/2010. TheCourt finds that the plaintiff has met the factors for this Court to enter a Temporary Restraining Order and the Court will issue an order as soon as possible. The Court sets a hearing on plaintiff's motion for preliminary injunction on November 22, 2010 at 10:00 a.m. (Court Reporter Lynn Lee) (ks)
November 8, 2010 Filing 5 ENTRY of Appearance by Scott D Boughton on behalf of Thomas Prince, Susan Turpen, Ramon Watkins, Paul Ziriax (Boughton, Scott)
November 4, 2010 Filing 4 MINUTE ORDER setting a hearing on 1 plaintiff's complaint seeking a temporary restraining order and preliminary injunction for November 8, 2010 at 10:00 a.m. Signed by Honorable Vicki Miles-LaGrange on 11/4/2010. (ks)
November 4, 2010 Filing 3 Receipt for Money Received from Muneer Awad in the amount of $350.00, receipt number OKW500013112 regarding 1 Complaint. (njr)
November 4, 2010 Filing 2 MEMORANDUM in Support re 1 Complaint filed by Muneer Awad. (njr)
November 4, 2010 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Thomas Prince, Susan Turpen, Ramon Watkins, Paul Ziriax filed by Muneer Awad. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet) (njr)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oklahoma Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Awad v. Ziriax et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Muneer Awad
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Paul Ziriax
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thomas Prince
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ramon Watkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Susan Turpen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?