Douglas v. Miller et al
Plaintiff: Yancey Lyndell Douglas
Defendant: Robert Bradley Miller, Oklahoma State of and Durbin Larimore and Bialick
Case Number: 5:2010cv01295
Filed: December 1, 2010
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Office: Oklahoma City Office
County: Oklahoma
Presiding Judge: Tim Leonard
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
July 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 193 ORDER denying 163 Motion to Strike Plaintiff's Expert Witnesses. Signed by Honorable Timothy D. DeGiusti on 7/13/2017. (mb)
June 22, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 175 ORDER Denying the Motion but the subpoena to the Oklahoma County District Attorney is Modified to allow a reasonable time for production of the documents on or before 7/5/2017 re 165 Defendants' Motion to Quash Subpoena Duces Tecum. Signed by Honorable Timothy D. DeGiusti on 6/22/2017. (mb)
April 21, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 124 ORDER denying 92 Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by Honorable Timothy D. DeGiusti on 4/221/2015. (mb)
March 30, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 123 ORDER denying 82 Motion for Summary Judgment; granting 93 Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by Honorable Timothy D. DeGiusti on 3/30/2015. (mb)
March 30, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 55 ORDER granting in part and denying in part 47 Motion to Strike ; granting in part and denying in part 48 Motion to Strike ; granting in part and denying in part 33 Motion to Dismiss; granting in part and denying in part 34 Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Honorable Timothy D. DeGiusti on 3/30/2012. (mb, )
March 29, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 54 ORDER granting 32 Motion to Dismiss of Durbin, Larimore and Bialick. Signed by Honorable Timothy D. DeGiusti on 3/29/2012. (mb, )
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oklahoma Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Douglas v. Miller et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Yancey Lyndell Douglas
Represented By: Mark H Barrett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert Bradley Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Oklahoma State of
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Durbin Larimore and Bialick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?